Fraze v. Klean Long Beach, WA, LLC
Washington Western District Court | |
Judge: | Benjamin H Settle |
Case #: | 3:18-cv-05478 |
Nature of Suit | 442 Civil Rights - Employment |
Cause | 28:1332 Diversity-Employment Discrimination |
Case Filed: | Jun 13, 2018 |
Terminated: | Jun 03, 2019 |
Last checked: Monday Dec 10, 2018 12:41 AM PST |
Defendant
Klean Long Beach, WA, LLC
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Rebecca Fraze
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 6 hours ago |
Monday, June 03, 2019 | ||
21 | 21
1
pgs
order
Order on Motion to Dismiss ~Util - Terminate Case
Mon 06/03 1:28 PM
ORDER granting19 Motion to Dismiss Voluntarily. Signed by Judge Benjamin H. Settle. (MGC) |
|
Wednesday, May 29, 2019 | ||
20 | 20
respm
Proposed Order (Unsigned)
Wed 05/29 10:55 AM
PROPOSED ORDER (Unsigned) granting motion for voluntary dismissal with prejudice (Doyle, Thomas) |
|
19 | 19
motion
Dismiss
Wed 05/29 10:50 AM
MOTION to Dismiss unopposed motion for order of voluntary dismissal with prejudice , filed by Plaintiff Rebecca Fraze. (Doyle, Thomas) |
|
Monday, May 20, 2019 | ||
18 | 18
1
pgs
order
Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney ~Util - Add and Terminate Attorneys
Mon 05/20 10:59 AM
ORDER granting17 Motion to Withdraw. Attorneys Barry Alan Johnsrud and Jonathan M. Minear terminated. Signed by Judge Benjamin H. Settle. (MGC) |
|
Thursday, April 25, 2019 | ||
17 | 17
motion
Withdraw as Attorney
Thu 04/25 4:56 PM
MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney of Record , filed by Defendant Klean Long Beach, WA, LLC. Noting Date 5/10/2019, (Johnsrud, Barry) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order Granting Motion for Leave to Withdraw as Counsel of Record | ||
Friday, September 21, 2018 | ||
16 | 16
order
BHS Minute Order Setting Trial and Pretrial Dates (FORM)
Fri 09/21 10:20 AM
MINUTE ORDER SETTING TRIAL AND PRETRIAL DATES - *FIVE DAY* Jury Trial is set for 11/12/2019 at 9:00 AM in Courtroom E before Judge Benjamin H. Settle. Joinder of Parties due by 10/22/2018, Amended Pleadings due by 11/1/2018, Expert Witness Disclosure/Reports under FRCP 26(a)(2) due by 5/6/2019, Rebuttal Expert Disclosure/Reports due by 6/5/2019, Motions due by 6/17/2019, Discovery completed by 7/15/2019, Dispositive motions due by 8/14/2019, Motions in Limine due by 10/7/2019, Pretrial Order due by 10/21/2019, Voir dire/jury instructions/trial briefs due by 10/22/2019, Agreed Neutral Statement of the Case due by 10/22/2019, Deposition Designations due by 10/22/2019, Pretrial Conference set for 10/28/2019 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom E before Judge Benjamin H. Settle. Signed by Judge Benjamin H. Settle. (MGC) |
|
Monday, September 17, 2018 | ||
15 | 15
misc
Joint Status Report
Mon 09/17 4:04 PM
JOINT STATUS REPORT signed by all parties estimated Trial Days: 5. Filed by Plaintiff Rebecca Fraze.(Doyle, Thomas) |
|
14 | 14
discov
Corporate Disclosure Statement
Mon 09/17 3:22 PM
CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT identifying Corporate Parent White Rabbit Partners for Klean Long Beach, WA, LLC. Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1. Filed by Klean Long Beach, WA, LLC (Johnsrud, Barry) |
|
Friday, August 24, 2018 | ||
13 | 13
notice
Notice of Appearance
Fri 08/24 9:22 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Jonathan M. Minear on behalf of Defendant Klean Long Beach, WA, LLC. (Minear, Jonathan) |
|
Tuesday, August 07, 2018 | ||
12 | 12
order
3 - Stipulation and Order
Tue 08/07 10:32 PM
STIPULATION AND ORDER signed by Judge Benjamin H. Settle re8 Stipulation filed by Klean Long Beach, WA, LLC for an extension of time to file answer. (TG) |
|
Monday, August 06, 2018 | ||
11 | 11
answer
Answer to Complaint
Mon 08/06 3:25 PM
ANSWER to1 Complaint And Affirmative Defenses by Klean Long Beach, WA, LLC.(Johnsrud, Barry) |
|
Thursday, August 02, 2018 | ||
10 | 10
1
pgs
order
Order Reassigning Case
Thu 08/02 9:54 AM
MINUTE ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge Benjamin H. Settle for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Theresa L Fricke no longer assigned to case. By Traci Whiteley, Deputy Clerk, for Clerk William M. McCool. (TW) |
|
Monday, July 30, 2018 | ||
9 | 9
order
2 - Minute Order ~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines
Mon 07/30 9:26 AM
MINUTE ORDER Accelerating Decline Consent Due Date. Because the parties filed a Stipulated Motion to Extend Deadline for Defendant to File and Serve Answer8 prior to the decline consent deadline, the Court shall accelerate that deadline to August 3, 2018. If by that date neither party has declined consent, the Court shall deem the parties to have consented to this case being assigned to Magistrate Judge Theresa L. Fricke, whereupon the Court shall issue its ruling regarding the stipulated motion. By Traci Whiteley, Deputy Clerk, at the direction of Magistrate Judge Theresa L. Fricke. If declining consent, return the executed form by 8/3/2018. Please Note: Forms must not be electronically filed with the Court. (TW) |
|
Monday, July 23, 2018 | ||
8 | 8
misc
Stipulation
Mon 07/23 10:43 AM
STIPULATION AND PROPOSED ORDER to Extend Deadline to File Answer by parties (Johnsrud, Barry) |
|
Friday, July 20, 2018 | ||
7 | 7
notice
Notice of Appearance
Fri 07/20 10:48 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Barry Alan Johnsrud on behalf of Defendant Klean Long Beach, WA, LLC. (Johnsrud, Barry) |
|
Wednesday, July 18, 2018 | ||
6 | 6
service
Affidavit of Service of Summons & Complaint
Wed 07/18 4:19 PM
AFFIDAVIT of Service of Summons and Complaint on Klean Long Beach, WA, LLC on 7/2/2018, filed by Plaintiff Rebecca Fraze. (Doyle, Thomas) |
|
Monday, June 18, 2018 | ||
5 | 5
order
Discovery and Depositions Order (FORM)
Mon 06/18 11:33 AM
ORDER REGARDING DISCOVERY AND DEPOSITIONS by Judge Theresa L Fricke. (TW) |
|
4 | 4
order
Joint Status Report Order Form for Magistrate Judges
Mon 06/18 11:33 AM
ORDER REGARDING INITIAL DISCLOSURES, JOINT STATUS REPORT AND EARLY SETTLEMENT. Joint Status Report due by 9/17/2018, FRCP 26f Conference Deadline is 9/4/2018, Initial Disclosure Deadline is 9/10/2018, If declining consent, return the executed form by 8/17/2018. Please Note: Forms must not be electronically filed with the Court. by Judge Theresa L Fricke. (TW) |
|
3 | 3
misc
Consent Letter & Form
Mon 06/18 11:32 AM
NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT TO A US MAGISTRATE JUDGE AND CONSENT FORM. If declining consent, return the executed form by 8/17/2018. Please Note: Forms must not be electronically filed with the Court. (TW) |
|
utility
Notice to Filer- Consent
Mon 06/18 11:34 AM
***NOTICE TO PARTIES*** re3 Consent Form. This district has adopted an opt-out consent procedure. Each party will be deemed to have knowingly and voluntarily CONSENTED to proceed before the assigned Magistrate Judge UNLESS the consent form is returned by the due date indicating lack of consent. (TW) |
||
motion
Motion Calendar
Mon 06/18 11:35 AM
Joint Status Report Deadline NOTED on motion calendar; Noting Date 9/17/2018, (TW) |
||
Thursday, June 14, 2018 | ||
2 | 2
service
Summons Issued
Thu 06/14 11:51 AM
Summons Electronically Issued as to defendant Klean Long Beach, WA, LLC. (CMG) |
|
utility
Add and Terminate Judges
Thu 06/14 11:47 AM
Judge Theresa L Fricke added. (CMG) |
||
Wednesday, June 13, 2018 | ||
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Wed 06/13 3:23 PM
COMPLAINT against defendant(s) Klean Long Beach, WA, LLC with JURY DEMAND , filed by Rebecca Fraze.(Doyle, Thomas) |
|
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet, | ||
Att: 2 Summons |