United States of America v. Huynh et al
Washington Western District Court | |
Judge: | Robert S Lasnik |
Case #: | 2:18-mc-00064 |
Case Filed: | Jun 13, 2018 |
Create an account to get the full party report for this case.
Docket last updated: 11 hours ago |
Monday, November 22, 2021 | ||
17 | 17
2
pgs
order
Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
Mon 11/22 11:32 AM
ORDER TO DISBURSE FUNDS TO DEFENDANT signed by Judge Robert S. Lasnik re granting15 Motion. (cc finance) (RE) |
|
Wednesday, October 27, 2021 | ||
16 | 16
respm
Declaration
Wed 10/27 1:15 PM
DECLARATION of Crissy Leininger filed by Plaintiff United States of America re15 MOTION United States' Motion to Disburse Funds to Defendant(Forsyth, Kyle) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A | ||
15 | 15
motion
Miscellaneous Relief
Wed 10/27 1:10 PM
MOTION United States' Motion to Disburse Funds to Defendant , filed by Plaintiff United States of America. Noting Date 11/12/2021, (Forsyth, Kyle) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order | ||
Wednesday, June 09, 2021 | ||
14 | 14
2
pgs
order
Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
Wed 06/09 9:35 AM
ORDER TERMINATING GARNISHMENT PROCEEDINGS signed by Judge Robert S. Lasnik re13 Motion (CDA) |
|
Tuesday, June 08, 2021 | ||
13 | 13
motion
Miscellaneous Relief
Tue 06/08 11:01 AM
MOTION for Application to Terminate Garnishment Proceeding (Costco Wholesale) , filed by Plaintiff United States of America. Noting Date 6/8/2021, (Forsyth, Kyle) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order | ||
Wednesday, October 24, 2018 | ||
12 | 12
3
pgs
order
Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
Wed 10/24 11:49 AM
CONTINUING GARNISHEE ORDER signed by Judge Robert S. Lasnik re:8 Motion.(GT) |
|
11 | 11
notice
Notice of Withdrawal of Counsel
Wed 10/24 9:10 AM
NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF COUNSEL: Attorney Kerry Jane Keefe for Plaintiff United States of America. (Keefe, Kerry) |
|
Tuesday, October 23, 2018 | ||
10 | 10
notice
Notice of Appearance
Tue 10/23 3:57 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Kyle A. Forsyth on behalf of Plaintiff United States of America. (Forsyth, Kyle) |
|
Wednesday, September 26, 2018 | ||
9 | 9
respm
Declaration
Wed 09/26 3:57 PM
DECLARATION of Dawn Fernandez filed by Plaintiff United States of America re8 MOTION to Issue Continuing Garnishee Order (Garnishee Costco Wholesale)(Keefe, Kerry) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A | ||
8 | 8
motion
Miscellaneous Relief
Wed 09/26 3:56 PM
MOTION to Issue Continuing Garnishee Order (Garnishee Costco Wholesale) , filed by Plaintiff United States of America. Noting Date 10/12/2018, (Keefe, Kerry) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order | ||
7 | 7
notice
Notice of Attorney Association
Wed 09/26 3:54 PM
NOTICE of Association of Attorney by Kerry Jane Keefe on behalf of Plaintiff United States of America. (Keefe, Kerry) |
|
Tuesday, August 28, 2018 | ||
6 | 6
respoth
Answer to Writ of Garnishment
Tue 08/28 11:18 AM
FORM ANSWER OF THE GARNISHEE to Writ of Garnishment by Costco Wholesale. (Document received at intake counter from US Attorney's Office) (CDA) |
|
Thursday, June 14, 2018 | ||
5 | 5
service
Certificate of Service
Thu 06/14 11:07 AM
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Plaintiff United States of America (Forsyth, Kyle) |
|
4 | 4
notice
Notice-Other
Thu 06/14 10:20 AM
NOTICE TO DEFENDANT/JUDGMENT DEBTOR from Clerk, United States District Court (CDA) |
|
3 | 3
order
Writ Issued
Thu 06/14 10:20 AM
WRIT of Continuing Garnishment Electronically Issued (CDA) |
|
2 | 2
order
1 - Order
Thu 06/14 10:08 AM
ORDER TO ISSUE WRIT OF CONTINUING GARNISHMENT by Judge Robert S. Lasnik re1 Application for Writ of Continuing Garnishment, filed by United States of America (CDA) |
|
Wednesday, June 13, 2018 | ||
1 | 1
cmp
Application for Writ of Garnishment
Wed 06/13 10:10 AM
APPLICATION for Writ of Continuing Garnishment against defendant Nhu-Mai Thi Huynh in the amount of $ 55,030.00 (Fee waived), filed by United States of America.(CDA) |
|
Att: 1 Declaration of Dawn Fernandez in Support of Application for Writ of Continuing Garnishment, | ||
Att: 2 PROPOSED Order to Issue Writ of Continuing Garnishment, | ||
Att: 3 PROPOSED Writ of Continuing Garnishment, | ||
Att: 4 Notice to Defendant/Judgment Debtor from Clerk, United States District Court, | ||
Att: 5 Email requesting new case |