Lock v. Berryhill
Washington Western District Court | |
Judge: | Brian A Tsuchida |
Case #: | 2:18-cv-00836 |
Nature of Suit | 864 Social Security - SSID Title XVI |
Cause | 42:416 Denial of Social Security Benefits |
Case Filed: | Jun 08, 2018 |
Terminated: | May 14, 2019 |
Create an account to get the full party report for this case.
Docket last updated: 1 hours ago |
Tuesday, August 13, 2019 | ||
23 | 23
2
pgs
order
Order on Motion for Attorney Fees
Tue 08/13 1:27 PM
ORDER re22 Motion for Attorney Fees signed by Hon. Brian A Tsuchida.(AE) |
|
Monday, August 12, 2019 | ||
22 | 22
motion
Attorney Fees
Mon 08/12 5:00 PM
Stipulated MOTION for Attorney Fees Pursuant to EAJA , filed by Plaintiff Marvin T Lock. Noting Date 8/13/2019, (Win, M) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit Affidavit of Counsel, | ||
Att: 2 Proposed Order, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit Assignment of Fee | ||
Tuesday, May 14, 2019 | ||
21 | 21
order
Judgment by Court
Tue 05/14 4:04 PM
JUDGMENT BY COURT: The Commissioner's final decision is REVERSED and the case is REMANDED for further administrative proceedings under sentence four of 42 U.S.C. § 405(g). (KMP) |
|
20 | 20
order
1 - Order
Tue 05/14 4:02 PM
ORDER REVERSING AND REMANDING FOR FURTHER ADMINISTRATIVE PROCEEDINGS by Hon. Brian A Tsuchida. (KMP) |
|
Friday, April 05, 2019 | ||
19 | 19
misc
Brief - Responsive
Fri 04/05 5:32 PM
RESPONSIVE BRIEF re18 Brief - Opening by Defendant Commissioner of Social Security. (Becia, Franco) |
|
Friday, March 08, 2019 | ||
18 | 18
misc
Brief - Opening
Fri 03/08 10:19 PM
OPENING BRIEF by Plaintiff Marvin T Lock (Win, M) |
|
Monday, February 04, 2019 | ||
17 | 17
order
Social Security Order re Extension of Brief Deadlines
Tue 02/05 6:23 AM
ORDER GRANTING16 UNPPPOSED MOTION TO AMEND THE15 SCHEDULING ORDER by Hon. Brian A Tsuchida. Plaintiff's Opening Brief due by 3/8/2019, Defendant's Responsive Brief due by 4/5/2019, Plaintiff's Optional Reply Brief due by 4/19/2019. (AE) |
|
Sunday, February 03, 2019 | ||
16 | 16
motion
Amend
Sun 02/03 11:22 PM
Unopposed MOTION to Amend Scheduling Order , filed by Plaintiff Marvin T Lock. Noting Date 2/4/2019, (Win, M) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit Declaration of Counsel, | ||
Att: 2 Proposed Order | ||
Tuesday, January 08, 2019 | ||
15 | 15
order
Social Security Order - set/reset Briefing deadlines
Tue 01/08 11:36 AM
SCHEDULING ORDER by Hon. Brian A Tsuchida. Plaintiff's Opening Brief due by 2/5/2019, Defendant's Responsive Brief due by 3/5/2019, Plaintiff's Optional Reply Brief due by 3/19/2019. (AE) |
|
Monday, January 07, 2019 | ||
14 | 14
sealdoc
SEALED Social Security Certified Administrative Record - Answer
Mon 01/07 7:41 AM
SEALED SOCIAL SECURITY CERTIFIED ADMINISTRATIVE RECORD-ANSWER filed by Defendant Commissioner of Social Security.(Becia, Franco) |
|
Att: 1 002 Court Transcript Index 12 19-2018 | ||
Att: 2 003 Documents Related to Administrative Process Including Transcript of Oral Hearing, if applicable 07 16-2015 | ||
Att: 3 004 Payment Documents and Decisions 07 16-2015 | ||
Att: 4 005 Jurisdictional Documents and Notices 07 16-2015 | ||
Att: 5 006 Non Disability Related Development 07 16-2015 | ||
Att: 6 007 Disability Related Development 07 16-2015 | ||
Att: 7 008 Medical Records 07 16-2015 | ||
Att: 8 009 Documents Related to Administrative Process Including Transcript of Oral Hearing, if applicable 12 19-2018 | ||
Att: 9 010 Payment Documents and Decisions 12 19-2018 | ||
Att: 10 011 Jurisdictional Documents and Notices 12 19-2018 | ||
Att: 11 012 Non Disability Related Development 12 19-2018 | ||
Att: 12 013 Disability Related Development 12 19-2018 | ||
Att: 13 014 Medical Records 12 19-2018 Part 1, | ||
Att: 14 015 Medical Records 12 19-2018 Part 2 | ||
Tuesday, December 04, 2018 | ||
13 | 13
order
Social Security Order re Extension of Brief Deadlines
Tue 12/04 1:43 PM
ORDER by Hon. Brian A Tsuchida. Defendant Responsive Brief due by 1/7/2019. (AE) |
|
12 | 12
respm
Declaration
Tue 12/04 11:18 AM
DECLARATION of Franco L. Becia filed by Defendant Commissioner of Social Security re11 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer (Becia, Franco) |
|
11 | 11
motion
Extension of Time to File Answer
Tue 12/04 11:17 AM
Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer , filed by Defendant Commissioner of Social Security. Noting Date 12/4/2018, (Becia, Franco) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order | ||
Tuesday, November 06, 2018 | ||
10 | 10
order
Social Security Order re Extension of Brief Deadlines
Tue 11/06 11:33 AM
ORDER by Hon. Brian A Tsuchida; re8 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer . Defendant's Responsive Brief due by 12/5/2018. (AE) |
|
Monday, November 05, 2018 | ||
9 | 9
respm
Declaration
Mon 11/05 10:04 AM
DECLARATION of Franco L. Becia filed by Defendant Commissioner of Social Security re8 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer (Becia, Franco) |
|
8 | 8
motion
Extension of Time to File Answer
Mon 11/05 10:04 AM
Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer , filed by Defendant Commissioner of Social Security. Noting Date 11/5/2018, (Becia, Franco) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order | ||
7 | 7
notice
Notice of Appearance
Mon 11/05 10:03 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Franco Luciano Becia on behalf of Defendant Commissioner of Social Security. (Becia, Franco) |
|
Thursday, September 06, 2018 | ||
6 | 6
service
Affidavit of Service of Summons & Complaint
Thu 09/06 9:34 PM
AFFIDAVIT of Service of Summons and Complaint on Commissioner of SSA on 9/6/2018, filed by Plaintiff Marvin T Lock. (Win, M) |
|
Tuesday, June 12, 2018 | ||
5 | 5
service
Summons Issued
Tue 06/12 11:59 AM
Summonses Electronically Issued as to defendant Nancy A Berryhill, AG.(TF) |
|
Att: 1 Summons OGC, | ||
Att: 2 Summons SSA, | ||
Att: 3 Summons USA | ||
4 | 4
cmp
Complaint
Tue 06/12 11:53 AM
COMPLAINT against defendant Nancy A Berryhill , filed by Marvin T Lock.(TF) |
|
3 | 3
1
pgs
order
Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis
Tue 06/12 11:51 AM
ORDER Granting Pltf's1 Application to Proceed in forma pauperis signed by Hon. Brian A Tsuchida. The Clerk shall issue summonses. (TF) |
|
Monday, June 11, 2018 | ||
2 | 2
misc
Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge
Mon 06/11 2:00 PM
CONSENT by all parties to proceed before a Magistrate Judge. Case remains assigned to Hon. Brian A. Tsuchida. (TF) |
|
utility
Add and Terminate Judges
Mon 06/11 11:04 AM
Hon. Brian A Tsuchida added. (SG) |
||
Friday, June 08, 2018 | ||
1 | 1
motion
Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis
Fri 06/08 8:59 PM
MOTION for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis , filed by Marvin T. Lock.(Win, M) |
|
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet, | ||
Att: 2 Complaint, | ||
Att: 3 Summons, | ||
Att: 4 Summons, | ||
Att: 5 Summons, | ||
Att: 6 Summons |