YOUNG v. AT&T MOBILITY SERVICES LLC
Florida Northern District Court | |
Judge: | M Casey Rodgers |
Referred: | Michael J Frank |
Case #: | 3:18-cv-01411 |
Nature of Suit | 445 Civil Rights - Amer w/Disabilities-Employment |
Cause | 28:1331 Fed. Question: Employment Discrimination |
Case Filed: | Jun 13, 2018 |
Terminated: | Feb 11, 2019 |
Last checked: Monday Dec 10, 2018 3:33 AM EST |
Defendant
AT&T MOBILITY SERVICES LLC
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
SHANNON L YOUNG
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 05/30/2023 11:59 PM EDT |
Thursday, February 14, 2019 | ||
15 | 15
notice
Notice of Voluntary Dismissal
Thu 02/14 2:29 PM
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by SHANNON L YOUNG (ELLIS, ADAM) |
|
Monday, February 11, 2019 | ||
14 | 14
2
pgs
order
Order Dismissing Case
Mon 02/11 3:34 PM
ORDER OF DISMISSAL. Signed by JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS on 2/11/2019. (alb) |
|
utility
Action Required by District Judge - No NEFs in SEALED Cases
Mon 02/11 9:21 AM
ACTION REQUIRED BY DISTRICT JUDGE: Chambers of JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS notified that action is needed Re:13 Mediation Report - Settled. (alb) |
||
Friday, February 08, 2019 | ||
13 | 13
misc
Mediation Report - Settled
Fri 02/08 5:39 PM
MEDIATION REPORT - Settled. (SMITH, MICHAEL) |
|
Tuesday, November 13, 2018 | ||
12 | 12
misc
Notice of Mediation re Scheduling
Tue 11/13 11:16 AM
NOTICE OF MEDIATION re Scheduling . (SMITH, MICHAEL) |
|
Wednesday, September 19, 2018 | ||
11 | 11
13
pgs
order
Order Reassigning Case
Wed 09/19 4:02 PM
ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to MAGISTRATE JUDGE MICHAEL J FRANK for all further proceedings. MAGISTRATE JUDGE GARY R JONES no longer assigned to case. **Please use the new initials MJF on all future pleadings; i.e. 3:18cv1411 MCR-MJF. Signed by CHIEF JUDGE MARK E WALKER on 9/19/2018. (erl) |
|
Wednesday, July 25, 2018 | ||
10 | 10
order
Scheduling Order Order Referring Case to Mediation
Wed 07/25 11:20 AM
FINAL SCHEDULING ORDER AND MEDIATION REFERRAL Re: 8 Report of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting : Pursuant to the parties proposal, the discovery deadline is extended to 4/1/2019 , The deadline for filing potentially dispositive motions as well as Daubert motions is 4/22/2018 , Mediation in this case must be completed on or before 4/29/2018 , the mediator or parties shall file a report 5/13/2019 . Signed by JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS on 7/25/2018. (alb) |
|
Tuesday, July 24, 2018 | ||
utility
Action Required by District Judge - No NEFs in SEALED Cases
Tue 07/24 2:05 PM
ACTION REQUIRED BY DISTRICT JUDGE: Chambers of SENIOR JUDGE ROGER VINSON notified that action is needed Re:9 Order of Recusal (alb) |
||
Monday, July 23, 2018 | ||
9 | 9
1
pgs
order
Order of Recusal
Tue 07/24 1:44 PM
ORDER OF RECUSAL. SENIOR JUDGE ROGER VINSON recused. Case reassigned to JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS for all further proceedings. Signed by SENIOR JUDGE ROGER VINSON on 7/23/2018. (alb) |
|
Friday, July 20, 2018 | ||
utility
Action Required by District Judge - No NEFs in SEALED Cases
Fri 07/20 9:02 AM
ACTION REQUIRED BY DISTRICT JUDGE: Chambers of SENIOR JUDGE ROGER VINSON notified that action is needed Re:8 Report of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (alb) |
||
Thursday, July 19, 2018 | ||
8 | 8
misc
Report of Rule 26f Planning Meeting
Thu 07/19 1:56 PM
REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (PETERSON, RALPH) |
|
Tuesday, July 17, 2018 | ||
7 | 7
notice
Notice of Appearance
Tue 07/17 10:41 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by ZAHIRA D DIAZ-VAZQUEZ on behalf of AT&T MOBILITY SERVICES LLC (DIAZ-VAZQUEZ, ZAHIRA) |
|
Tuesday, June 19, 2018 | ||
6 | 6
answer
Answer to Complaint
Tue 06/19 3:41 PM
ANSWER to Complaint by AT&T MOBILITY SERVICES LLC. (PETERSON, RALPH) |
|
5 | 5
notice
Notice of Appearance
Tue 06/19 11:40 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by ADAM JAMES ELLIS on behalf of SHANNON L YOUNG (ELLIS, ADAM) |
|
Thursday, June 14, 2018 | ||
4 | 4
order
Scheduling Order
Thu 06/14 12:53 PM
SCHEDULING ORDER : Fed.R.Civ.P. 7.1 Corporate Disclosure Statement Deadline set for 6/28/2018 . Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 7/30/2018 . Discovery due by 11/12/2018 . Signed by SENIOR JUDGE ROGER VINSON on 6/14/2018. (alb) |
|
utility
Action Required by District Judge - No NEFs in SEALED Cases
Thu 06/14 9:45 AM
ACTION REQUIRED BY DISTRICT JUDGE: Chambers of SENIOR JUDGE ROGER VINSON notified that action is needed Re:1 Notice of Removal. (See proposed ISO) (alb) |
||
Wednesday, June 13, 2018 | ||
3 | 3
misc
Corporate Disclosure Statement/Certificate of Interested Persons
Wed 06/13 10:27 AM
Corporate Disclosure Statement/Certificate of Interested Persons by AT&T MOBILITY SERVICES LLC identifying Corporate Parent CRICKET HOLDCO INC., Other Affiliate AT&T INC., Other Affiliate LEAP WIRELESS INTERNATIONAL INC, Other Affiliate LWI HOLDCO INC., Other Affiliate NEW CINGULAR WIRELESS SERVICES INC., Other Affiliate AT&T NCWS HOLDINGS INC., Other Affiliate SBC TELECOM INC., Other Affiliate BELLSOUTH MOBILE DATA INC. for AT&T MOBILITY SERVICES LLC.. (PETERSON, RALPH) |
|
2 | 2
misc
Civil Cover Sheet
Wed 06/13 10:16 AM
CIVIL COVER SHEET. (PETERSON, RALPH) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Notice of Removal
Wed 06/13 10:13 AM
NOTICE OF REMOVAL by AT&T MOBILITY SERVICES LLC from FIRST JUDICIAL CIRCUIT, ESCAMBIA COUNTY, FL, case number 2018 CA 000728. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number AFLNDC-4203044.), filed by AT&T MOBILITY SERVICES LLC. (PETERSON, RALPH) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A State Court Record, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit B Removal Notice to State Court and Plaintiff |