MORALES v. WEATHERS
Florida Northern District Court | |
Judge: | William Stafford |
Referred: | Charles A Stampelos |
Case #: | 4:18-cv-00273 |
Nature of Suit | 463 Immigration - Habeas Corpus - Alien Detainee |
Cause | 28:2241 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (federa |
Case Filed: | Jun 08, 2018 |
Terminated: | Nov 01, 2018 |
Last checked: Wednesday Dec 05, 2018 3:53 AM EST |
Petitioner
HERIBERTO MORALES
28118-180 FEDERAL CORRECTIONAL INSTITUTION PO BOX 7007
MARIANNA, FL 32447 |
|
Respondent
WEATHERS
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 05/30/2023 11:59 PM EDT |
Thursday, November 01, 2018 | ||
12 | 12
order
Judgment (Signed by Clerk: Not an Opinion)
Thu 11/01 12:05 PM
CLERK'S JUDGMENT - re: 11 ORDER DENYING PETITIONER'S § 2241 PETITION. 90 Day Exhibit Return Deadline set for 1/30/2019. (cle) |
|
Wednesday, October 31, 2018 | ||
11 | 11
2
pgs
order
Order Adopting Report and Recommendation
Thu 11/01 11:55 AM
ORDER DENYING PETITIONER'S § 2241 PETITION - The magistrate judge's report and recommendation (doc. 10 ) is ADOPTED and incorporated by reference into this order of the court. The petitioner's petition for writ of habeas corpus (doc. 1 ) is DENIED. The clerk is directed to enter judgment stating: "The petitioner's petition for writ of habeas corpus is DENIED." A certificate of appealability and leave to appeal in forma pauperis are DENIED. Signed by SENIOR JUDGE WILLIAM STAFFORD on 10/31/2018. (cle) |
|
Friday, October 26, 2018 | ||
utility
Action Required by District Judge - No NEFs in SEALED Cases
Fri 10/26 9:51 AM
ACTION REQUIRED BY DISTRICT JUDGE: Chambers of SENIOR JUDGE WILLIAM STAFFORD notified that action is needed re:10 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION. The deadline to file Objections to the R&R has expired. No Objections have been filed. (cle) |
||
Tuesday, September 25, 2018 | ||
10 | 10
motion
Report and Recommendation
Tue 09/25 10:19 AM
REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION TO DENY § 2241 PETITION - It is respectfully RECOMMENDED that Petitioner's § 2241 petition, ECF No. 1 , be DENIED. It is further RECOMMENDED that a certificate of appealability be DENIED and that leave to appeal in forma pauperis be DENIED. R&R flag set. (Internal deadline for referral to district judge if objections are not filed earlier: 10/23/2018 .) Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE CHARLES A STAMPELOS on 9/25/2018. (ckm) |
|
Tuesday, August 28, 2018 | ||
utility
Action Required by Magistrate Judge - No NEFs in SEALED Cases
Tue 08/28 1:32 PM
ACTION REQUIRED BY MAGISTRATE JUDGE: Chambers of MAGISTRATE JUDGE CHARLES A STAMPELOS notified that action is needed re:9 REPLY (RESPONSE) to Respondent's Response to1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus. (cle) |
||
Monday, August 27, 2018 | ||
9 | 9
respm
Reply to Response to Motion
Tue 08/28 1:30 PM
REPLY (RESPONSE) to Respondent's Response to1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus filed by HERIBERTO MORALES. (cle) |
|
Tuesday, August 14, 2018 | ||
utility
Action Required by Magistrate Judge - No NEFs in SEALED Cases
Tue 08/14 7:51 AM
ACTION REQUIRED BY MAGISTRATE JUDGE: Chambers of MAGISTRATE JUDGE CHARLES A STAMPELOS notified that action is needed Re:8 Response to Habeas Petition. (ckm) |
||
Monday, August 13, 2018 | ||
8 | 8
answer
Response to Habeas Petition
Mon 08/13 4:22 PM
RESPONSE to1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus by WEATHERS. (GROGAN, ANDREW) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit Colston Declaration with attachments | ||
Tuesday, July 24, 2018 | ||
7 | 7
1
pgs
order
Order on Motion to Amend/Correct
Tue 07/24 2:26 PM
ORDER - re: 6 Motion to Amend. Petitioner's motion (ECF No. 6 ) is GRANTED to the extent he requests to supplement the record with the attachment to his motion and the attachment is accepted as supplemental record. Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE CHARLES A STAMPELOS on 7/24/2018. (cle) |
|
Monday, July 23, 2018 | ||
utility
Action Required by Magistrate Judge - No NEFs in SEALED Cases
Mon 07/23 11:51 AM
ACTION REQUIRED BY MAGISTRATE JUDGE: Chambers of MAGISTRATE JUDGE CHARLES A STAMPELOS notified that action is needed re:6 MOTION to Amend1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus. Referred to CHARLES A STAMPELOS. (cle) |
||
Friday, July 20, 2018 | ||
6 | 6
motion
Amend/Correct - for Requesting Leave of Court to Amend
Mon 07/23 11:49 AM
MOTION to Amend - re:1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus, filed by HERIBERTO MORALES. (cle) |
|
Tuesday, July 03, 2018 | ||
utility
Action Required by Magistrate Judge - No NEFs in SEALED Cases
Tue 07/03 9:10 AM
ACTION REQUIRED BY MAGISTRATE JUDGE: Chambers of MAGISTRATE JUDGE CHARLES A STAMPELOS notified that action is needed re:5 Notice of Appearance. (cle) |
||
Monday, July 02, 2018 | ||
5 | 5
notice
Notice of Appearance
Mon 07/02 10:54 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by ANDREW JABUS GROGAN on behalf of WEATHERS (GROGAN, ANDREW) |
|
Wednesday, June 13, 2018 | ||
4 | 4
2
pgs
order
Order ~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings
Wed 06/13 10:16 AM
ORDER DIRECTING RESPONSE TO § 2241 PETITION - The Clerk shall forward a copy of the § 2241 petition (ECF No. 1 ) and this order to Respondent and the United States Attorney for this District. ( Answer due by 8/13/2018 ., Reply, if any, due by 9/12/2018 .) Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE CHARLES A STAMPELOS on 6/13/2018. (tdl) |
|
Tuesday, June 12, 2018 | ||
utility
Action Required by Magistrate Judge - No NEFs in SEALED Cases
Tue 06/12 12:29 PM
ACTION REQUIRED BY MAGISTRATE JUDGE: Chambers of MAGISTRATE JUDGE CHARLES A STAMPELOS notified that action is needed Re:1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus, 2 Filing Fee Received. (tdl) |
||
Monday, June 11, 2018 | ||
3 | 3
notice
Notice to Pro Se
Mon 06/11 10:30 AM
Notice to Pro Se (tdl) |
|
utility
Action Required by Magistrate Judge - No NEFs in SEALED Cases
Mon 06/11 10:31 AM
ACTION REQUIRED BY MAGISTRATE JUDGE: Chambers of MAGISTRATE JUDGE CHARLES A STAMPELOS notified that action is needed Re:1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus, 2 Filing Fee Received. (tdl) |
||
Friday, June 08, 2018 | ||
2 | 2
misc
Filing Fee Received
Mon 06/11 10:29 AM
Filing fee: $ 5.00, receipt number 4-34331 Fee status updated to paid. (tdl) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus
Mon 06/11 10:29 AM
PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus, filed by HERIBERTO MORALES. (tdl) |