BLESSEY v. WALTON COUNTY
Florida Northern District Court | |
Judge: | M Casey Rodgers |
Referred: | Charles J Kahn, Jr |
Case #: | 3:18-cv-01415 |
Nature of Suit | 440 Civil Rights - Other Civil Rights |
Cause | 18:1836(b) Civil Action to Protect Trade Secrets |
Case Filed: | Jun 14, 2018 |
Terminated: | Sep 07, 2018 |
Last checked: Tuesday Dec 11, 2018 4:42 AM EST |
Defendant
WALTON COUNTY
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
WALTER W BLESSEY, JR
314 Highland Avenue
Santa Rosa Beach, FL 32459 |
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 05/30/2023 11:59 PM EDT |
Friday, September 07, 2018 | ||
16 | 16
13
pgs
order
Order on Motion to Dismiss
Fri 09/07 6:57 PM
ORDER granting 12 Motion to Dismiss. Signed by JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS on September 7, 2018. (aow) |
|
Tuesday, August 07, 2018 | ||
utility
Action Required by District Judge - No NEFs in SEALED Cases
Tue 08/07 7:33 AM
ACTION REQUIRED BY DISTRICT JUDGE: Chambers of JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS notified that action is needed Re:15 Plaintiff's RESPONSE to Defendant's12 MOTION to Dismiss Incorporated Memorandum of Law and Request for Oral Argument filed by WALTER W BLESSEY, JR. (SAFRIET, DWAYNE) (MB) |
||
Att: 1 Exhibit A | ||
Monday, August 06, 2018 | ||
15 | 15
respm
Response to Motion
Mon 08/06 3:54 PM
RESPONSE to Motion re12 MOTION to Dismiss Incorporated Memorandum of Law and Request for Oral Argument filed by WALTER W BLESSEY, JR. (SAFRIET, DWAYNE) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A | ||
Wednesday, August 01, 2018 | ||
utility
Set Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings
Wed 08/01 7:29 AM
Reset Deadlines re:14 Order as to12 MOTION to Dismiss . (Internal deadline for referral to judge if response not filed earlier: 8/6/2018) . (djb) |
||
Tuesday, July 31, 2018 | ||
14 | 14
1
pgs
order
Order
Tue 07/31 4:58 PM
ORDER re 13 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to 12 MOTION to Dismiss PLAINTIFFS UNOPPOSED MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO RESPOND TO DEFENDANTS MOTION TO DISMISS AND INCORPORATED MEMORANDUM OF LAW filed by WALTER W BLESSEY, JR is GRANTED. Plaintiff's response/reply is due by August 6, 2018.. Signed by JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS on 7/31/2018. (bjm) |
|
13 | 13
motion
Extension of Time to File Response/Reply
Tue 07/31 12:21 PM
MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to12 MOTION to Dismiss PLAINTIFFS UNOPPOSED MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO RESPOND TO DEFENDANTS MOTION TO DISMISS AND INCORPORATED MEMORANDUM OF LAW by WALTER W BLESSEY, JR. (SAFRIET, DWAYNE) |
|
utility
Action Required by District Judge - No NEFs in SEALED Cases
Tue 07/31 12:58 PM
ACTION REQUIRED BY DISTRICT JUDGE: Chambers of JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS notified that action is needed Re:13 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response s to12 MOTION to Dismiss (djb) |
||
Thursday, July 19, 2018 | ||
12 | 12
motion
Dismiss
Thu 07/19 12:52 PM
MOTION to Dismiss by WALTON COUNTY. (Internal deadline for referral to judge if response not filed earlier: 8/2/2018) . (THERIAQUE, DAVID) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit | ||
Tuesday, July 17, 2018 | ||
11 | 11
1
pgs
order
Order ~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings
Tue 07/17 1:39 PM
ORDER granting 10 Defendant WALTON COUNTY'S Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to Respond to The Plaintiff's Complaint (until July 20, 2018). Signed by JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS on 07/17/2018. (Internal deadline for referral to judge if response not filed earlier: 7/20/2018) .) (MB) |
|
utility
Action Required by District Judge - No NEFs in SEALED Cases
Tue 07/17 8:45 AM
ACTION REQUIRED BY DISTRICT JUDGE: Chambers of JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS notified that action is needed Re:10 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer (MB) |
||
Monday, July 16, 2018 | ||
10 | 10
motion
Extension of Time to File Answer
Mon 07/16 9:51 AM
MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by WALTON COUNTY. (THERIAQUE, DAVID) |
|
9 | 9
notice
Notice of Appearance
Mon 07/16 9:49 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by DAVID ALLEN THERIAQUE on behalf of WALTON COUNTY (THERIAQUE, DAVID) |
|
Monday, June 25, 2018 | ||
8 | 8
service
Summons Returned Executed
Mon 06/25 10:07 AM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by WALTER W BLESSEY, JR. WALTON COUNTY served on 6/18/2018, answer due 7/9/2018. (SAFRIET, DWAYNE) |
|
Tuesday, June 19, 2018 | ||
7 | 7
notice
Notice of Appearance
Tue 06/19 10:04 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by MOHAMMAD OMAR JAZIL on behalf of WALTER W BLESSEY, JR (JAZIL, MOHAMMAD) |
|
Monday, June 18, 2018 | ||
6 | 6
notice
Notice of Appearance
Mon 06/18 1:09 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by WILLIAM G WARNER on behalf of WALTON COUNTY (WARNER, WILLIAM) |
|
Thursday, June 14, 2018 | ||
5 | 5
service
Summons Issued
Thu 06/14 3:19 PM
Summons Issued as to WALTON COUNTY. (MB) |
|
4 | 4
misc
Docket Annotation
Thu 06/14 3:10 PM
DOCKET ANNOTATION BY COURT: The parties in the above-referenced case were added to the docket incorrectly and will be corrected by the clerk. Party names are to be entered in all caps and without punctuation. For future reference: Please review the procedure for adding/creating new parties in the "Style Guide for Electronic Case Filing" and/or chapter 10 of the "CM/ECF Attorney User's Guide," available at www.flnd.uscourts.gov. (MB) |
|
3 | 3
notice
Notice - Other - See Separate Menu for Ntc of Appeal Options
Thu 06/14 10:30 AM
NOTICE Summons to be Issued by Walter E Blessey Jr re1 Complaint (SAFRIET, DWAYNE) |
|
2 | 2
misc
Civil Cover Sheet
Thu 06/14 10:08 AM
CIVIL COVER SHEET. (SAFRIET, DWAYNE) |
|
1 | 1
12
pgs
cmp
Complaint
Thu 06/14 10:03 AM
COMPLAINT against WALTON COUNTY ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number BFLNDC-4203968.), filed by Walter E Blessey Jr. (SAFRIET, DWAYNE) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A |