Abraham v. Berryhill
Washington Western District Court | |
Judge: | J Richard Creatura |
Case #: | 3:18-cv-05466 |
Nature of Suit | 864 Social Security - SSID Title XVI |
Cause | 42:405 Review of HHS Decision (SSID) |
Case Filed: | Jun 11, 2018 |
Terminated: | Mar 26, 2019 |
Create an account to get the full party report for this case.
Docket last updated: 2 hours ago |
Wednesday, June 26, 2019 | ||
18 | 18
2
pgs
order
Order on Motion for Attorney Fees
Wed 06/26 3:21 PM
ORDER granting16 Plaintiff's Motion for Attorney's Fees and Expenses Pursuant to 28 USC 2412, signed by Judge J Richard Creatura. (KAM) |
|
Tuesday, June 25, 2019 | ||
17 | 17
respm
Response to Motion
Tue 06/25 2:26 PM
RESPONSE, by Defendant Commissioner of Social Security, to16 MOTION for Attorney Fees For EAJA Fees and Expenses . (Nelson, Lars) |
|
Monday, June 24, 2019 | ||
16 | 16
motion
Attorney Fees
Mon 06/24 10:11 AM
MOTION for Attorney Fees For EAJA Fees and Expenses , filed by Plaintiff Samuel B Abraham. Noting Date 7/12/2019, (Yanich, Eitan) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order, | ||
Att: 2 Declaration of Eitan Yanich, | ||
Att: 3 EAJA Time and Expenses | ||
Saturday, June 22, 2019 | ||
15 | 15
misc
Declaration (non motion)
Sat 06/22 11:30 AM
DECLARATION Regarding Net Worth and Payment of EAJA Fees of Samuel Abraham by Plaintiff Samuel B Abraham (Yanich, Eitan) |
|
Tuesday, March 26, 2019 | ||
14 | 14
order
Judgment by Court
Tue 03/26 8:37 AM
JUDGMENT BY COURT in favor of Samuel B Abraham (TW) |
|
Monday, March 25, 2019 | ||
13 | 13
18
pgs
order
Order
Tue 03/26 8:33 AM
ORDER Reversing and Remanding Defendant's Decision to Deny Benefits by Judge J Richard Creatura. (TW) |
|
Tuesday, January 22, 2019 | ||
12 | 12
misc
Brief - Reply
Tue 01/22 11:53 PM
REPLY BRIEF by Plaintiff Samuel B Abraham. (Yanich, Eitan) |
|
Tuesday, January 08, 2019 | ||
11 | 11
misc
Brief - Responsive
Tue 01/08 3:46 PM
RESPONSIVE BRIEF re10 Brief - Opening by Defendant Commissioner of Social Security. (Nelson, Lars) |
|
Tuesday, December 11, 2018 | ||
10 | 10
misc
Brief - Opening
Tue 12/11 8:24 PM
OPENING BRIEF by Plaintiff Samuel B Abraham (Yanich, Eitan) |
|
Tuesday, November 13, 2018 | ||
9 | 9
order
JRC-Social Security Briefing Schedule Order
Tue 11/13 10:46 AM
ORDER SETTING BRIEFING SCHEDULE: The Answer and Administrative Record were filed in this case on 11/9/2018. Counsel shall now conform to the following briefing schedule: Opening Brief due by 12/11/2018, Responsive Brief due by 1/8/2019, Reply Brief due by 1/22/2019, by Judge J Richard Creatura. (apb) |
|
Friday, November 09, 2018 | ||
8 | 8
sealdoc
SEALED Social Security Certified Administrative Record - Answer
Fri 11/09 10:39 AM
SEALED SOCIAL SECURITY CERTIFIED ADMINISTRATIVE RECORD-ANSWER filed by Defendant Commissioner of Social Security. (Nelson, Lars) |
|
Monday, October 22, 2018 | ||
7 | 7
notice
Notice of Appearance
Mon 10/22 1:41 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Lars Joseph Nelson on behalf of Defendant Commissioner of Social Security. (Nelson, Lars) |
|
Tuesday, September 11, 2018 | ||
6 | 6
service
Acknowledgment of Service
Tue 09/11 12:23 PM
ACKNOWLEDGEMENT OF SERVICE of summons and complaint by Plaintiff Samuel B Abraham on 09/11/2018 (Yanich, Eitan) |
|
Tuesday, June 12, 2018 | ||
5 | 5
service
Summons Issued
Tue 06/12 2:22 PM
Summons Electronically Issued as to defendant Nancy A Berryhill. (SH) |
|
4 | 4
cmp
Complaint
Tue 06/12 2:21 PM
COMPLAINT against defendant Nancy A Berryhill (Summons as provided by plaintiff to be electronically issued) , filed by Samuel B. Abraham.(SH) |
|
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet | ||
3 | 3
1
pgs
order
Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis
Tue 06/12 2:19 PM
ORDER granting1 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis signed by Judge J Richard Creatura.(SH) |
|
2 | 2
misc
Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge
Tue 06/12 10:06 AM
CONSENT filed by Plaintiff to proceed before a Magistrate Judge. (KAM) |
|
utility
Add and Terminate Judges
Tue 06/12 9:35 AM
Judge J Richard Creatura added. (CMG) |
||
Monday, June 11, 2018 | ||
1 | 1
motion
Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis
Mon 06/11 2:52 PM
MOTION for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis , filed by Samuel B. Abraham.(Yanich, Eitan) |
|
Att: 1 Complaint, | ||
Att: 2 Civil Cover Sheet, | ||
Att: 3 Summons |