Henry v. Berryhill
Washington Western District Court | |
Judge: | Marsha J Pechman |
Case #: | 2:18-cv-00856 |
Nature of Suit | 863 Social Security - DIWC/DIWW (405(g)) |
Cause | 42:205 Denial Social Security Benefits |
Case Filed: | Jun 13, 2018 |
Terminated: | Dec 04, 2018 |
Create an account to get the full party report for this case.
Docket last updated: 72 minutes ago |
Tuesday, December 04, 2018 | ||
11 | 11
order
Judgment by Court
Tue 12/04 10:28 AM
JUDGMENT BY COURT: The Commissioner's final decision is AFFIRMED and this case is DISMISSED with prejudice. (PM) |
|
10 | 10
6
pgs
order
Order
Tue 12/04 10:26 AM
ORDER affirming the Commissioner's final decision and dismissing this case with prejudice. Signed by Judge Marsha J. Pechman. (PM) |
|
Wednesday, October 24, 2018 | ||
9 | 9
misc
Brief - Reply
Wed 10/24 10:11 AM
REPLY BRIEF by Plaintiff Keena V. Henry. |
|
Wednesday, October 10, 2018 | ||
8 | 8
misc
Brief - Responsive
Wed 10/10 2:27 PM
RESPONSIVE BRIEF re7 Brief - Opening by Defendant Nancy A. Berryhill. (Griffith, Heather) |
|
Wednesday, September 12, 2018 | ||
7 | 7
misc
Brief - Opening
Wed 09/12 4:28 PM
OPENING BRIEF by Plaintiff Keena V. Henry |
|
Wednesday, August 15, 2018 | ||
6 | 6
order
Social Security Order - set/reset Briefing deadlines
Wed 08/15 10:18 AM
Order: Opening Brief due by 9/12/2018, Responsive Brief due by 10/10/2018, Reply Brief due by 10/24/2018, by Judge Marsha J. Pechman. (SWT) |
|
Tuesday, August 14, 2018 | ||
5 | 5
sealdoc
SEALED Social Security Certified Administrative Record - Answer
Tue 08/14 8:07 AM
SEALED SOCIAL SECURITY CERTIFIED ADMINISTRATIVE RECORD-ANSWER filed by Defendant Nancy A. Berryhill. (Griffith, Heather) |
|
Saturday, July 14, 2018 | ||
4 | 4
notice
Notice of Appearance
Sat 07/14 11:46 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Heather L Griffith on behalf of Defendant Nancy A. Berryhill. (Griffith, Heather) |
|
Friday, June 15, 2018 | ||
3 | 3
service
Affidavit of Service of Summons & Complaint
Fri 06/15 1:16 PM
AFFIDAVIT of Mailing of Summons and Complaint to Designated Email on 6/15/2018, filed by Plaintiff Keena V. Henry. |
|
Thursday, June 14, 2018 | ||
2 | 2
service
Summons Issued
Thu 06/14 3:00 PM
Summons(es) Electronically Issued as to defendant(s) Nancy A. Berryhill (SG) |
|
utility
Add and Terminate Judges
Thu 06/14 2:49 PM
Judge Marsha J. Pechman added. (SG) |
||
Wednesday, June 13, 2018 | ||
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Wed 06/13 1:03 PM
COMPLAINT against defendant(s) Nancy A. Berryhill Attorney Todd Russell Renda added to party Keena V. Henry(pty:pla), filed by Keena V. Henry. |
|
Att: 1 Summons, | ||
Att: 2 Civil Cover Sheet |