McClellon v. Wells Fargo Advisors Financial Network, LLC et al
Washington Western District Court | |
Judge: | John C Coughenour |
Case #: | 2:18-cv-00852 |
Nature of Suit | 380 Torts - Personal Property - Other Personal Property Damage |
Cause | 28:1331 Fed. Question |
Case Filed: | Jun 12, 2018 |
Terminated: | Oct 12, 2018 |
Last checked: Sunday Dec 09, 2018 1:39 AM PST |
Defendant
Wells Fargo Advisors Financial Network, LLC
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Wells Fargo Clearing Services, LLC
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Donte McClellon
an individual 7909 - 37TH AVE S
SEATTLE, WA 98118 |
Docket last updated: 04/16/2024 11:59 PM PDT |
Tuesday, September 10, 2019 | ||
67 | 67
appeal
Mandate of USCA
Tue 09/10 4:40 PM
MANDATE OF USCA 19-35211 as to42 Notice of Appeal, filed by Donte McClellon. . A review of the docket demonstrates that appellant has failed to respond to the July 31, 2019 order of this court. Pursuant to Ninth Circuit Rule 42-1, this appeal is dismissed for failure to prosecute. This order served on the district court shall, 21 days after the date of the order, act as the mandate of this court. (CDA) |