Adeniran et al v. Bristol-Myers Squibb Company et al
Florida Northern District Court | |
Judge: | M Casey Rodgers |
Referred: | Gary R Jones |
Case #: | 3:18-cv-01406 |
Nature of Suit | 367 Torts - Personal Injury - Health Care/Pharmaceutical Personal Injury/Product Liability |
Cause | 28:1441 Petition for Removal- Product Liability |
Case Filed: | Jun 13, 2018 |
Terminated: | Nov 08, 2018 |
Last checked: Monday Dec 10, 2018 5:01 AM EST |
Defendant
OTSUKA PHARMACEUTICAL CO LTD
|
|
Defendant
OTSUKA AMERICA PHARMACEUTICAL INC
|
|
Defendant
MCKESSON CORPORATION
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
BRISTOL-MYERS SQUIBB COMPANY
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
LUCILLE ROBINSON
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
FRANK THOMAS
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
EVELYN THOMAS
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
JESSE SULLIVAN
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
KAYLA STEWART
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
BILLY RAY STEWART
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
DEREL SMITH
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
FRENCHIE SCRIVENS
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
ARMANDO SANCHEZ
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
JOHNNY SAINZ
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
GINA RODRIGUEZ
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
TOMMY THOMAS
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
BIANCA ROBINSON
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
DORIS RICHARDSON
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
ANDREA PRAGER
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
DAVENNIA POPE
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
JAMES PECK
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
DAWN FINS ACERRO
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
MARY ORNELAS
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
PAUL MOORE
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
ALMA ALFORD
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
ROBERT M BROCKLEY
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
THEO J GOMEZ
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
NORMA A YOUMANS
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
KAREN M WITHERBY
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
SHARON L WILLIAMS
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
TOBIE A SHERRILL
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
JODY M ORSO
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
CHRISTIAN T MOORE
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
JOSEPH E LEWIS
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
RODNEY D CULLORS
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
MARLENE MILLER
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
GRACIE V BERRY
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
PILLAR YOUNG
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
CHARLES YOUNG
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
INGA WHITE
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
SCOTT WEAVER
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
EDWARD VELASQUEZ
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
DAWN M. TURK
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
LEOTIST TRAMBLE
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
SHARON THOMPSON
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
BONNIE CALDERON
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
NOVA HALE
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
JAMES HAISSER
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
TIMOTHY GRIFFIN
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
AFENI GRAPHENREED
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
TESHAWN GAITHER
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
NATHAN EVERHART
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
SHANNON EDMONDS
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
TERRIE DONADIO
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
BRYANT COULTER
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
VIANIA CAMPBELL
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
MAURICE HANSON
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
CLARA BRYANT
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
MICHAEL BROWN
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
EVERARDA AISPURO
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
LISA BRASSY
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
ANNE BLANCO
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
KEVIN BIRTON
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
MARKITTA BENNETT
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
MANUEL AYAN
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
DANIEL ANDREWS
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
ANGELA LYONS
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
LISA MCNAIR
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
BERNARD ADENIRAN
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
RICKY MCCLARITY
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
TAMMY MCCARTY
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
TIM MARTINEZ
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
DUANE MARTIN
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
COLIN MARTIN
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
JEANNETTE MALDONADO
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
SHELLY MEECE
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
LUZ MARIA LOMELI VELASCO
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
SHERRION KEMP
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
LUKE KARASIUK
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
LYNN JONES
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
BEVERLY JONES
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
JULIE JOHNSTON
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
LYDIA JOHNSON
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
ALLEN HUI
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
NERISSA HARRIS
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 05/30/2023 11:59 PM EDT |
Thursday, December 27, 2018 | ||
24 | 24
misc
Acknowledgment
Thu 12/27 3:33 PM
ACKNOWLEDGMENT by Superior Court of San Francisco re23 Order. (djb) |
|
Thursday, November 08, 2018 | ||
23 | 23
25
pgs
order
Order
Tue 11/13 8:04 AM
ORDER - Re: 3:16md2734. Plaintiffs Omnibus Motion to Remand Cases to California State Courts, ECF No. 998, is GRANTED. The California cases are REMANDED. Bernard Adeniran, et al. v. Bristol-Myers Squibb Co., et al., Case No. 3:18cv1406 is REMANDED to the Superior Court of California, County of San Francisco, where it was filed at Case No. CGC-18-566226. Signed by JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS on 11/8/2018. (order mailed to county court) (djb) |
|
Monday, October 01, 2018 | ||
22 | 22
order
Stipulation and Order
Mon 10/01 1:15 PM
STIPULATION OF DISMISSAL OF NONRESIDENT PLAINTIFFS FROM CALIFORNIA ACTIONS. Signed by JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS on 10/1/2018. (Out of State Plaintiffs: None (All California Residents or California Injuries)) (djb) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A | ||
Wednesday, August 08, 2018 | ||
21 | 21
notice
Notice of Appearance
Wed 08/08 2:46 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by ROBYN C CALLAHAN on behalf of MCKESSON CORPORATION (CALLAHAN, ROBYN) |
|
Wednesday, June 27, 2018 | ||
20 | 20
notice
Notice - Other - See Separate Menu for Ntc of Appeal Options
Wed 06/27 1:46 PM
NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF COUNSEL (RYAN SCOTT GRAMACY) by BRISTOL-MYERS SQUIBB COMPANY (HILL, THOMAS) |
|
19 | 19
notice
Notice - Other - See Separate Menu for Ntc of Appeal Options
Wed 06/27 1:45 PM
NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF COUNSEL (SHARON D. MAYO) by BRISTOL-MYERS SQUIBB COMPANY (HILL, THOMAS) |
|
Thursday, June 21, 2018 | ||
18 | 18
notice
Notice of Appearance
Thu 06/21 3:41 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by THOMAS LARRY HILL on behalf of BRISTOL-MYERS SQUIBB COMPANY (HILL, THOMAS) |
|
Wednesday, June 13, 2018 | ||
17 | 17
notice
Notice - Other - See Separate Menu for Ntc of Appeal Options
Wed 06/13 10:07 AM
NOTICE Regarding Admission to Practice as to Attorneys, Sharon D. Mayo and Ryan Scott Gramacy on behalf of Bristol-Myers Squibb Company. (mailed to counsel) (djb) |
|
Att: 1 Order Attorney Instructions | ||
16 | 16
transfer
Case Transferred In - District Transfer (COURT USE ONLY)
Wed 06/13 8:25 AM
Case transferred in from District of California Northern; Case Number 4:18-cv-02620. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received. |
|
utility
Action Required by District Judge - No NEFs in SEALED Cases
Wed 06/13 8:30 AM
ACTION REQUIRED BY DISTRICT JUDGE: Chambers of CHIEF JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS notified that action is needed Re:16 Case Transferred In - District Transfer,1 Notice of Removal. (djb) |
||
Monday, June 11, 2018 | ||
15 | 15 ORDER LIFTING STAY OF CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER. The Case is transferred to the Northern District of Florida. (jjbS, COURT STAFF) [Transferred from California Northern on 6/13/2018.] | |
Friday, May 18, 2018 | ||
14 | 14 ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. GRANTING 11 MOTION TO STAY.(ndrS, COURT STAFF) [Transferred from California Northern on 6/13/2018.] | |
Thursday, May 17, 2018 | ||
13 | 13 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Bernard Adeniran (Liakos, Jennifer) [Transferred from California Northern on 6/13/2018.] | |
Wednesday, May 16, 2018 | ||
12 | 12 CLERK'S NOTICE SETTING STATUS CONFERENCE FOR REASSIGNED CIVIL CASE. Notice is hereby given that a status conference has been set for May 29, 2018, before Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr., at 2:00 p.m., in Courtroom 2, 4th Floor, 1301 Clay Street, Oakland, CA. Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (ndrS, COURT STAFF) [Transferred from California Northern on 6/13/2018.] | |
[LINK:Electronic filing error] . Re:11 MOTION to Stay All Proceedings Pending Transfer to the Abilify MDL; Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support Thereof filed by Bristol-Myers Squibb Company. Document missing suffix to Judge's Name. Counsel need not re-file document, but should reference Hon. Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. in future filings if they wish to include reference to Judge's full assignment reference. This is a text only docket entry. There is no document associated with this entry. [err400] (jjbS, COURT STAFF) [Transferred from California Northern on 6/13/2018.] | ||
Tuesday, May 15, 2018 | ||
11 | 11 MOTION to Stay All Proceedings Pending Transfer to the Abilify MDL; Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support Thereof filed by Bristol-Myers Squibb Company. Motion Hearing set for 8/16/2018 02:00 PM in Oakland, Courtroom 2, 4th Floor before Judge Haywood S Gilliam Jr.. Responses due by 5/29/2018. Replies due by 6/5/2018.(Mayo, Sharon) [Transferred from California Northern on 6/13/2018.] | |
Att: 1 Proposed Order Granting Defendant's Motion to Stay All Proceedings Pending Transfer to the Abilify MDL | ||
10 | 10 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge Haywood S Gilliam, Jr for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Kandis A. Westmore no longer assigned to the case. Signed by Executive Committee on 5/15/2018. (jmlS, COURT STAFF) [Transferred from California Northern on 6/13/2018.] | |
9 | 9 ORDER RELATING CASE to 16-cv-00254-HSG. Signed by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. on 5/15/2018. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) [Transferred from California Northern on 6/13/2018.] | |
8 | 8 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Bristol-Myers Squibb Company (Mayo, Sharon) [Transferred from California Northern on 6/13/2018.] | |
Friday, May 11, 2018 | ||
7 | 7 NOTICE by Bristol-Myers Squibb Company of Pendency of Other Action or Proceeding (Gramacy, Ryan) [Transferred from California Northern on 6/13/2018.] | |
6 | 6 CERTIFICATE of Counsel re1 Notice of Removal, by Sharon D. Mayo on behalf of Bristol-Myers Squibb Company(Mayo, Sharon) [Transferred from California Northern on 6/13/2018.] | |
Att: 1 Exhibit A, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit B | ||
Thursday, May 10, 2018 | ||
5 | 5 MOTION to Remand to State Court filed by Bernard Adeniran. Motion Hearing set for 6/21/2018 01:30 PM before Magistrate Judge Kandis A. Westmore. Responses due by 5/24/2018. Replies due by 5/31/2018.(Liakos, Jennifer) [Transferred from California Northern on 6/13/2018.] | |
Att: 1 Proposed Order Proposed Order | ||
Friday, May 04, 2018 | ||
4 | 4 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 7/31/2018. Initial Case Management Conference set for 8/7/2018 01:30 PM. (jmlS, COURT STAFF) [Transferred from California Northern on 6/13/2018.] | |
3 | 3 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Kandis A. Westmore. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening. Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 5/18/2018. (as, COURT STAFF) [Transferred from California Northern on 6/13/2018.] | |
Thursday, May 03, 2018 | ||
2 | 2 Certificate of Interested Entities by Bristol-Myers Squibb Company (Mayo, Sharon) [Transferred from California Northern on 6/13/2018.] | |
1 | 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL with jury demand from San Francisco Superior Court. Their case number is CGC-18-566226. (Filing fee $400 receipt number 0971-12324735). Filed by Bristol-Myers Squibb Company.(Mayo, Sharon) Modified on 5/4/2018 (jmlS, COURT STAFF). [Transferred from California Northern on 6/13/2018.] | |
Att: 1 (no process)Exhibit A, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit B, | ||
Att: 3 Civil Cover Sheet |