Chapman v. Berryhill
Washington Western District Court | |
Judge: | Mary Alice Theiler |
Case #: | 3:18-cv-05469 |
Nature of Suit | 863 Social Security - DIWC/DIWW (405(g)) |
Cause | 42:405 Review of HHS Decision (DIWC) |
Case Filed: | Jun 11, 2018 |
Terminated: | Feb 19, 2019 |
Create an account to get the full party report for this case.
Docket last updated: 03/27/2024 11:59 PM PDT |
Tuesday, February 19, 2019 | ||
12 | 12
order
Judgment by Court
Tue 02/19 2:04 PM
JUDGMENT BY COURT; By Order of the Court, the decision of the Commissioner is AFFIRMED. (AE) |
|
11 | 11
order
1 - Order
Tue 02/19 2:03 PM
ORDER RE: SOCIAL SECURITY DISABILITY APPEAL by Hon. Mary Alice Theiler. (AE) |
|
Tuesday, October 23, 2018 | ||
10 | 10
misc
Brief - Reply
Tue 10/23 8:49 AM
REPLY BRIEF by Plaintiff Marilyn M. Chapman. |
|
Friday, October 05, 2018 | ||
9 | 9
misc
Brief - Responsive
Fri 10/05 11:36 AM
RESPONSIVE BRIEF re8 Brief - Opening by Defendant Nancy A. Berryhill. (Mroczek, Danielle) |
|
Tuesday, September 11, 2018 | ||
8 | 8
misc
Brief - Opening
Tue 09/11 2:52 PM
OPENING BRIEF by Plaintiff Marilyn M. Chapman |
|
Monday, August 13, 2018 | ||
7 | 7
order
Social Security Order - set/reset Briefing deadlines
Mon 08/13 11:45 AM
Order: Opening Brief due by 9/11/2018, Responsive Brief due by 10/9/2018, Reply Brief due by 10/23/2018. Signed by Hon. Mary Alice Theiler. (GB) |
|
6 | 6
sealdoc
SEALED Social Security Certified Administrative Record - Answer
Mon 08/13 8:31 AM
SEALED SOCIAL SECURITY CERTIFIED ADMINISTRATIVE RECORD-ANSWER filed by Defendant Nancy A. Berryhill. (Mroczek, Danielle) |
|
Thursday, June 21, 2018 | ||
5 | 5
notice
Notice of Appearance
Thu 06/21 8:13 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Danielle R Mroczek on behalf of Defendant Nancy A. Berryhill. (Mroczek, Danielle) |
|
Wednesday, June 13, 2018 | ||
4 | 4
service
Affidavit of Service of Summons & Complaint
Wed 06/13 1:14 PM
AFFIDAVIT of Mailing of Summons and Complaint to Designated Email on 6/13/2018, filed by Plaintiff Marilyn M. Chapman. |
|
Tuesday, June 12, 2018 | ||
3 | 3
misc
Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge
Tue 06/12 10:01 AM
CONSENT by all parties to proceed before a Magistrate Judge. Case remains assigned to Hon. Mary Alice Theiler. (KMP) |
|
2 | 2
service
Summons Issued
Tue 06/12 9:58 AM
Summons Electronically Issued as to defendant Nancy A. Berryhill (CMG) |
|
utility
Add and Terminate Judges
Tue 06/12 9:56 AM
Hon. Mary Alice Theiler added. (CMG) |
||
Monday, June 11, 2018 | ||
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Mon 06/11 3:14 PM
COMPLAINT against defendant(s) Nancy A. Berryhill Attorney Todd Russell Renda added to party Marilyn M. Chapman(pty:pla), filed by Marilyn M. Chapman. |
|
Att: 1 Summons, | ||
Att: 2 Civil Cover Sheet |