Massachusetts District Court
Judge:Nathaniel M Gorton
Referred: Marianne B Bowler
Case #: 1:18-cv-11237
Nature of Suit442 Civil Rights - Employment
Cause28:1331 Fed. Question: Employment Discrimination
Case Filed:Jun 13, 2018
Terminated:Apr 08, 2019
Last checked: Monday Dec 10, 2018 3:55 AM EST
Defendant
Kapa Bangura
Defendant
Home for Little Wanderers
Plaintiff
Michelle Milbry
130 Dartmouth Street # 1
Boston, MA 02119


Docket last updated: 09/17/2021 11:59 PM EDT
Tuesday, May 07, 2019
19 19 misc Mail Returned Tue 05/07 2:03 PM
Mail Returned as Undeliverable. Mail sent to Michelle Milbry. (Vieira, Leonardo)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 08, 2019
18 18 misc Copy Mailed Mon 04/08 2:35 PM
Copy re16 Order on Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim,17 Order Dismissing Case mailed to Michelle Milbry on 4/8/19. (Lima, Christine)
Related: [-]
17 17 1 pgs order Order Dismissing Case Mon 04/08 2:25 PM
Judge Nathaniel M. Gorton: ORDER entered. ORDER DISMISSING CASE(Lima, Christine)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 05, 2019
16 16 1 pgs order Order on Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim Mon 04/08 2:23 PM
Judge Nathaniel M. Gorton: ENDORSED ORDER entered granting14 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim (Lima, Christine)
Related: [-]
Monday, December 10, 2018
15 15 7 pgs respm Memorandum in Support of Motion Mon 12/10 3:39 PM
MEMORANDUM in Support re14 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by Kapa Bangura, Home for Little Wanderers.(Simon, John)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A,
Att: 2 Exhibit B
14 14 motion Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim Mon 12/10 3:38 PM
MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Kapa Bangura, Home for Little Wanderers.(Simon, John)
Related: [-]
Monday, November 19, 2018
13 13 service Summons Returned Executed Tue 11/20 7:42 AM
SUMMONS Returned Executed Kapa Bangura served on 11/19/2018, answer due 12/10/2018; Home for Little Wanderers served on 11/19/2018, answer due 12/10/2018. (McDonagh, Christina)
Related: [-]
Thursday, November 01, 2018
12 12 misc Letter/request - non-motion Mon 11/05 7:32 AM
Letter(non-motion) from Jaime Greenwood to Michelle Milbry. (McDonagh, Christina)
Related: [-]
Monday, October 01, 2018
11 11 order Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel Mon 10/01 5:01 PM
Magistrate Judge Marianne B. Bowler: ORDER entered denying8 Motion to Appoint Counsel. Considerations in determining appointment of counsel in an employment discrimination case include the merits of plaintiffs case, the plaintiffs ability to pay for private counsel, his efforts to obtain a lawyer, the availability of counsel, and the plaintiffs ability to gather the facts and deal with the issues if unassisted by counsel. SAI v. Transportation Sec. Admin., 843 F.3d 33, 36 (1st Cir. 2016) (citations omitted), cert. denied sub nom. Sai v. Transportation Sec. Admin., 137 S. Ct. 2234 (2017); Gadson v. Concord Hosp., 966 F.2d 32, 35 (1st Cir. 1992) (court considers merits of plaintiffs case, plaintiffs efforts to obtain legal representation, and plaintiffs financial ability). These considerations are not static, and are subject to reevaluation as the case proceeds. SAI v. Transportation Sec. Admin., 843 F.3d at 36. Here, it is unclear if plaintiff has made any effort to obtain private counsel. In addition, the merits of the case are not fully known at this nascent stage in the proceedings. See id. (as case proceeds, merits might well become clearer). (Bowler, Marianne)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, September 25, 2018
10 10 misc Copy Mailed Tue 09/25 9:53 AM
Copy re 9 Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge mailed to Michelle Milbry on 9/25/18. (Lima, Christine)
Related: [-]
9 9 order Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge Tue 09/25 9:53 AM
Judge Nathaniel M. Gorton: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered. REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Marianne B. Bowler Referred for: Events Only (e). Motions referred:8 MOTION to Appoint Counsel. (Lima, Christine)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, September 19, 2018
8 8 motion Appoint Counsel Wed 09/19 1:29 PM
MOTION to Appoint Counsel by Michelle Milbry.(McDonagh, Christina)
Related: [-]
Monday, August 13, 2018
7 7 service Summons Issued Mon 08/13 1:19 PM
Summons Issued as to Kapa Bangura, Home for Little Wanderers. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should download this summons, complete one for each defendant and serve it in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P. 4 and LR 4.1. Summons will be mailed to plaintiff(s) not receiving notice electronically for completion of service. (Lima, Christine)
Related: [-]
6 6 notice Notice - Other Mon 08/13 1:14 PM
NOTICE USMS SERVICE INSTRUCTIONS (PSSA, 5)
Related: [-]
Friday, August 10, 2018
5 5 1 pgs order Order Mon 08/13 12:33 PM
Judge Nathaniel M. Gorton: ORDER entered. (PSSA, 5)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, June 13, 2018
4 4 notice Notice of Case Assignment Wed 06/13 2:24 PM
ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Case Assignment. Judge Nathaniel M. Gorton assigned to case. If the trial Judge issues an Order of Reference of any matter in this case to a Magistrate Judge, the matter will be transmitted to Magistrate Judge Marianne B. Bowler. (Pacho, Arnold)
Related: [-]
3 3 order General Order 09-1 Wed 06/13 1:13 PM
General Order 09-1, dated January 6, 2009 regarding the E-Government Act and Personal Identifiers entered. (Castilla, Francis)
Related: [-]
2 2 motion Proceed In Forma Pauperis Wed 06/13 1:12 PM
MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Michelle Milbry.(Castilla, Francis)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Wed 06/13 1:10 PM
COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Michelle Milbry.(Castilla, Francis)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit,
Att: 2 Civil Cover Sheet