DEWITT v. AKINS et al
Florida Northern District Court | |
Judge: | Mark E Walker |
Referred: | Charles A Stampelos |
Case #: | 4:18-cv-00281 |
Nature of Suit | 555 Prisoner Petitions - Habeas Corpus - Prison Condition |
Cause | 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights |
Case Filed: | Jun 11, 2018 |
Terminated: | Jan 06, 2020 |
Defendant
A DAVIS
|
|
Defendant
AKINS
|
|
Defendant
COX
|
|
Defendant
D AKINS
|
|
Defendant
JAMIE A LEACOCK
|
|
Defendant
JANET LEACOCK
|
|
Defendant
LEACOCK
|
|
Defendant
MARTIN
|
|
Defendant
RONALD P SHORES
|
|
Defendant
SENN
|
|
Defendant
SIPLIN
|
|
Defendant
WILSON
|
|
Plaintiff
STEVEN R DEWITT
|
Docket last updated: 05/30/2023 11:59 PM EDT |
Monday, January 06, 2020 | ||
72 | 72
2
pgs
order
Order Dismissing Case
Mon 01/06 2:28 PM
ORDER. The joint stipulation of voluntary dismissal, ECF No. 71 , is ACCEPTED. This case is dismissed with prejudice pursuant to Rule 41(a)(1)(B). The Clerk of Court shall administratively close this case. Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE CHARLES A STAMPELOS on 1/6/20. (blb) |
|
utility
Action Required by Magistrate Judge - No NEFs in SEALED Cases
Mon 01/06 8:19 AM
ACTION REQUIRED BY MAGISTRATE JUDGE: Chambers of MAGISTRATE JUDGE CHARLES A STAMPELOS notified that action is needed Re:71 Stipulation of Dismissal. (blb) |
||
Friday, January 03, 2020 | ||
71 | 71
misc
Stipulation of Dismissal
Fri 01/03 2:01 PM
STIPULATION of Dismissal with prejudice by WILSON. (LONERGAN, KRISTEN) |
|
70 | 70
2
pgs
order
Order ~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings
Fri 01/03 12:20 PM
ORDER. The parties have until 2/5/2020 , to file a notice of settlement or joint stipulation of dismissal. Should such a notice not be filed, this Order notes that discoveryis no longer stayed. The Clerk of Court shall return this file upon the filing of a joint stipulation of dismissal, or no later than 2/5/2020 . Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE CHARLES A STAMPELOS on 1/3/20. (blb) |