SunTrust Banks, Inc v. Be Yachts, LLC et al
Washington Western District Court | |
Judge: | Marsha J Pechman |
Case #: | 2:18-cv-00840 |
Nature of Suit | 120 Contract - Marine |
Cause | 28:1332 Diversity-Contract Default |
Case Filed: | Jun 11, 2018 |
Terminated: | Jun 30, 2020 |
Last checked: Saturday Dec 08, 2018 1:23 AM PST |
Counter Claimant
Edward Balassanian
|
Represented By
|
Counter Claimant
Be Yachts, LLC
|
Represented By
|
Counter Defendant
SunTrust Banks, Inc
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Edward Balassanian
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Be Yachts, LLC
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
SunTrust Banks, Inc
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 04/22/2024 11:59 PM PDT |
Tuesday, December 29, 2020 | ||
81 | 81
7
pgs
order
Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
Tue 12/29 2:41 PM
ORDER denying Defendants'78 Motion Contesting Plaintiff's Supplemental Attorneys' Fees Declarations. The Court DENIES Defendants' Motion, after taking into account the conceded reductions from Plaintiff of $6,445.00. Plaintiff is therefore awarded a total of $226,535.00 in attorneys' fees. Signed by Judge Marsha J. Pechman.(PM) |