GOGGINS v. FLORIDA DEPARTMENT OF CORRECTIONS
Florida Northern District Court | |
Judge: | M Casey Rodgers |
Referred: | Michael J Frank |
Case #: | 1:18-cv-00104 |
Nature of Suit | 555 Prisoner Petitions - Habeas Corpus - Prison Condition |
Cause | 28:2254 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (State) |
Case Filed: | Jun 11, 2018 |
Re-opened: | Mar 15, 2022 |
Terminated: | Apr 21, 2023 |
Defendant
SECRETARY DEPARTMENT OF CORRECTIONS
|
|
Petitioner
MARCUS LAMAR GOGGINS
|
|
Respondent
FLORIDA DEPARTMENT OF CORRECTIONS
|
Docket last updated: 05/30/2023 11:59 PM EDT |
Friday, April 21, 2023 | ||
66 | 66
order
Judgment (Signed by Clerk: Not an Opinion)
Fri 04/21 9:03 AM
CLERK'S JUDGMENT re 65 Order Adopting Report and Recommendation. Pursuant to and at the direction of the Court, it is ORDERED AND ADJUDGED that the Petition for a Writ of Habeas Corpus pursuant to 28 U.S.C. § 2254, ECF No. 1, is DENIED, and a Certificate of Appealability is DENIED. (jfj) |
|
65 | 65
11
pgs
order
Order Adopting Report and Recommendation
Fri 04/21 8:34 AM
ORDER. As to Claim 1, the Second Report and Recommendation and Petitioner's objections, are rejected as MOOT and outside the scope of remand. As to Claims 2 and 3, the Petitioner's Objections are OVERRULED, and the Magistrate Judge's Second Report and Recommendation, ECF No. 58 , is ADOPTED, as modified and incorporated by reference in this Order. The Petition for a Writ of Habeas Corpus pursuant to 28 U.S.C. § 2254, ECF No. 1 , is DENIED, and a Certificate of Appealability is DENIED. The Clerk is directed to enter judgment accordingly and close the file. Signed by JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS on 04/21/23. (jfj) |