BRUNER v. AIG Property Casualty Company
Florida Northern District Court | |
Judge: | M Casey Rodgers |
Referred: | Hope T Cannon |
Case #: | 3:18-cv-01405 |
Nature of Suit | 110 Contract - Insurance |
Cause | 28:1446 Notice of Removal |
Case Filed: | Jun 11, 2018 |
Terminated: | Apr 09, 2019 |
Last checked: Saturday Dec 08, 2018 4:26 AM EST |
Defendant
AIG PROPERTY CASUALTY PROPERTY COMPANY
|
Represented By
|
Mediator
Sands Kimberly
|
|
Plaintiff
VINCENT M BRUNER
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 05/30/2023 11:59 PM EDT |
Tuesday, April 09, 2019 | ||
28 | 28
1
pgs
order
Order Dismissing Case
Tue 04/09 9:34 AM
NOTICE. On April 8, 2019, this cause was DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE under Rule 41 (a)(1)(A)(ii) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by stipulation of the parties. (See ECF No. 27 ). Accordingly, the Clerk is directed to close the file. Signed by JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS on 4/9/2019. (MB) |
|
Monday, April 08, 2019 | ||
27 | 27
misc
Stipulation of Dismissal
Mon 04/08 12:54 PM
STIPULATION of Dismissal with Prejudice by AIG PROPERTY CASUALTY PROPERTY COMPANY. (MEDEIROS, CRYSTALIN) |
|
utility
Action Required by District Judge - No NEFs in SEALED Cases
Mon 04/08 3:22 PM
ACTION REQUIRED BY DISTRICT JUDGE: Chambers of JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS notified that action is needed Re:27 Stipulation of Dismissal (MB) |
||
Wednesday, March 27, 2019 | ||
26 | 26
1
pgs
order
Order
Wed 03/27 10:34 AM
ORDER re 25 Notice of Settlement. Because Defendant has previously filed a motion for summary judgment, dismissal may not be effected upon Plaintiff's notice. Pursuant to Rule 41(a)(1)(ii), Plaintiff may file a stipulation of dismissal signed by all parties appearing in the action, or otherwise file a motion for dismissal under Rule 41(a)(2). Signed by JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS on 3/27/2019. (djb) |
|
utility
Set Deadlines/Hearings
Thu 03/28 8:12 AM
Set Deadlines - re:26 Order. Status Deadline - by 4/26/2019 . (djb) |
||
Thursday, March 07, 2019 | ||
25 | 25
notice
Notice of Settlement
Thu 03/07 2:04 PM
NOTICE of Settlement by VINCENT M BRUNER (CARDILLO, PETER) |
|
utility
Action Required by District Judge - No NEFs in SEALED Cases
Thu 03/07 3:36 PM
ACTION REQUIRED BY DISTRICT JUDGE: Chambers of JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS notified that action is needed Re:25 Notice of Settlement (MB) |
||
Tuesday, March 05, 2019 | ||
24 | 24
1
pgs
order
Order Reassigning Case
Tue 03/05 7:51 AM
ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to MAGISTRATE JUDGE HOPE T CANNON for all further proceedings. MAGISTRATE JUDGE CHARLES J KAHN, JR no longer assigned to case. Signed by CHIEF JUDGE MARK E WALKER on 3/1/2019. (erl) |
|
Monday, February 25, 2019 | ||
23 | 23
1
pgs
order
Order ~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings
Mon 02/25 9:32 AM
ORDER granting 22 First MOTION to Extend Time to Respond to Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment filed by VINCENT M BRUNER. .) Signed by JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS on 2/25/2019. (sdw) |
|
Friday, February 22, 2019 | ||
22 | 22
motion
Extend Time
Fri 02/22 3:49 PM
First MOTION to Extend Time to Respond to Defendnat's Motion for Summary Judgment by VINCENT M BRUNER. (CARDILLO, PETER) |
|
utility
Action Required by District Judge - No NEFs in SEALED Cases
Fri 02/22 4:02 PM
ACTION REQUIRED BY DISTRICT JUDGE: Chambers of JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS notified that action is needed Re:22 Plaintiff's Unopposed MOTION to Extend Time to Respond to Defendant's21 Motion for Summary Judgment (djb) |
||
Friday, February 08, 2019 | ||
21 | 21
motion
Summary Judgment
Fri 02/08 10:33 PM
MOTION for Summary Judgment by AIG PROPERTY CASUALTY PROPERTY COMPANY. (Internal deadline for referral to judge if response to summary judgment not filed earlier: 3/1/2019) . (MEDEIROS, CRYSTALIN) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A - AIGPCC's Response to 1st Interrogatories, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit B - Policy 6/7/12-6/7/13, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit C - Policy 6/7/13-6/7/14, | ||
Att: 4 Exhibit D - Policy 6/7/14-6/7/15, | ||
Att: 5 Exhibit E - Policy 6/7/15-6/7/16, | ||
Att: 6 Exhibit F - Plaintiffs Deposition Transcript, | ||
Att: 7 Exhibit G - Plaintiffs Response to AIGPCCs Interrogatories, | ||
Att: 8 Exhibit H - AIGPCCs Response to Plaintiffs Third Set of Interrogatories, | ||
Att: 9 Exhibit I - Plaintiffs August 10, 2018 Expert Witness Disclosure, | ||
Att: 10 Exhibit J - Deposition Transcript of Michael Biller, | ||
Att: 11 Exhibit K - EFIs Structual Engineering Report, dated January 26, 2017, | ||
Att: 12 Exhibit L - AIGPCCs 6/13/17 denial letter | ||
Wednesday, January 09, 2019 | ||
20 | 20
1
pgs
order
Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery
Wed 01/09 11:02 AM
ORDER denying as moot 17 Defendant's Unopposed Motion to Enlarge Discovery Deadline (to February 28, 2019). (See ECF No. 18 ). Signed by JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS on 01/09/2019. (MB) |
|
Tuesday, December 18, 2018 | ||
19 | 19
notice
Notice - Other - See Separate Menu for Ntc of Appeal Options
Tue 12/18 3:29 PM
NOTICE OF COMPLIANCE WITH AGREED ORDER GRANTING IN PART PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO COMPEL DEFENDANT'S RESPONSE TO PLAINTIFF'S FIRST REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION # 7 AND # 8 by AIG PROPERTY CASUALTY PROPERTY COMPANY re13 Order on Motion to Compel (TEEBAGY, STEVEN) |
|
Tuesday, December 11, 2018 | ||
18 | 18
1
pgs
order
Order ~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings
Tue 12/11 10:25 AM
ORDER granting 16 Plaintiff's Amended Unopposed MOTION to Enlarge Discovery Cutoff (to February 28, 2019). Signed by JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS on 12/11/2018. (Discovery due by 2/28/2019 .) (MB) |
|
Monday, December 10, 2018 | ||
17 | 17
motion
Extension of Time to Complete Discovery
Mon 12/10 4:14 PM
MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery Deadline by AIG PROPERTY CASUALTY PROPERTY COMPANY. (TEEBAGY, STEVEN) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A | ||
utility
Action Required by District Judge - No NEFs in SEALED Cases
Mon 12/10 1:48 PM
ACTION REQUIRED BY DISTRICT JUDGE: Chambers of JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS notified that action is needed Re:16 Amended MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery (MB) |
||
Friday, December 07, 2018 | ||
16 | 16
motion
Extension of Time to Complete Discovery
Fri 12/07 4:14 PM
Amended MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery by VINCENT M BRUNER. (CARDILLO, PETER) |
|
15 | 15
motion
Extension of Time to Complete Discovery
Fri 12/07 4:00 PM
MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery by VINCENT M BRUNER. (CARDILLO, PETER) |
|
14 | 14
1
pgs
order
Order on Motion to Compel
Fri 12/07 3:22 PM
AGREED ORDER Denying As Moot Plaintiff's Motion to Compel Defendant To Amend Privilege Log. Plaintiff's 8 Motion is denied as moot in light of Defendant's Amended Privilege Log served upon Plaintiff on December 6, 2018, that resolves Plaintiff's subject Motion based upon agreement between Parties. Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE CHARLES J KAHN, JR on 12/7/2018. (MB) |
|
13 | 13
1
pgs
order
Order on Motion to Compel
Fri 12/07 3:15 PM
AGREED ORDER granting in part 9 Plaintiff's Motion to Compel Defendant's Response To Plaintiff's First Request For Production #7 And #8. Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE CHARLES J KAHN, JR on 12/7/2018. (MB) |
|
utility
Action Required by Magistrate Judge - No NEFs in SEALED Cases
Fri 12/07 9:21 AM
ACTION REQUIRED BY MAGISTRATE JUDGE: Chambers of MAGISTRATE JUDGE CHARLES J KAHN, JR notified that action is needed Re:12 NOTICE of Withdrawal of10 Plaintiff's Motion to Compel Defendant to Produce Plaintiff's Insurance Policies in Response to Plaintiff's First Request for Production by VINCENT M BRUNER (MB) |
||
Thursday, December 06, 2018 | ||
12 | 12
notice
Notice - Other - See Separate Menu for Ntc of Appeal Options
Thu 12/06 10:49 AM
NOTICE of Withdrawal of Plaintiff's Motion to Compel Defendant to Produce Plaintiff's Insurance Policies in Response to Plaintiff's First Request for Production by VINCENT M BRUNER (CARDILLO, PETER) |
|
utility
Action Required by Magistrate Judge - No NEFs in SEALED Cases
Thu 12/06 9:36 AM
ACTION REQUIRED BY MAGISTRATE JUDGE: Chambers of MAGISTRATE JUDGE CHARLES J KAHN, JR notified that action is needed Re:8 PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO COMPEL DEFENDANT TO AMEND DEFENDANT'S PRIVILEGE LOG by VINCENT M BRUNER,9 PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO COMPEL DEFENDANT'S RESPONSES TO PLAINTIFF'S FIRST REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION #7 AND #8 by VINCENT M BRUNER, MOTION to Compel,10 PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO COMPEL DEFENDANT TO PRODUCE PLAINTIFF'S INSURANCE POLICIES IN RESPONSE TO PLAINTIFF'S FIRST REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION by VINCENT M BRUNER,11 Notice of Filing the 2012/2013 and 2013/2014 Chartis Property Casualty Company Policies by VINCENT M BRUNER. Referred to CHARLES J KAHN, JR. (MB) |
||
Att: 1 Appendix 2012/2013 Chartis Policy, # 2 Appendix 2013/2014 Chartis Policy | ||
Wednesday, December 05, 2018 | ||
11 | 11
notice
Notice - Other - See Separate Menu for Ntc of Appeal Options
Wed 12/05 3:11 PM
NOTICE of Filing the 2012/2013 and 2013/2014 Chartis Property Casualty Company Policies by VINCENT M BRUNER (CARDILLO, PETER) |
|
Att: 1 Appendix 2012/2013 Chartis Policy, | ||
Att: 2 Appendix 2013/2014 Chartis Policy | ||
Wednesday, November 21, 2018 | ||
10 | 10
motion
Compel
Wed 11/21 2:58 PM
PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO COMPEL DEFENDANT TO PRODUCE PLAINTIFF'S INSURANCE POLICIES IN RESPONSE TO PLAINTIFF'S FIRST REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION by VINCENT M BRUNER. (tss) |
|
9 | 9
motion
Compel
Wed 11/21 2:05 PM
PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO COMPEL DEFENDANT'S RESPONSES TO PLAINTIFF'S FIRST REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION #7 AND #8 by VINCENT M BRUNER. (tss) |
|
8 | 8
motion
Compel
Wed 11/21 12:54 PM
PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO COMPEL DEFENDANT TO AMEND DEFENDANT'S PRIVILEGE LOG by VINCENT M BRUNER. (tss) |
|
Monday, November 19, 2018 | ||
7 | 7
misc
Notice of Mediation re Scheduling
Mon 11/19 2:57 PM
Joint NOTICE OF MEDIATION re Scheduling by AIG PROPERTY CASUALTY PROPERTY COMPANY, Sands Kimberly (MEDEIROS, CRYSTALIN) |
|
Monday, August 06, 2018 | ||
6 | 6
7
pgs
order
Order Referring Case to Mediation ~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings
Mon 08/06 3:29 PM
FINAL SCHEDULING ORDER AND MEDIATION REFERRAL re 5 Report of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. Discovery due by 12/10/2018 . The deadline for filing Dispositive Motions as well as daubert motions to be filed by 2/8/2019 . Mediation to take place by 1/7/2019 . Mediation Report due by 1/22/2019 . Signed by JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS on 08/06/2018. (MB) |
|
Friday, July 27, 2018 | ||
utility
Action Required by District Judge - No NEFs in SEALED Cases
Fri 07/27 7:41 AM
ACTION REQUIRED BY DISTRICT JUDGE: Chambers of JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS notified that action is needed Re:5 Report of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting (MB) |
||
Thursday, July 26, 2018 | ||
5 | 5
misc
Report of Rule 26f Planning Meeting
Thu 07/26 3:53 PM
REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (CARDILLO, PETER) |
|
Tuesday, June 26, 2018 | ||
4 | 4
misc
Corporate Disclosure Statement/Certificate of Interested Persons
Tue 06/26 8:41 PM
Corporate Disclosure Statement/Certificate of Interested Persons by AIG PROPERTY CASUALTY PROPERTY COMPANY. (MEDEIROS, CRYSTALIN) |
|
Tuesday, June 12, 2018 | ||
3 | 3
order
Scheduling Order
Tue 06/12 3:56 PM
INITIAL SCHEDULING ORDER: Fed.R.Civ.P. 7.1 Corporate Disclosure Statement Deadline set for 6/26/2018 . Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 7/26/2018 . Discovery due by 12/10/2018 . Signed by CHIEF JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS on 06/12/2018. (MB) |
|
2 | 2
misc
Docket Annotation
Tue 06/12 12:33 PM
DOCKET ANNOTATION BY COURT: The parties in the above-referenced case were added to the docket incorrectly and will be corrected by the clerk. Party names are to be entered in all caps and without punctuation. For future reference: Please review the procedure for adding/creating new parties in the "Style Guide for Electronic Case Filing" and/or chapter 10 of the "CM/ECF Attorney User's Guide," available at www.flnd.uscourts.gov. (MB) |
|
utility
Action Required by District Judge - No NEFs in SEALED Cases
Tue 06/12 2:05 PM
ACTION REQUIRED BY DISTRICT JUDGE: Chambers of CHIEF JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS notified that action is needed Re:1 Notice of Removal (please see proposed ISO). (MB) |
||
Monday, June 11, 2018 | ||
1 | 1
cmp
Notice of Removal
Mon 06/11 11:28 AM
NOTICE OF REMOVAL by AIG Property Casualty Company from 1ST JUDICIAL CIRCUIT IN AND FOR ESCAMBIA COUNTY, FLORIDA, case number 2017-CA-001399., filed by AIG Property Casualty Company. (TEEBAGY, STEVEN) |
|
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit A-1, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit A-2, | ||
Att: 4 Exhibit A-3, | ||
Att: 5 Exhibit B, | ||
Att: 6 Exhibit C |