Carpenters Health and Security Trust of Western Washington et al v. Authentic Construction, LLC et al
Washington Western District Court | |
Judge: | Robert S Lasnik |
Case #: | 2:18-mc-00063 |
Case Filed: | Jun 08, 2018 |
Terminated: | Aug 28, 2018 |
Create an account to get the full party report for this case.
Docket last updated: 04/17/2024 11:59 PM PDT |
Wednesday, August 29, 2018 | ||
6 | 6
respoth
Answer to Writ of Garnishment
Wed 08/29 7:55 AM
ANSWER to Writ of Garnishment Second Answer by Carpenters Health and Security Trust of Western Washington, Carpenters Retirement Trust of Western Washington, Carpenters-Employers Apprenticeship and Training Trust of Western Washington, Carpenters-Employers Vacation Trust of Western Washington. (Maxwell, Jeffrey) |
|
5 | 5
respoth
Answer to Writ of Garnishment
Wed 08/29 7:54 AM
ANSWER to Writ of Garnishment First Answer by Carpenters Health and Security Trust of Western Washington, Carpenters Retirement Trust of Western Washington, Carpenters-Employers Apprenticeship and Training Trust of Western Washington, Carpenters-Employers Vacation Trust of Western Washington. (Maxwell, Jeffrey) |
|
Tuesday, August 28, 2018 | ||
4 | 4
notice
Notice of Voluntary Dismissal (case)
Tue 08/28 1:49 PM
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal of case by Plaintiffs Carpenters Health and Security Trust of Western Washington, Carpenters Retirement Trust of Western Washington, Carpenters-Employers Apprenticeship and Training Trust of Western Washington, Carpenters-Employers Vacation Trust of Western Washington (Maxwell, Jeffrey) |
|
Tuesday, June 12, 2018 | ||
3 | 3
order
Writ Issued
Tue 06/12 12:09 PM
WRIT of Garnishment Electronically Issued (CDA) |
|
2 | 2
order
1 - Order
Tue 06/12 12:05 PM
ORDER TO ISSUE WRIT OF GARNISHMENT re1 Application for Writ of Garnishment, filed by Carpenters-Employers Apprenticeship and Training Trust of Western Washington, Carpenters Health and Security Trust of Western Washington, Carpenters Retirement Trust of Western Washington, Carpenters-Employers Vacation Trust of Western Washington by Judge Robert S. Lasnik. (CDA) |
|
Friday, June 08, 2018 | ||
1 | 1
cmp
Application for Writ of Garnishment
Mon 06/11 11:54 AM
APPLICATION for Writ of Garnishment against All Defendants in the amount of $ 3,204.62 , filed by Carpenters-Employers Apprenticeship and Training Trust of Western Washington, Carpenters Health and Security Trust of Western Washington, Carpenters-Employers Vacation Trust of Western Washington, Carpenters Retirement Trust of Western Washington.(CDA) |
|
Att: 1 Judgment, | ||
Att: 2 PROPOSED Order to Issue Writ of Garnishment, | ||
Att: 3 PROPOSED Writ of Garnishment, | ||
Att: 4 Email requesting new case |