KINNEY v. ESCAMBIA CORRECTIONS et al
Florida Northern District Court | |
Judge: | Lacey A Collier |
Referred: | Elizabeth M Timothy |
Case #: | 3:18-cv-01412 |
Nature of Suit | 555 Prisoner Petitions - Habeas Corpus - Prison Condition |
Cause | 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights |
Case Filed: | Jun 13, 2018 |
Terminated: | Aug 28, 2018 |
Create an account to get the full party report for this case.
Docket last updated: 05/30/2023 11:59 PM EDT |
Saturday, March 07, 2020 | ||
21 | 21
misc
Docket Annotation
Sat 03/07 9:37 AM
DOCKET ANNOTATION BY COURT: Working file destroyed pursuant to retention policy. (alb) |
|
Tuesday, August 28, 2018 | ||
20 | 20
3
pgs
order
Order Dismissing Case
Tue 08/28 3:56 PM
ORDER. In accordance with Plaintiff's notice, this action is DISMISSED without prejudice, pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 41(a)(1)(A)(i). The clerk shall close the file. Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE ELIZABETH M TIMOTHY on 8/28/2018. (sdw) |
|
Friday, August 24, 2018 | ||
19 | 19
notice
Notice of Voluntary Dismissal
Fri 08/24 4:06 PM
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by MARK W KINNEY (alb) |
|
utility
Action Required by Magistrate Judge - No NEFs in SEALED Cases
Fri 08/24 4:06 PM
ACTION REQUIRED BY MAGISTRATE JUDGE: Chambers of MAGISTRATE JUDGE ELIZABETH M TIMOTHY notified that action is needed Re:19 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal. (alb) |
||
Monday, August 20, 2018 | ||
18 | 18
4
pgs
order
Order on Motion for Summary Judgment
Mon 08/20 11:12 AM
ORDER denying 17 Plaintiff's Motion for Summary Judgment. Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE ELIZABETH M TIMOTHY on 8/20/2018. (alb) |
|
Wednesday, August 15, 2018 | ||
17 | 17
motion
Summary Judgment
Wed 08/15 3:25 PM
Petition for MOTION for Summary Judgment by MARK W KINNEY. (alb) |
|
utility
Action Required by Magistrate Judge - No NEFs in SEALED Cases
Wed 08/15 3:26 PM
ACTION REQUIRED BY MAGISTRATE JUDGE: Chambers of MAGISTRATE JUDGE ELIZABETH M TIMOTHY notified that action is needed Re:17 Petition to MOTION for Summary Judgment. Referred to ELIZABETH M TIMOTHY. (alb) |
||
Friday, August 10, 2018 | ||
16 | 16
misc
Mail Returned
Fri 08/10 2:51 PM
Mail Returned as Undeliverable, released on 7/27/2018. Mail sent to MARK W KINNEY Re:10 ORDER of Deficiency. (alb) |
|
Thursday, August 09, 2018 | ||
15 | 15
3
pgs
order
Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel
Thu 08/09 4:33 PM
ORDER denying without prejudice, 6 Motion to Appoint Counsel. Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE ELIZABETH M TIMOTHY on 8/9/2018. (alb) |
|
14 | 14
3
pgs
order
Order Directing Prisoner Payment
Thu 08/09 4:26 PM
ORDER GRANTING 2 , 9 Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis and Directing Monthly Payments be made from Prison Account of MARK W KINNEY to the extent the case may proceed without prepayment of the entire filing fee. The clerk shall not assess Plaintiff an initial partial filing fee as provided in 28 U.S.C. § 1915(b)(1)(A). However, the total filing fee in this case remains $350.00. The clerk shall MAIL a copy of this order, with the appropriate cover letter to: Escambia County Jail, Finance Department, Sheriffs Office, 2251 North Palafox Street, Pensacola, FL 32501, Attention: Whitney Lucas. (Order and letter mailed as directed). Fee status updated to in forma pauperis Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE ELIZABETH M TIMOTHY on 8/9/2018. (alb) |
|
12 | 12
2
pgs
order
Order
Thu 08/09 4:03 PM
ORDER of Deficiency Re Plaintiffs letter to the Office of Court Clerk was received by the clerk on July 31, 2018. The clerk shall file the document as a notice to the court, but no further filings will be accepted from Plaintiff unless they comply with the above requirements. The clerk shall change Plaintiff address as follows: Santa Rosa County Jail P.O. Box 7129, Milton, FL 32572. Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE ELIZABETH M TIMOTHY on 8/9/2018. (alb) |
|
Tuesday, July 31, 2018 | ||
13 | 13
notice
Notice - Other - See Separate Menu for Ntc of Appeal Options
Thu 08/09 4:05 PM
NOTICE to the Court by MARK W KINNEY. (alb) |
|
Monday, July 30, 2018 | ||
11 | 11
notice
Notice - Other - See Separate Menu for Ntc of Appeal Options
Mon 07/30 12:59 PM
NOTICE to Court by MARK W KINNEY. (djb) |
|
10 | 10
2
pgs
order
Order
Mon 07/30 12:57 PM
ORDER of Deficiency Re: Plaintiff's Letter to the Clerk of Court, was received by the clerk of court on July 27, 2018. The clerk shall file the document as a notice to the court, but no further filings will be accepted from Plaintiff unless they comply with the above requirements. Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE ELIZABETH M TIMOTHY on 7/30/2018. (djb) |
|
Friday, July 27, 2018 | ||
9 | 9
motion
Proceed In Forma Pauperis
Fri 07/27 12:17 PM
MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by MARK W KINNEY. (alb) |
|
Monday, July 16, 2018 | ||
8 | 8
misc
Prisoner Consent Form and Financial Certificate
Mon 07/16 1:44 PM
FINANCIAL CERTIFICATE by MARK W KINNEY. (alb) Modified on 7/16/2018 to correct filed date (alb). (Main Document 8 replaced on 7/16/2018) (alb) |
|
7 | 7
2
pgs
order
Order ~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings
Mon 07/16 1:39 PM
DEFICIENCY ORDER - The clerk shall docket the attachment to Plaintiffs letter as a Financial Certificate for purposes of an in forma pauperis motion. The clerk shall return the letter itself to Plaintiff without filing. The clerk shall send Plaintiff the first two pages of the in forma pauperis motion form. Plaintiff shall have 30 days in which to complete and return the two pages of the form. (Pages mailed as directed)( Miscellaneous Deadline for first 2 pages of IFP motion - 8/15/2018 .) Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE ELIZABETH M TIMOTHY on 7/16/2018. (alb) Modified on to correct title 7/16/2018 (alb) |
|
Wednesday, July 11, 2018 | ||
6 | 6
motion
Appoint Counsel
Wed 07/11 3:54 PM
PETITION FOR MOTION of Appointment of Counsel by MARK W KINNEY. (alb) |
|
utility
Action Required by Magistrate Judge - No NEFs in SEALED Cases
Wed 07/11 3:55 PM
ACTION REQUIRED BY MAGISTRATE JUDGE: Chambers of MAGISTRATE JUDGE ELIZABETH M TIMOTHY notified that action is needed Re:6 Petition for MOTION of Appointment of Counsel. Referred to ELIZABETH M TIMOTHY. (alb) |
||
Friday, June 22, 2018 | ||
5 | 5
2
pgs
order
Order
Fri 06/22 3:34 PM
DEFICIENCY ORDER. The clerk shall return the 'Petition" to Plaintiff without filing. It may be resubmitted if the above-noted deficiencies are corrected. Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE ELIZABETH M TIMOTHY on 6/22/2018. (alb) |
|
Monday, June 18, 2018 | ||
4 | 4
2
pgs
order
Order ~Util - Set Deadlines
Mon 06/18 8:55 AM
ORDER - Plaintiff's 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis is DENIED. The clerk shall send Plaintiff a motion to proceed in forma pauperis and a Prisoner Consent Form and Financial Certificate. Within 30 DAYS from the date of docketing of this order Plaintiff shall (1) pay the $400.00 filing fee, or (2) submit a completed motion to proceed in forma pauperis. Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE ELIZABETH M TIMOTHY on 6/18/2018. (IFP Motion/Filing Fee due by 7/18/2018 .) (forms mailed w/order) (djb) |
|
Thursday, June 14, 2018 | ||
3 | 3
notice
Notice to Pro Se
Thu 06/14 3:20 PM
Notice to Pro Se (djb) |
|
utility
Action Required by Magistrate Judge - No NEFs in SEALED Cases
Thu 06/14 3:21 PM
ACTION REQUIRED BY MAGISTRATE JUDGE: Chambers of MAGISTRATE JUDGE ELIZABETH M TIMOTHY notified that action is needed Re:2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis (Prisoner Consent Form), re1 Complaint. Referred to ELIZABETH M TIMOTHY. (djb) |
||
Wednesday, June 13, 2018 | ||
2 | 2
motion
Proceed In Forma Pauperis
Thu 06/14 3:19 PM
MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis (Prisoner Consent Form) by MARK W KINNEY. (djb) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Thu 06/14 3:18 PM
COMPLAINT against ESCAMBIA CORRECTIONS, SANTA ROSA COUNTY JAIL, filed by MARK W KINNEY. (no service copies) (djb) |