Irvine v. BRISTOL-MYERS SQUIBB COMPANY et al
Florida Northern District Court | |
Judge: | M Casey Rodgers |
Referred: | Gary R Jones |
Case #: | 3:18-cv-01420 |
Nature of Suit | 367 Torts - Personal Injury - Health Care/Pharmaceutical Personal Injury/Product Liability |
Cause | 28:1332 Diversity-Product Liability |
Case Filed: | Jun 14, 2018 |
Last checked: Tuesday Dec 11, 2018 4:22 AM EST |
Defendant
BRISTOL-MYERS SQUIBB COMPANY
|
|
Defendant
OTSUKA AMERICA PHARMACEUTICAL INC
|
|
Defendant
OTSUKA PHARMACEUTICAL CO LTD
|
|
Plaintiff
CYNTHIA IRVINE
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 05/30/2023 11:59 PM EDT |
Thursday, June 28, 2018 | ||
4 | 4
motion
Appear Pro Hac Vice
Thu 06/28 4:18 PM
MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Douglas C. Monsour.( Filing fee $ 201 receipt number AFLNDC-4217602.) by CYNTHIA IRVINE. (MONSOUR, DOUGLAS) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing | ||
Friday, June 15, 2018 | ||
3 | 3
service
Summons Issued
Fri 06/15 9:15 AM
Summons Issued as to BRISTOL-MYERS SQUIBB COMPANY, OTSUKA AMERICA PHARMACEUTICAL INC, OTSUKA PHARMACEUTICAL CO LTD. (djb) |
|
2 | 2
misc
Docket Annotation
Fri 06/15 8:49 AM
DOCKET ANNOTATION BY COURT: NOTICE to Filer - The parties in the were added to the docket incorrectly and will be corrected by the clerk. Party names are to be entered in ALL CAPS and without punctuation. For future reference: Please review the procedure for adding/creating new parties in the "Style Guide for Electronic Case Filing" and/or chapter 10 of the "CM/ECF Attorney User's Guide," available at www.flnd.uscourts.gov. Re1 Complaint, filed by Cynthia Irvine (djb) |
|
Thursday, June 14, 2018 | ||
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Thu 06/14 5:11 PM
COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number AFLNDC-4204760.), filed by Cynthia Irvine. (MONSOUR, DOUGLAS) |
|
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit Summons, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit Summons, | ||
Att: 4 Exhibit Summons |