BARATI v. BONDI et al
Florida Northern District Court | |
Judge: | Robert L Hinkle |
Referred: | Charles A Stampelos |
Case #: | 4:18-cv-00275 |
Nature of Suit | 440 Civil Rights - Other Civil Rights |
Cause | 42:1983 Civil Rights Act |
Case Filed: | Jun 08, 2018 |
Terminated: | Sep 05, 2018 |
Last checked: Wednesday Dec 05, 2018 3:57 AM EST |
Defendant
PAMELA JO BONDI
|
|
Defendant
MOTOROLA SOLUTIONS INC
|
|
Plaintiff
ZOLTAN BARATI
26741 PORTOLA PKWY SUITE 1E 165
FOOTHILL RANCH, CA 92610 |
Docket last updated: 05/30/2023 11:59 PM EDT |
Tuesday, January 18, 2022 | ||
22 | 22
appeal
USCA Order
Mon 01/24 1:24 PM
WRIT OF CERTIORARI DENIED by US Supreme Court. USCA Appeal Number: 18-13998 re14 Notice of Appeal. (toy) |
|
Thursday, October 14, 2021 | ||
21 | 21
appeal
USCA Mandate
Fri 10/15 7:50 AM
MANDATE of USCA 18-13998 HH) as to14 Notice of Appeal filed by ZOLTAN BARATI ( 30 Day Exhibit Return Deadline After Appeal Mandate set for 11/15/2021 .) (toy) |
|
Wednesday, July 14, 2021 | ||
appeal
~Util - Set Appeal Deadlines ~Util Terminate Appeal Deadlines
Wed 07/14 9:34 AM
Set Appeal Status Deadline - re:14 Notice of Appeal. Clerk to check status of Appeal on 10/14/2021 . (cle) |
||
Monday, July 12, 2021 | ||
20 | 20
appeal
USCA Judgment
Fri 07/16 12:39 PM
USCA JUDGMENT as to14 Notice of Appeal. The District Court was right to dismiss the case for lack of jurisdiction. AFFIRMED. Judgment has this day been entered. The court's mandate will issue at a later date. USCA Appeal Number: 18-13998 HH. (cle) |
|
Tuesday, April 13, 2021 | ||
appeal
~Util - Set Appeal Deadlines ~Util Terminate Appeal Deadlines
Tue 04/13 8:02 AM
Set Appeal Status Deadline - re:14 Notice of Appeal. Clerk to check status of Appeal on 7/13/2021 . (cle) |
||
Monday, January 11, 2021 | ||
appeal
~Util - Set Appeal Deadlines ~Util Terminate Appeal Deadlines
Mon 01/11 11:35 AM
Set Appeal Status Deadline - re:14 Notice of Appeal. Clerk to check status of Appeal on 4/12/2021 . (cle) |
||
Thursday, October 08, 2020 | ||
appeal
~Util - Set Appeal Deadlines ~Util Terminate Appeal Deadlines
Thu 10/08 9:54 PM
Set Appeal Status Deadline - re:14 Notice of Appeal. Clerk to check status of Appeal on 1/8/2021 . (cle) |
||
Wednesday, July 08, 2020 | ||
appeal
~Util - Set Appeal Deadlines ~Util Terminate Appeal Deadlines
Wed 07/08 9:41 AM
Set Appeal Status Deadline - re:14 Notice of Appeal. Clerk to check status of Appeal on 10/8/2020 . (cle) |
||
Tuesday, April 07, 2020 | ||
appeal
~Util - Set Appeal Deadlines ~Util Terminate Appeal Deadlines
Tue 04/07 7:39 AM
Set Appeal Status Deadline - re:14 Notice of Appeal. Clerk to check status of Appeal on 7/7/2020 . (cle) |
||
Monday, January 06, 2020 | ||
appeal
~Util - Set Appeal Deadlines ~Util Terminate Appeal Deadlines
Mon 01/06 10:54 AM
Set Appeal Status Deadline - re:14 Notice of Appeal. Clerk to check status of Appeal on 4/6/2020 . (cle) |
||
Wednesday, October 02, 2019 | ||
appeal
~Util Terminate Appeal Deadlines ~Util - Set Appeal Deadlines
Wed 10/02 7:44 AM
Reset Appeal Status Deadlines re14 Notice of Appeal filed by ZOLTAN BARATI : (Clerk to check status of Appeal on 1/2/2020 .) (toy) |
||
Monday, July 01, 2019 | ||
appeal
~Util Terminate Appeal Deadlines ~Util - Set Appeal Deadlines
Mon 07/01 8:56 AM
Re-Set Appeal Status Deadline re14 Notice of Appeal : (Clerk to check status of Appeal on 10/1/2019 .) (toy) |
||
Thursday, March 28, 2019 | ||
appeal
~Util Terminate Appeal Deadlines ~Util - Set Appeal Deadlines
Thu 03/28 8:43 AM
Reset Appeal Status Deadline re14 Notice of Appeal filed by ZOLTAN BARATI, ( Clerk to check status of Appeal on 6/28/2019 .) (toy) |
||
Wednesday, December 26, 2018 | ||
appeal
~Util - Set Appeal Deadlines ~Util Terminate Appeal Deadlines
Wed 12/26 6:01 AM
Reset Deadlines re14 Notice of Appeal: Clerk to check status of Appeal on 3/26/2019 . (amm) |
||
Tuesday, November 27, 2018 | ||
19 | 19
appeal
Electronic Availability of ROA
Tue 11/27 6:39 AM
Pursuant to F.R.A.P. 11(c), the Clerk of the District Court for the Northern District of Florida certifies that the record is complete for purposes of this appeal - re:14 Notice of Appeal. Appeal No. 18-13998 H. The entire record on appeal is available electronically. (cle) |
|
Friday, September 28, 2018 | ||
18 | 18
appeal
USCA Case Number
Thu 10/11 2:01 PM
USCA Case Number 18-13998 H for14 NOTICE OF APPEAL as to12 Order Adopting10 Report and Recommendation,13 Clerk's Judgment. (kdm) |
|
Thursday, September 27, 2018 | ||
17 | 17
misc
Transcript Request
Fri 09/28 10:43 AM
TRANSCRIPT REQUEST (No Hearing) by ZOLTAN BARATI. (vkm) |
|
Tuesday, September 18, 2018 | ||
16 | 16
appeal
Appeal Instructions
Tue 09/18 2:05 PM
Appeal Instructions re:14 Notice of Appeal: The Transcript Request Form is available on the Internet at http://www.flnd.uscourts.gov/forms/Attorney/ECCA_transcript_form_fillable.pdf **PLEASE NOTE** Separate forms must be filed for each court reporter. Transcript Order Form due by 10/2/2018 . (vkm) |
|
15 | 15
appeal
Transmission of Notice of Appeal and Docket Sheet to USCA
Tue 09/18 2:05 PM
Transmission of Notice of Appeal and Docket Sheet to US Court of Appeals re14 Notice of Appeal (vkm) |
|
appeal
~Util - Set Appeal Deadlines
Tue 09/18 2:06 PM
Set Deadlines re14 Notice of Appeal: Clerk to check status of Appeal on 12/18/2018 . (vkm) |
||
Monday, September 17, 2018 | ||
14 | 14
appeal
Notice of Appeal
Tue 09/18 1:56 PM
NOTICE OF APPEAL as to13 Clerk's Judgment,12 Order Adopting Report and Recommendation, by ZOLTAN BARATI. (vkm) |
|
Wednesday, September 05, 2018 | ||
13 | 13
order
Judgment (Signed by Clerk: Not an Opinion)
Wed 09/05 1:31 PM
CLERK'S JUDGMENT entered pursuant to 12 Order of Dismissal. 90 Day Exhibit Return Deadline set for 12/4/2018 . (ckm) |
|
Tuesday, September 04, 2018 | ||
12 | 12
1
pgs
order
Order Adopting Report and Recommendation Order on Report and Recommendation
Wed 09/05 1:29 PM
ORDER OF DISMISSAL - The report and recommendation is accepted and adopted as the court's opinion. The clerk must enter judgment stating, "This case is dismissed for lack of jurisdiction based on the Rooker-Feldman doctrine." The clerk must close the file. Signed by JUDGE ROBERT L HINKLE on 9/4/2018. (ckm) |
|
Tuesday, August 28, 2018 | ||
11 | 11
respoth
Objection to Report and Recommendations
Wed 08/29 12:30 PM
Objection to Dismiss and Memorandum of Law in Support by ZOLTAN BARATI. (ckm) |
|
Wednesday, August 15, 2018 | ||
10 | 10
motion
Report and Recommendation
Wed 08/15 3:07 PM
REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION re - It is respectfully RECOMMENDED that Plaintiff's amended complaint, ECF No. 9 , be DISMISSED for lack of subject matter jurisdiction R&R flag set. Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE CHARLES A STAMPELOS on 8/15/2018. Internal deadline for referral to district judge if objections are not filed earlier: 9/12/2018 . (vkm) |
|
Tuesday, July 10, 2018 | ||
9 | 9
cmp
Amended Complaint
Tue 07/10 2:54 PM
FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT against PAMELA JO BONDI, MOTOROLA SOLUTIONS INC, filed by ZOLTAN BARATI. (vkm) |
|
utility
Action Required by Magistrate Judge - No NEFs in SEALED Cases
Tue 07/10 2:55 PM
ACTION REQUIRED BY MAGISTRATE JUDGE: Chambers of MAGISTRATE JUDGE CHARLES A STAMPELOS notified that action is needed Re:9 FIRST Amended Complaint. (vkm) |
||
Tuesday, June 12, 2018 | ||
8 | 8
6
pgs
order
Order ~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings 1 - Terminate Deadlines
Tue 06/12 1:44 PM
ORDER - The Clerk of Court shall forward to Plaintiff a civil complaint form for use by non-prisoners so Plaintiff can file an amended complaint as explained above. The motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis, ECF No. 2 , is GRANTED. The motion requesting appointment of counsel, ECF No. 3 , is DENIED. The motion requesting leave to exceed the page limit, ECF No. 4 , is DENIED. The motion to combine claims with a memorandum of law, ECF No. 5 , is DENIED. The motion to seal affidavit of financial status, ECF No. 6 , is DENIED. (Amended Complaint due by 7/16/2018 .) Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE CHARLES A STAMPELOS on 6/12/2018. (tdl) |
|
Monday, June 11, 2018 | ||
7 | 7
notice
Notice to Pro Se
Mon 06/11 10:22 AM
Notice to Pro Se (tdl) |
|
utility
Action Required by Magistrate Judge - No NEFs in SEALED Cases
Mon 06/11 10:27 AM
ACTION REQUIRED BY MAGISTRATE JUDGE: Chambers of MAGISTRATE JUDGE CHARLES A STAMPELOS notified that action is needed Re:4 MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages,1 Complaint,6 MOTION to Seal Document2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis,2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis,5 MOTION to Combine Claim and Memorandum of Law,3 MOTION to Appoint Counsel. Referred to CHARLES A STAMPELOS. (tdl) |
||
Friday, June 08, 2018 | ||
6 | 6
motion
Seal Document
Mon 06/11 10:21 AM
MOTION to Seal Affidavit of Financial Status re2 Motion by ZOLTAN BARATI. (tdl) |
|
5 | 5
motion
Miscellaneous Relief
Mon 06/11 10:20 AM
MOTION to Combine Claim and Memorandum of Law by ZOLTAN BARATI. (tdl) |
|
4 | 4
motion
File Excess Pages
Mon 06/11 10:18 AM
MOTION to Exceed Page Limit by ZOLTAN BARATI. (tdl) |
|
3 | 3
motion
Appoint Counsel
Mon 06/11 10:17 AM
MOTION Requesting Appointment of Counsel by ZOLTAN BARATI. (tdl) |
|
2 | 2
motion
Proceed In Forma Pauperis
Mon 06/11 10:17 AM
MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by ZOLTAN BARATI. (tdl) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Mon 06/11 10:13 AM
COMPLAINT against PAMELA JO BONDI, MOTOROLA SOLUTIONS INC, filed by ZOLTAN BARATI. (tdl) |