Rudkowski v. Salon Media Group, Inc.
New York Southern District Court | |
Judge: | J Paul Oetken |
Case #: | 1:18-cv-05379 |
Nature of Suit | 820 Property Rights - Copyrights |
Cause | 17:101 Copyright Infringement |
Case Filed: | Jun 14, 2018 |
Terminated: | Sep 24, 2018 |
Last checked: Tuesday Dec 11, 2018 3:58 AM EST |
Defendant
Salon Media Group, Inc.
|
|
Plaintiff
Lukasz Rudkowski
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 04/21/2024 11:59 PM EDT |
Monday, September 24, 2018 | ||
11 | 11
misc
AO 121 Form Copyright - Case Terminated - Submitted
Mon 09/24 4:48 PM
AO 121 FORM COPYRIGHT - CASE TERMINATED- SUBMITTED. In compliance with the provisions of 17 U.S.C. 508, the Register of Copyrights is hereby advised that a final decision was rendered on 9/24/2018 in a court action filed on the following copyright(s) in the U.S. District Court Southern District of New York. Form e-mailed to Register of Copyrights. (km) |
|
10 | 10
notice
Notice of Voluntary Dismissal
Mon 09/24 4:42 PM
NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL pursuant to Rule 41(a)(1)(A)(i) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, the plaintiff(s) and or their counsel(s), hereby give notice that the above-captioned action is voluntarily dismissed, with prejudice and without costs against the defendant(s) Salon Media Group, Inc.. Document filed by Lukasz Rudkowski. Proposed document to be reviewed and processed by Clerk's Office staff (No action required by chambers). . (Dunne, Joseph) |
|
Friday, July 13, 2018 | ||
9 | 9
order
Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer
Fri 07/13 9:31 AM
ORDER granting8 Letter Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Salon Media Group, Inc. answer due 9/21/2018. GRANTED. DEFENDANT SHALL ANSWER OR OTHERWISE RESPOND TO THE COMPLAINT ON OR BEFORE SEPTEMBER 21, 2018. SO ORDERED. (HEREBY ORDERED by Judge J. Paul Oetken)(Text Only Order) (Oetken, J.) |
|
Wednesday, July 11, 2018 | ||
8 | 8
motion
Extension of Time to File Answer
Wed 07/11 5:17 PM
FIRST LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re:1 Complaint addressed to Judge J. Paul Oetken from Joseph Dunne, esq dated 07/11/2018. Document filed by Lukasz Rudkowski.(Dunne, Joseph) |
|
Thursday, July 05, 2018 | ||
7 | 7
service
Summons Returned Executed
Thu 07/05 2:57 PM
SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED Summons and Complaint served. Salon Media Group, Inc. served on 7/2/2018, answer due 7/23/2018. Service was accepted by Sean S. Mosley, authorized to accept service. Document filed by Lukasz Rudkowski. (Dunne, Joseph) |
|
Thursday, June 21, 2018 | ||
6 | 6
misc
AO 121 Form Copyright - Case Opening - Submitted
Thu 06/21 3:08 PM
AO 121 FORM COPYRIGHT - CASE OPENING - SUBMITTED. In compliance with the provisions of 17 U.S.C. 508, the Register of Copyrights is hereby advised that a court action has been filed on the following copyright(s) in the U.S. District Court Southern District of New York. Form e-mailed to Register of Copyrights. (jgo) |
|
Friday, June 15, 2018 | ||
5 | 5
service
Summons Issued
Fri 06/15 5:18 PM
ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Salon Media Group, Inc.. (jgo) |
|
notice
Case Opening Initial Assignment Notice
Fri 06/15 2:37 PM
CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge J. Paul Oetken. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at[LINK:http://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/District] . Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at[LINK:http://nysd.uscourts.gov/ecf_filing.php] . (jgo) |
||
utility
Case Designation
Fri 06/15 2:38 PM
Magistrate Judge Stewart D. Aaron is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link:[LINK:http://nysd.uscourts.gov/forms.php] . (jgo) |
||
utility
Case Designated ECF
Fri 06/15 2:39 PM
Case Designated ECF. (jgo) |
||
Thursday, June 14, 2018 | ||
4 | 4
service
Request for Issuance of Summons
Thu 06/14 2:20 PM
REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Salon Media Group, Inc., re:1 Complaint. Document filed by Lukasz Rudkowski. (Dunne, Joseph) |
|
3 | 3
misc
AO 121 Form Copyright - Notice of Submission by Attorney
Thu 06/14 2:19 PM
AO 121 FORM COPYRIGHT - NOTICE OF SUBMISSION BY ATTORNEY. AO 121 Form Copyright for case opening submitted to court for review.(Dunne, Joseph) |
|
2 | 2
misc
Civil Cover Sheet
Thu 06/14 2:19 PM
CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (Dunne, Joseph) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Thu 06/14 2:19 PM
COMPLAINT against Salon Media Group, Inc.. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number 0208-15201148)Document filed by Lukasz Rudkowski.(Dunne, Joseph) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit B, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit C, | ||
Att: 4 Exhibit D, | ||
Att: 5 Exhibit E |