Northwest Administrators, Inc v. Ross Island Sand & Gravel Co
Washington Western District Court | |
Judge: | Marsha J Pechman |
Case #: | 2:18-cv-00846 |
Nature of Suit | 791 Labor - Employee Retirement Income Security Act |
Cause | 29:1132 E.R.I.S.A.-Employee Benefits |
Case Filed: | Jun 11, 2018 |
Terminated: | Aug 17, 2018 |
Last checked: Saturday Dec 08, 2018 1:06 AM PST |
Defendant
Ross Island Sand & Gravel Co
|
|
Plaintiff
Northwest Administrators Inc
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 04/17/2024 11:59 PM PDT |
Monday, March 11, 2019 | ||
11 | 11
misc
Satisfaction of Judgment
Mon 03/11 9:34 AM
SATISFACTION OF JUDGMENT re10 Order on Motion for Default Judgment ; entered In favor of Northwest Administrators Inc Against Ross Island Sand & Gravel Co by Plaintiff Northwest Administrators Inc |
|
Friday, August 17, 2018 | ||
10 | 10
3
pgs
order
Order on Motion for Default Judgment
Fri 08/17 11:50 AM
JUDGMENT re plaintiff's8 Motion for Default Judgment. Plaintiff is awarded judgment against defendant for a total of $53,934.69. Signed by Judge Marsha J. Pechman. (SWT) |
|
Wednesday, August 15, 2018 | ||
9 | 9
respm
Declaration
Wed 08/15 9:26 AM
DECLARATION of Miriam Williams filed by Plaintiff Northwest Administrators, Inc re8 MOTION for Default Judgment Against Ross Island Sand & Gravel Co. Modified on 8/15/2018 to include text of all exhibits attached (TH) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A-H, pp 6-36 | ||
8 | 8
motion
Default Judgment
Wed 08/15 9:20 AM
MOTION for Default Judgment Against Ross Island Sand & Gravel Co. , filed by Plaintiff Northwest Administrators, Inc. Noting Date 8/15/2018, |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A-D, pp 8-43 to Russell J. Reid's Affidavit, | ||
Att: 2 Proposed Order | ||
Tuesday, August 07, 2018 | ||
7 | 7
2
pgs
order
Order on Motion for Default
Tue 08/07 9:43 AM
ORDER OF DEFAULT - Granting6 Motion for Default as to Defendant Ross Island Sand & Gravel Company, signed by United States District Court Clerk(RM) |
|
Monday, August 06, 2018 | ||
6 | 6
motion
Default
Mon 08/06 3:37 PM
MOTION for Default Against Ross Island Sand & Gravel Co. , filed by Plaintiff Northwest Administrators, Inc. Noting Date 8/6/2018, |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A-B, pp 4-11 to Russell J. Reid's Affidavit, | ||
Att: 2 Proposed Order | ||
Tuesday, July 10, 2018 | ||
5 | 5
order
Joint Status Report Order Form for District Judges
Tue 07/10 11:41 AM
ORDER REGARDING INITIAL DISCLOSURES AND JOINT STATUS REPORT Joint Status Report due by 8/21/2018, FRCP 26f Conference Deadline is 8/7/2018, Initial Disclosure Deadline is 8/14/2018, by Judge Marsha J. Pechman. (RM) |
|
Friday, June 15, 2018 | ||
4 | 4
service
Summons Returned Executed
Fri 06/15 2:40 PM
SERVICE OF SUMMONS and Complaint returned executed upon defendant Ross Island Sand & Gravel Co on 6/14/2018 |
|
Wednesday, June 13, 2018 | ||
3 | 3
service
Summons Issued
Wed 06/13 8:42 AM
Summons(es) Electronically Issued as to defendant(s) Ross Island Sand and Gravel Co (SG) |
|
utility
Add and Terminate Judges
Wed 06/13 8:37 AM
Judge Marsha J. Pechman added. (SG) |
||
Monday, June 11, 2018 | ||
2 | 2
discov
Corporate Disclosure Statement
Mon 06/11 3:21 PM
CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT indicating no Corporate Parents and/or Affiliates. Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1. Filed by Northwest Administrators, Inc |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Mon 06/11 3:10 PM
COMPLAINT to Collect Trust Funds against defendant(s) Ross Island Sand and Gravel Co , filed by Northwest Administrators, Inc. |
|
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet, | ||
Att: 2 Summons |