Rivera et al v. City of Lacey et al
Washington Western District Court | |
Judge: | Benjamin H Settle |
Case #: | 3:18-cv-05476 |
Nature of Suit | 440 Civil Rights - Other Civil Rights |
Cause | 42:1983 Civil Rights Act |
Case Filed: | Jun 12, 2018 |
Terminated: | Jul 09, 2018 |
Last checked: Sunday Dec 09, 2018 1:16 AM PST |
Defendant
Lacey Police Department
|
|
Defendant
Washington Cities Insurance Authority
|
|
Defendant
Scott Spence
|
|
Defendant
Andy Rider
|
|
Defendant
Cynthia Pratt
|
|
Defendant
Dusty Pierpoint
|
|
Defendant
Jim Mack
|
|
Defendant
Law Offices of Law, Lyman, Daniel, Kamerrer & Bogdanovich PS
|
|
Defendant
Donald Law
|
|
Defendant
John Justice
|
|
Defendant
Bracy DiLeonardo
|
|
Defendant
City of Lacey
|
|
Defendant
City Attorneys
|
|
Defendant
Jared Burbidge
|
|
Defendant
Ann Bennett
|
|
Defendant
Jason Barney
|
|
Defendant
Shannon Barnes
|
|
Plaintiff
Rafael Rivera
893330 STAFFORD CREEK CORRECTIONS CENTER 191 CONSTANTINE WAY
ABERDEEN, WA 98520 |
Docket last updated: 4 hours ago |
Friday, February 15, 2019 | ||
11 | 11
appeal
Mandate of USCA
Fri 02/15 4:57 PM
MANDATE of USCA 18-35627 as to7 Notice of Appeal, filed by Rafael Rivera. The judgment of this Court, entered January 24, 2019, takes effect this date. This constitutes the formal mandate of this Court issued pursuant to Rule 41(a) of the Federal Rules of Appellate Procedure. DISMISSED (CDA) |
|
Thursday, January 24, 2019 | ||
10 | 10
1
pgs
appeal
Order of USCA
Fri 01/25 2:32 PM
ORDER of USCA (NOT THE MANDATE 18-35627 as to7 Notice of Appeal, filed by Rafael Rivera. DISMISSED (CDA) |
|
Tuesday, August 07, 2018 | ||
9 | 9
2
pgs
appeal
Order of USCA
Wed 08/08 10:30 AM
ORDER of USCA 18-35627 as to7 Notice of Appeal filed by Rafael Rivera. A review of this court's docket reflects that the filing and docketing fees for this appeal remain due. Within 21 days after the date of this order, appellant shall pay to the district court the $505.00 filing and docketing fees for this appeal and file in this court proof of such payment or file in this court a motion to proceed in forma pauperis. **SEE ORDER FOR REMAINING DETAILS**(CMG) |
|
Att: 1 Form 4 - CCA financial affidavit | ||
Friday, August 03, 2018 | ||
8 | 8
appeal
Time Schedule Order Appeal Number from USCA
Mon 08/06 2:12 PM
TIME SCHEDULE ORDER/USCA CASE NUMBER 18-35627 as to the7 Notice of Appeal filed by Rafael Rivera. (GMR) |
|
Thursday, August 02, 2018 | ||
7 | 7
appeal
Notice of Appeal to Circuit
Thu 08/02 2:57 PM
NOTICE OF APPEAL to Ninth Circuit re5 Order denying the Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis and dismissing the proposed complaint, filed by Plaintiff Rafael Rivera. No filing fee received.(CMG) |
|
Att: 1 envelope | ||
Monday, July 09, 2018 | ||
6 | 6
order
Judgment by Court
Mon 07/09 3:37 PM
JUDGMENT BY COURT. (MGC) |
|
5 | 5
4
pgs
order
Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis ~Util - Terminate Case
Mon 07/09 1:03 PM
ORDER by Judge Benjamin H. Settle denying4 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis.(TG; cc mailed to plaintiff) |
|
Friday, June 29, 2018 | ||
utility
Notice to Filer
Fri 06/29 12:35 PM
NOTICE TO FILER re Docket numbers1 ,2 ,4 . The Clerk's office received these documents electronically through the DOC email box. In the future please remember, since this is not a prisoner case, you must submit your filings via United States Postal Service. (cc mailed to plaintiff with docket sheet.) (CMG) |
||
Wednesday, June 27, 2018 | ||
4 | 4
motion
Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis
Fri 06/29 12:29 PM
MOTION for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis, filed by Rafael Rivera.(CMG) |
|
Att: 1 cover letter | ||
Wednesday, June 13, 2018 | ||
2 | 2
utility
IFP Deficiency Letter
Wed 06/13 4:09 PM
LETTER mailed re IFP deficiency: - The proper IFP form was not submitted. Enclosed please find the correct IFP form to be filled out in full and returned to the Court. Filer has until 7/13/2018 to correct (CMG) |
|
Tuesday, June 12, 2018 | ||
1 | 1
misc
Application
Wed 06/13 4:03 PM
DECLARATION and APPLICATION to proceed in forma pauperis by Plaintiff Rafael Rivera.(CMG) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Civil Rights Complaint, | ||
Att: 2 Civil Cover Sheet, | ||
Att: 3 Address List |