CURRY v. KNICHEL
Florida Northern District Court | |
Judge: | Mark E Walker |
Referred: | Charles A Stampelos |
Case #: | 4:18-cv-00280 |
Nature of Suit | 555 Prisoner Petitions - Habeas Corpus - Prison Condition |
Cause | 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights |
Case Filed: | Jun 11, 2018 |
Terminated: | Apr 02, 2019 |
Defendant
C KNICHEL
|
|
Plaintiff
EDWARD D CURRY
|
Docket last updated: 05/30/2023 11:59 PM EDT |
Tuesday, April 02, 2019 | ||
12 | 12
order
Judgment (Signed by Clerk: Not an Opinion)
Tue 04/02 2:50 PM
CLERK'S JUDGMENT pursuant to 11 Order Accepting and Adopting Report and Recommendation. 90 Day Exhibit Return Deadline set for 7/1/2019 (rcb) |
|
11 | 11
1
pgs
order
Order Adopting Report and Recommendation Order on Report and Recommendation
Tue 04/02 2:43 PM
ORDER ACCEPTING AND ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION. The 10 report and recommendation is accepted and adopted as this Court's opinion. The Clerk shall enter judgment stating, "This Case is DISMISSED for failure to prosecute and failure to comply with a Court order." The Clerk shall close the file. Signed by CHIEF JUDGE MARK E WALKER on 04/02/2019. (rcb) |
|
Friday, March 29, 2019 | ||
utility
Action Required by District Judge - No NEFs in SEALED Cases
Fri 03/29 7:29 AM
ACTION REQUIRED BY DISTRICT JUDGE: Chambers of CHIEF JUDGE MARK E WALKER notified that action is needed re:10 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION. The deadline for filing Objections to the R&R has expired. No Objections have been filed. (cle) |
||
Thursday, February 28, 2019 | ||
10 | 10
motion
Report and Recommendation
Fri 03/01 3:06 PM
REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION - re: 4 Amended Complaint. It is respectfully RECOMMENDED that this case be DISMISSED for failure to prosecute and failure to comply with a Court Order. R&R flag set. Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE CHARLES A STAMPELOS on 2/28/2019. Internal deadline for referral to district judge if objections are not filed earlier: 3/28/2019 . (cle) |
|
Thursday, November 29, 2018 | ||
utility
Action Required by Magistrate Judge - No NEFs in SEALED Cases
Thu 11/29 9:16 AM
ACTION REQUIRED BY MAGISTRATE JUDGE: Chambers of MAGISTRATE JUDGE CHARLES A STAMPELOS notified that action is needed re:9 Order. The deadline to file a Service Copy of the Amended Complaint and show cause why case should not be dismissed, has expired. No service copy or response has been filed. (cle) |
||
Monday, October 29, 2018 | ||
9 | 9
2
pgs
order
Order ~Util - Set Deadlines
Mon 10/29 3:05 PM
ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE - re: 8 Order. Plaintiff has have until 11/19/2018 , to provide the Court with one identical copy of his amended complaint for service on the named Defendant and to show good cause why this case should not be dismissed for failure to timely comply with a Court Order. The Clerk of Court shall return this file upon Plaintiff's compliance with this Order, or no later than 11/19/2018 . Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE CHARLES A STAMPELOS on 10/29/2018. (cle) |
|
Friday, October 26, 2018 | ||
utility
Action Required by Magistrate Judge - No NEFs in SEALED Cases
Fri 10/26 2:24 PM
ACTION REQUIRED BY MAGISTRATE JUDGE: Chambers of MAGISTRATE JUDGE CHARLES A STAMPELOS notified that action is needed Re:8 Order -- Notify Chambers no later than 10/19/2018. (kdm) |
||
Wednesday, September 19, 2018 | ||
8 | 8
3
pgs
order
Order ~Util - Set Deadlines
Thu 09/20 3:01 PM
ORDER - re: 4 Amended Complaint. Plaintiff shall have until 10/19/2018 , to provide the Court with one identical copy of his amended complaint for service on the named Defendant. The Clerk of Court shall return this file upon Plaintiff's compliance with this Order, or no later than 10/19/2018 . Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE CHARLES A STAMPELOS on 9/19/2018. (cle) |
|
Friday, September 07, 2018 | ||
utility
Action Required by Magistrate Judge - No NEFs in SEALED Cases
Fri 09/07 11:57 AM
ACTION REQUIRED BY MAGISTRATE JUDGE: Chambers of MAGISTRATE JUDGE CHARLES A STAMPELOS notified that action is needed re: 7 Filing Fee Received. (cle) |
||
Tuesday, September 04, 2018 | ||
7 | 7
misc
Filing Fee Received
Fri 09/07 9:16 AM
PARTIAL Filing fee: $ 4.00, receipt number FLN300012193. (alb) |
|
Tuesday, July 31, 2018 | ||
6 | 6
4
pgs
order
Order ~Util - Set Deadlines
Thu 08/02 10:19 AM
ORDER GRANTING IN FORMA PAUPERIS STATUS - Plaintiff's Prisoner Consent Form and Financial Certificate, construed as in forma pauperis motion, ECF No. 5 , is GRANTED to the extent Plaintiff is not required to prepay the $350.00 filing fee. Plaintiff is assessed an initial partial filing fee of $4.16. Plaintiff has until 8/31/2018 , to submit the initial partial filing fee. The Clerk of Court shall mail this Order with an appropriate cover letter to: Department of Corrections, Office of the General Counsel. The Clerk of Court shall return this file upon payment of the assessed initial partial filing fee, or no later than 8/31/2018 . Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE CHARLES A STAMPELOS on 7/31/2018. (cle) |
|
Monday, July 30, 2018 | ||
utility
Action Required by Magistrate Judge - No NEFs in SEALED Cases
Mon 07/30 1:09 PM
ACTION REQUIRED BY MAGISTRATE JUDGE: Chambers of MAGISTRATE JUDGE CHARLES A STAMPELOS notified that action is needed re:4 First Amended Complaint and5 Prisoner Consent Form & Financial Certificate. (cle) |
||
Friday, July 27, 2018 | ||
5 | 5
misc
Prisoner Consent Form and Financial Certificate
Mon 07/30 1:05 PM
PRISONER CONSENT & FINANCIAL CERTIFICATE filed by EDWARD D CURRY. (cle) |
|
4 | 4
cmp
Amended Complaint
Mon 07/30 1:00 PM
FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT against C KNICHEL, filed by EDWARD D CURRY. (cle) |
|
Tuesday, July 24, 2018 | ||
utility
Action Required by Magistrate Judge - No NEFs in SEALED Cases
Tue 07/24 1:21 PM
ACTION REQUIRED BY MAGISTRATE JUDGE: Chambers of MAGISTRATE JUDGE CHARLES A STAMPELOS notified that action is needed re:3 Order. The deadline for filing an Amended Complaint and to pay filing fee or file an IFP has expired. No pleadings have been filed. (cle) |
||
Wednesday, June 13, 2018 | ||
3 | 3
5
pgs
order
Order ~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings
Thu 06/14 7:57 AM
ORDER re 1 Complaint - The Clerk of Court shall forward to Plaintiff an application for leave to proceed in forma pauperis and a civil rights complaint form (IFP/Fee due by 7/13/2018 . First Amended Complaint/Notice of Voluntary Dismissal due by 7/13/2018 . Notify Chambers on 7/13/2018 ). Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE CHARLES A STAMPELOS on 6/13/2018. (vkm) |
|
2 | 2
notice
Notice to Pro Se
Wed 06/13 8:23 AM
Notice to Pro Se. (vkm) |
|
utility
Action Required by Magistrate Judge - No NEFs in SEALED Cases
Wed 06/13 8:25 AM
ACTION REQUIRED BY MAGISTRATE JUDGE: Chambers of MAGISTRATE JUDGE CHARLES A STAMPELOS notified that action is needed Re:1 Complaint. (vkm) |
||
Monday, June 11, 2018 | ||
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Wed 06/13 8:17 AM
COMPLAINT against C KNICHEL, filed by EDWARD D CURRY. (vkm) |