SUPERDOCK v. COMMERCIAL FURNITURE INSTALL LLC
Florida Northern District Court | |
Judge: | M Casey Rodgers |
Referred: | Elizabeth M Timothy |
Case #: | 3:18-cv-01417 |
Nature of Suit | 791 Labor - Employee Retirement Income Security Act |
Cause | 29:1104 Recovery of Benefits to Employee |
Case Filed: | Jun 14, 2018 |
Terminated: | Dec 04, 2018 |
Last checked: Tuesday Dec 11, 2018 4:44 AM EST |
Defendant
COMMERCIAL FURNITURE INSTALL LLC
3857 HOPKINS ST. STE A
PENSACOLA, FL 32505 |
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
JENNY SUPERDOCK
WESTBERRY & CONNORS 4400 BAYOU BLVD. STE 32A
PENSACOLA, FL 32503 |
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 05/30/2023 11:59 PM EDT |
Tuesday, December 04, 2018 | ||
9 | 9
misc
Docket Annotation
Tue 12/04 11:58 AM
DOCKET ANNOTATION BY COURT: Re8 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal filed by JENNY SUPERDOCK. No court action required. Case is terminated. (sdw) |
|
8 | 8
notice
Notice of Voluntary Dismissal
Tue 12/04 9:52 AM
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by JENNY SUPERDOCK (CONNORS, CLAYTON) |
|
Monday, August 27, 2018 | ||
7 | 7
7
pgs
order
Order Referring Case to Mediation ~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings
Mon 08/27 12:18 PM
FINAL SCHEDULING ORDER AND MEDIATION REFERRAL re 6 Joint Report. Dispositive Motions to be filed by 6/10/2019 . Discovery due by 5/10/2019 . Mediation to take place by 6/7/2019 . Mediation Report due by 6/21/2019 . Signed by JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS on 8/27/2018. (sdw) |
|
Monday, August 20, 2018 | ||
6 | 6
misc
Report of Rule 26f Planning Meeting
Mon 08/20 2:38 PM
REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (CONNORS, CLAYTON) |
|
utility
Action Required by District Judge - No NEFs in SEALED Cases
Mon 08/20 3:47 PM
ACTION REQUIRED BY DISTRICT JUDGE: Chambers of JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS notified that action is needed Re:6 Report of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (sdw) |
||
Thursday, July 19, 2018 | ||
5 | 5
misc
Corporate Disclosure Statement/Certificate of Interested Persons
Thu 07/19 2:06 PM
Corporate Disclosure Statement/Certificate of Interested Persons by COMMERCIAL FURNITURE INSTALL LLC. (HARRELL, DANIEL) |
|
Thursday, July 05, 2018 | ||
4 | 4
order
Scheduling Order
Thu 07/05 4:20 PM
INITIAL SCHEDULING ORDER : Fed.R.Civ.P. 7.1 Corporate Disclosure Statement Deadline set for 7/19/2018 . Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 8/20/2018 . Discovery due by 1/4/2019 . Signed by JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS on 7/5/2018. (sdw) |
|
3 | 3
answer
Answer to Complaint
Thu 07/05 3:40 PM
ANSWER to1 Complaint by COMMERCIAL FURNITURE INSTALL LLC. (HARRELL, DANIEL) |
|
utility
Action Required by District Judge - No NEFs in SEALED Cases
Thu 07/05 3:57 PM
ACTION REQUIRED BY DISTRICT JUDGE: Chambers of JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS notified that action is needed Re:3 Answer to Complaint. (please see proposed ISO) (sdw) |
||
Thursday, June 14, 2018 | ||
2 | 2
service
Summons Issued
Thu 06/14 1:52 PM
Summons Issued as to COMMERCIAL FURNITURE INSTALL LLC. (sdw) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Thu 06/14 1:41 PM
COMPLAINT against COMMERCIAL FURNITURE INSTALL LLC ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number AFLNDC-4204472.), filed by JENNY SUPERDOCK. (CONNORS, CLAYTON) |
|
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet, | ||
Att: 2 Affidavit |