Bradley v. Blake et al
Washington Western District Court | |
Judge: | Robert J Bryan |
Case #: | 3:18-cv-05462 |
Nature of Suit | 350 Torts - Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle |
Cause | 28:1332 Diversity-Personal Injury |
Case Filed: | Jun 11, 2018 |
Terminated: | Dec 04, 2019 |
Last checked: Saturday Dec 08, 2018 1:46 AM PST |
Defendant
Bonnie Blake
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Dennis Blake
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Jennifer Bradley
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 04/22/2024 11:59 PM PDT |
Wednesday, December 04, 2019 | ||
28 | 28
1
pgs
order
Order on Stipulated Motion ~Util - Terminate Case
Wed 12/04 11:54 AM
ORDER of Dismissal re27 Stipulated Motion, signed by Judge Robert J. Bryan. (TC) |
|
Tuesday, December 03, 2019 | ||
27 | 27
motion
Stipulated Motion
Tue 12/03 11:05 AM
Agreed Stipulated MOTION and ORDER OF DISMISSAL , filed by Defendant Dennis Blake. Noting Date 12/3/2019, (Sinnitt, C.) |
|
Tuesday, August 20, 2019 | ||
26 | 26
discov
Disclosure of Expert Witnesses
Tue 08/20 9:23 AM
DISCLOSURE OF EXPERT WITNESSES Filed by Defendants Bonnie Blake, Dennis Blake.(Sinnitt, C.) |
|
Thursday, May 23, 2019 | ||
25 | 25
order
RJB Minute Order Setting Trial and Pretrial Dates(FORM)
Thu 05/23 11:47 AM
THIRD AMENDED MINUTE ORDER SETTING TRIAL AND PRETRIAL DATES; Length of Trial: *SIX DAYS*. Jury Trial is set for 2/18/2020 at 09:30 AM in Courtroom A before Judge Robert J. Bryan. Expert Witness Disclosure/Reports under FRCP 26(a)(2) due by 8/22/2019, Motions due by 10/1/2019, Discovery completed by 10/21/2019, Dispositive motions due by 11/20/2019, Motions in Limine due by 1/21/2020, Pretrial Order due by 1/31/2020, Pretrial Conference set for 2/7/2020 at 08:30 AM in Courtroom A before Judge Robert J. Bryan. Trial briefs to be submitted by 2/7/2020, Proposed voir dire/jury instructions due by 2/7/2020. Entered as directed by Judge Robert J. Bryan. (TC) |
|
Wednesday, May 22, 2019 | ||
24 | 24
order
RJB Minute Order Setting Trial and Pretrial Dates(FORM)
Wed 05/22 3:15 PM
SECOND AMENDED MINUTE ORDER SETTING TRIAL AND PRETRIAL DATES; Length of Trial: *SIX DAYS*. Jury Trial is set for 2/18/2020 at 09:30 AM in Courtroom A before Judge Robert J. Bryan. Joinder of Parties due by 6/21/2019, Expert Witness Disclosure/Reports under FRCP 26(a)(2) due by 8/22/2019, Motions due by 10/1/2019, Discovery completed by 10/21/2019, Dispositive motions due by 11/20/2019, Motions in Limine due by 1/21/2020, Pretrial Order due by 2/3/2020, Pretrial Conference set for 2/10/2020 before Judge Robert J. Bryan. Trial briefs to be submitted by 2/10/2020, Proposed voir dire/jury instructions due by 2/10/2020, Authorized by Judge Robert J. Bryan. (JL) |
|
23 | 23
order
RJB Minute Order Setting Trial and Pretrial Dates(FORM)
Wed 05/22 3:07 PM
AMENDED MINUTE ORDER SETTING TRIAL AND PRETRIAL DATES; Length of Trial: *SIX DAYS*. Jury Trial is set for 2/20/2020 at 09:30 AM in Courtroom A before Judge Robert J. Bryan. Joinder of Parties due by 6/21/2019, Expert Witness Disclosure/Reports under FRCP 26(a)(2) due by 8/26/2019, Motions due by 10/3/2019, Discovery completed by 10/23/2019, Dispositive motions due by 11/22/2019, Motions in Limine due by 1/23/2020, Pretrial Order due by 2/3/2020, Pretrial Conference set for 2/10/2020 at 08:30 AM in Courtroom A before Judge Robert J. Bryan. Trial briefs to be submitted by 2/10/2020, Proposed voir dire/jury instructions due by 2/10/2020. Authorized by Judge Robert J. Bryan. (JL) |
|
22 | 22
order
RJB Minute Order Setting Trial and Pretrial Dates(FORM)
Wed 05/22 1:13 PM
MINUTE ORDER SETTING TRIAL AND PRETRIAL DATES; Length of Trial: *SIX DAYS*. Jury Trial is set for 2/20/2019 at 09:30 AM in Courtroom A before Judge Robert J. Bryan. Joinder of Parties due by 6/21/2019, Expert Witness Disclosure/Reports under FRCP 26(a)(2) due by 8/24/2018, Motions due by 10/3/2018, Discovery completed by 10/23/2018, Dispositive motions due by 11/22/2018, Motions in Limine due by 1/23/2019, Pretrial Order due by 2/4/2019, Pretrial Conference set for 2/11/2019 at 08:30 AM in Courtroom A before Judge Robert J. Bryan. Trial briefs to be submitted by 2/11/2019, Proposed voir dire/jury instructions due by 2/11/2019. Authorized by Judge Robert J. Bryan. (JL) |
|
21 | 21
order
1 - Order
Wed 05/22 1:11 PM
ORDER granting20 Stipulation filed by Dennis Blake. Signed by Judge Robert J. Bryan. (JL) |
|
Tuesday, May 21, 2019 | ||
20 | 20
misc
Stipulation
Tue 05/21 4:31 PM
STIPULATION AND PROPOSED ORDER Re: Conintuance/Joint Motion for Continuance by parties(Sinnitt, C.) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order | ||
Thursday, April 25, 2019 | ||
19 | 19
7
pgs
order
Order on Motion for Summary Judgment
Thu 04/25 1:08 PM
ORDER ON DEFENDANTS' MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT, denying13 Motion. Signed by Judge Robert J. Bryan. (JL) |
|
Thursday, April 18, 2019 | ||
18 | 18
misc
Proposed Order (Unsigned)
Thu 04/18 1:34 PM
PROPOSED ORDER (Unsigned) re15 Response to Motion, Denying Defendants Blake's Motion for Summary Judgment (Bohm, Robert) |
|
17 | 17
respm
Proposed Order (Unsigned)
Thu 04/18 10:03 AM
PROPOSED ORDER (Unsigned) re13 MOTION for Summary Judgment Dismissal (Sinnitt, C.) |
|
Wednesday, April 17, 2019 | ||
16 | 16
respm
Response to Motion
Wed 04/17 2:47 PM
RESPONSE, by Defendant Dennis Blake, to13 MOTION for Summary Judgment Dismissal .(Sinnitt, C.) |
|
Att: 1 Declaration of Dennis Blake in Support of Defendants' Reply, | ||
Att: 2 Declaration of C. Joseph Sinnitt Re: Plaintiff's Mason County Medic One Medical Records, | ||
Att: 3 Mason County Medic One Records | ||
Thursday, April 11, 2019 | ||
15 | 15
respm
Response to Motion
Thu 04/11 2:44 PM
RESPONSE, by Plaintiff Jennifer Bradley, to13 MOTION for Summary Judgment Dismissal .(Bohm, Robert) |
|
Att: 1 Supplement Declaration of Robert D. Bohm, | ||
Att: 2 Supplement Declaration of Jennifer Bradley, | ||
Att: 3 Supplement Declaration of Craig Bradley | ||
Tuesday, March 26, 2019 | ||
14 | 14
discov
Disclosure of Expert Witnesses
Tue 03/26 12:58 PM
DISCLOSURE OF EXPERT WITNESSES Filed by Defendant Dennis Blake.(Sinnitt, C.) |
|
Wednesday, March 13, 2019 | ||
13 | 13
motion
Summary Judgment
Wed 03/13 2:42 PM
MOTION for Summary Judgment Dismissal , filed by Defendant Dennis Blake. Noting Date 4/19/2019, (Sinnitt, C.) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order Granting Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment Dismissal | ||
12 | 12
2
pgs
order
Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
Wed 03/13 2:01 PM
ORDER ON MOTION FOR A CONTINUANCE, denying11 Motion. Signed by Judge Robert J. Bryan.(JL) |
|
Tuesday, March 12, 2019 | ||
11 | 11
misc
Stipulation
Tue 03/12 2:22 PM
STIPULATION AND PROPOSED ORDER of Continuance by parties(Sinnitt, C.) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order | ||
Tuesday, September 25, 2018 | ||
10 | 10
order
RJB Minute Order Setting Trial and Pretrial Dates(FORM)
Tue 09/25 8:37 AM
MINUTE ORDER SETTING TRIAL AND PRETRIAL DATES; Length of Trial: *SIX DAYS*. Jury Trial is set for 9/23/2019 at 09:30 AM in Courtroom A before Judge Robert J. Bryan. Joinder of Parties due by 10/25/2018, Expert Witness Disclosure/Reports under FRCP 26(a)(2) due by 3/27/2019, Motions due by 5/6/2019, Discovery completed by 5/28/2019, Dispositive motions due by 6/25/2019, Motions in Limine due by 8/26/2019, Pretrial Order due by 9/6/2019, Pretrial Conference set for 9/13/2019 at 08:30 AM in Courtroom A before Judge Robert J. Bryan. Trial briefs to be submitted by 9/13/2019, Proposed voir dire/jury instructions due by 9/13/2019. s/Tyler Campbell, as directed by Judge Robert J. Bryan. (TC) |
|
Att: 1 Memo | ||
Monday, September 10, 2018 | ||
9 | 9
misc
Joint Status Report
Mon 09/10 6:03 PM
JOINT STATUS REPORT signed by all parties estimated Trial Days: 6. (Bohm, Robert) |
|
Friday, August 17, 2018 | ||
8 | 8
answer
Answer to Complaint
Fri 08/17 4:11 PM
ANSWER to1 Complaint, by Dennis Blake.(Sinnitt, C.) |
|
Thursday, August 16, 2018 | ||
7 | 7
misc
Jury Demand
Thu 08/16 12:32 PM
DEMAND for JURY TRIAL by Defendants Bonnie Blake, Dennis Blake (Sinnitt, C.) |
|
Thursday, July 19, 2018 | ||
6 | 6
misc
Declaration (non motion)
Thu 07/19 8:20 AM
DECLARATION of Service by Plaintiff Jennifer Bradley (Bohm, Robert) |
|
Friday, July 06, 2018 | ||
5 | 5
notice
Notice of Appearance
Fri 07/06 3:28 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by attorney C. Joseph Sinnitt on behalf of Defendants Bonnie Blake, Dennis Blake. (Sinnitt, C.) |
|
Tuesday, June 12, 2018 | ||
4 | 4
order
Joint Status Report Order Form for District Judges
Tue 06/12 1:32 PM
ORDER REGARDING INITIAL DISCLOSURES AND JOINT STATUS REPORT. FRCP 26f Conference Deadline is 8/27/2018, Initial Disclosure Deadline is 9/4/2018, Joint Status Report due by 9/10/2018. Authorized by Judge Robert J. Bryan. (JL) |
|
3 | 3
order
Discovery and Depositions Order (FORM)
Tue 06/12 1:30 PM
ORDER REGARDING DISCOVERY AND DEPOSITIONS. Authorized by Judge Robert J. Bryan. (JL) |
|
2 | 2
service
Summons Issued
Tue 06/12 12:22 PM
(1) Summons Electronically Issued as to defendants Bonnie and Dennis Blake (CMG) |
|
utility
Add and Terminate Judges
Tue 06/12 12:20 PM
Judge Robert J. Bryan added. (CMG) |
||
motion
Motion Calendar
Tue 06/12 1:33 PM
JSR due 9/10/18. (JL) |
||
Monday, June 11, 2018 | ||
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Mon 06/11 12:55 PM
COMPLAINT against defendant(s) Dennis and Bonnie Blake Attorney Robert Dean Bohm added to party Jennifer Bradley(pty:pla), filed by Jennifer Bradley.(Bohm, Robert) |
|
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet, | ||
Att: 2 Summons |