DiscoverOrg, LLC v. Neeve Research, LLC
Washington Western District Court | |
Judge: | Ronald B Leighton |
Case #: | 3:18-cv-05459 |
Nature of Suit | 890 Other Statutes - Other Statutory Actions |
Cause | 17:101 Copyright Infringement |
Case Filed: | Jun 08, 2018 |
Terminated: | Jul 09, 2018 |
Last checked: Wednesday Dec 05, 2018 1:11 AM PST |
Defendant
Neeve Research, LLC
|
|
Plaintiff
DiscoverOrg, LLC
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 04/22/2024 11:59 PM PDT |
Thursday, August 02, 2018 | ||
9 | 9
utility
Report Regarding Patent/Trademark/Copyright
Thu 08/02 8:51 AM
REPORT on the determination of an action regarding a Copyright. Report and8 Order mailed to the US Copyright Office. (GMR) |
|
Monday, July 09, 2018 | ||
8 | 8
2
pgs
order
Order Dismissing Case
Mon 07/09 1:38 PM
VOLUNTARY ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE; signed by Judge Ronald B. Leighton. (DN) |
|
Thursday, July 05, 2018 | ||
7 | 7
2
pgs
notice
Notice of Voluntary Dismissal (case)
Thu 07/05 10:08 AM
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal of case by Plaintiff DiscoverOrg, LLC (Du Wors, John) |
|
Monday, June 11, 2018 | ||
6 | 6
6
pgs
order
Joint Status Report Order Form for District Judges
Mon 06/11 11:23 AM
ORDER REGARDING INITIAL DISCLOSURES AND JOINT STATUS REPORT Joint Status Report due by 9/10/2018, FRCP 26f Conference Deadline is 8/27/2018, Initial Disclosure Deadline is 9/4/2018, by Judge Ronald B. Leighton. (DN) |
|
5 | 5
3
pgs
order
Discovery and Depositions Order (FORM)
Mon 06/11 11:23 AM
ORDER REGARDING DISCOVERY AND DEPOSITIONS by Judge Ronald B. Leighton. (DN) |
|
4 | 4
1
pgs
utility
Report Regarding Patent/Trademark/Copyright
Mon 06/11 8:33 AM
REPORT on the filing or determination of an action regarding a Copyright. Mailed to the US Copyright Office. (GMR) |
|
3 | 3
2
pgs
service
Summons Issued
Mon 06/11 8:32 AM
Summons(es) Electronically Issued as to defendant(s) Neeve Research, LLC. (GMR) |
|
utility
Add and Terminate Judges
Mon 06/11 8:31 AM
Judge Ronald B. Leighton added. (GMR) |
||
Friday, June 08, 2018 | ||
2 | 2
2
pgs
discov
Corporate Disclosure Statement
Fri 06/08 1:21 PM
CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT identifying Corporate Parent DiscoverOrg Holdings, LLC for DiscoverOrg, LLC. Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1. Filed by DiscoverOrg, LLC (Du Wors, John) |
|
1 | 1
11
pgs
cmp
Complaint
Fri 06/08 1:13 PM
COMPLAINT against defendant(s) Neeve Research, LLC with JURY DEMAND Attorney John David Du Wors added to party DiscoverOrg, LLC(pty:pla), filed by DiscoverOrg, LLC.(Du Wors, John) |
|
Att: 1 1 pgs Civil Cover Sheet, | ||
Att: 2 2 pgs Summons, | ||
Att: 3 1 pgs Report on Copyrights (AO Form 121) |