Modoc v. Berryhill
Washington Western District Court | |
Judge: | Brian A Tsuchida |
Case #: | 3:18-cv-05468 |
Nature of Suit | 864 Social Security - SSID Title XVI |
Cause | 42:405 Review of HHS Decision (SSID) |
Case Filed: | Jun 11, 2018 |
Terminated: | Mar 04, 2019 |
Create an account to get the full party report for this case.
Docket last updated: 4 hours ago |
Thursday, August 26, 2021 | ||
22 | 22
appeal
Mandate of USCA
Fri 08/27 4:29 PM
MANDATE OF USCA 19-35383 as to the18 Notice of Appeal filed by Neona M Modoc. The20 Judgment from USCA takes effect this date. This constitutes the formal mandate of this Court issued pursuant to Rule 41(a) of the Federal Rules of Appellate Procedure. AFFIRMED. (GMR) |
|
Wednesday, August 18, 2021 | ||
21 | 21
appeal
Order of USCA
Wed 08/18 9:33 AM
ORDER OF USCA 19-35383 as to18 Notice of Appeal filed by Neona M Modoc. (CDA) |
|
Thursday, May 06, 2021 | ||
20 | 20
appeal
Memorandum/Opinion from USCA
Fri 05/07 8:50 AM
MEMORANDUM FROM USCA 19-35383 (NOT THE MANDATE) as to the18 Notice of Appeal filed by Neona M Modoc. AFFIRMED . (GMR) |
|
Friday, May 03, 2019 | ||
19 | 19
appeal
Time Schedule Order Appeal Number from USCA
Fri 05/03 2:25 PM
TIME SCHEDULE ORDER 19-35383 as to18 Notice of Appeal filed by Neona M Modoc (CDA) |
|
18 | 18
appeal
Notice of Appeal to Circuit
Fri 05/03 10:09 AM
NOTICE OF APPEAL to Ninth Circuit 19-35383 re16 Order by Plaintiff Neona M Modoc.(Yanich, Eitan) Modified on 5/3/2019 add CCA #(CDA) |
|
Att: 1 Representation Statement, | ||
Att: 2 Notice That No Transcript Is Needed | ||
Monday, March 04, 2019 | ||
17 | 17
order
Judgment by Court
Mon 03/04 9:05 AM
JUDGMENT BY COURT; The Commissioner's final decision is AFFIRMED and the case is DISMISSED with prejudice. (TF) |
|
16 | 16
order
1 - Order
Mon 03/04 9:02 AM
ORDER AFFIRMING THE COMMISSIONER AND DISMISSING THE CASE by Hon. Brian A Tsuchida. (TF) |
|
Thursday, February 21, 2019 | ||
15 | 15
misc
Brief - Reply
Thu 02/21 8:11 PM
REPLY BRIEF by Plaintiff Neona M Modoc. (Yanich, Eitan) |
|
Thursday, February 07, 2019 | ||
14 | 14
misc
Brief - Responsive
Thu 02/07 10:52 AM
RESPONSIVE BRIEF re13 Brief - Opening by Defendant Commissioner of Social Security. (Langkamer, Joseph) |
|
Thursday, January 10, 2019 | ||
13 | 13
misc
Brief - Opening
Thu 01/10 11:55 PM
OPENING BRIEF by Plaintiff Neona M Modoc (Yanich, Eitan) |
|
Friday, December 07, 2018 | ||
12 | 12
order
Social Security Order re Extension of Brief Deadlines
Fri 12/07 9:53 AM
ORDER FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO FILE PLAINTIFF'S OPENING BRIEF by Hon. Brian A Tsuchida. Plaintiff's Opening Brief due by 1/10/2019, Defendant's Responsive Brief due by 2/7/2019, Plaintiff's Reply Brief due by 2/21/2019. (AE) |
|
Thursday, December 06, 2018 | ||
11 | 11
motion
Extension of Time-Other
Thu 12/06 2:59 PM
MOTION for Extension of Time Unopposed , filed by Plaintiff Neona M Modoc. Noting Date 12/6/2018, (Yanich, Eitan) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order, | ||
Att: 2 Declaration of Eitan Yanich | ||
Tuesday, November 13, 2018 | ||
10 | 10
order
Social Security Order - set/reset Briefing deadlines
Tue 11/13 10:45 AM
SCHEDULING ORDER by Hon. Brian A Tsuchida. Plaintiff's Opening Brief due by 12/11/2018, Defendant's Responsive Brief due by 1/8/2019, Plaintiff's Reply Brief due by 1/22/2019. (AE) |
|
Friday, November 09, 2018 | ||
9 | 9
sealdoc
SEALED Social Security Certified Administrative Record - Answer
Fri 11/09 8:34 AM
SEALED SOCIAL SECURITY CERTIFIED ADMINISTRATIVE RECORD-ANSWER filed by Defendant Commissioner of Social Security. (Langkamer, Joseph) |
|
Friday, October 12, 2018 | ||
8 | 8
notice
Notice of Appearance
Fri 10/12 10:50 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Joseph John Langkamer on behalf of Defendant Nancy A Berryhill. (Langkamer, Joseph) |
|
Saturday, September 22, 2018 | ||
7 | 7
notice
Notice of Appearance
Sat 09/22 11:21 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Jeffrey E Staples on behalf of Defendant Nancy A Berryhill. (Staples, Jeffrey) |
|
Tuesday, September 11, 2018 | ||
6 | 6
service
Acknowledgment of Service
Tue 09/11 12:31 PM
ACKNOWLEDGEMENT OF SERVICE of summons and complaint by Plaintiff Neona M Modoc on 09/11/2018 (Yanich, Eitan) |
|
Tuesday, June 12, 2018 | ||
5 | 5
service
Summons Issued
Tue 06/12 2:38 PM
Summonses Electronically Issued as to defendant Nancy A Berryhill (TF) |
|
4 | 4
cmp
Complaint
Tue 06/12 2:36 PM
COMPLAINT against defendant Nancy A Berryhill , filed by Neona M. Modoc.(TF) |
|
3 | 3
1
pgs
order
Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis
Tue 06/12 2:34 PM
ORDER Granting Pltf's1 Application to Proceed in forma pauperis signed by Hon. Brian A Tsuchida. The Clerk shall issue summonses. (TF) |
|
2 | 2
misc
Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge
Tue 06/12 10:50 AM
CONSENT by all parties to proceed before a Magistrate Judge. Case remains assigned to Hon. Brian A. Tsuchida. (TF) |
|
utility
Add and Terminate Judges
Tue 06/12 9:51 AM
Hon. Brian A Tsuchida added. (CMG) |
||
Monday, June 11, 2018 | ||
1 | 1
motion
Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis
Mon 06/11 3:07 PM
MOTION for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis , filed by Neona M. Modoc.(Yanich, Eitan) |
|
Att: 1 Complaint, | ||
Att: 2 Civil Cover Sheet, | ||
Att: 3 Summons |