Armstrong v. Whalen et al
Washington Western District Court | |
Judge: | John C Coughenour |
Case #: | 2:18-cv-00845 |
Nature of Suit | 440 Civil Rights - Other Civil Rights |
Cause | 28:1331 Federal Question: Civil Rights Violation (Excess Force) |
Case Filed: | Jun 11, 2018 |
Terminated: | Mar 05, 2021 |
Last checked: Saturday Dec 08, 2018 1:35 AM PST |
Defendant
Snohomish County
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Ty Trenary
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Deputy C. Daugherty
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Deputy K. Oyetuga
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Deputy C. Whalen
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Virgil Armstrong
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 6 hours ago |
Friday, March 05, 2021 | ||
82 | 82
2
pgs
order
Order on Stipulated Motion ~Util - Terminate Case
Fri 03/05 8:33 AM
MINUTE ORDER re parties'81 Stipulated Motion. All claims in this action are DISMISSED with prejudice and without costs to any party, with each party to bear its own attorney fees and other litigation expenses. Authorized by U.S. District Judge John C. Coughenour.(PM) |
|
Wednesday, March 03, 2021 | ||
81 | 81
motion
Stipulated Motion
Wed 03/03 2:29 PM
Joint Stipulated MOTION and Proposed Order to Dismiss All Claims , filed by Defendants C. Daugherty, K. Oyetuga, Snohomish County, Ty Trenary, C. Whalen. Noting Date 3/3/2021, (Severson, Deborah) |