Water Tree Ventures LLC v. Giles et al
Florida Northern District Court | |
Judge: | T Kent Wetherell II |
Referred: | Charles J Kahn, Jr |
Case #: | 3:18-cv-01421 |
Nature of Suit | 840 Property Rights - Trademark |
Cause | 15:1125 Trademark Infringement (Lanham Act) |
Case Filed: | Jun 14, 2018 |
Terminated: | Mar 30, 2020 |
Last checked: Tuesday Dec 11, 2018 4:29 AM EST |
Counter Claimant
NORMAN WAID
|
Represented By
|
Counter Defendant
WATER TREE VENTURES LLC
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
AVENEL FINANCIAL GROUP INC
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
CHERYL BORSTAD
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
MITCHELL GILES
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
JEFFREY GRUBER
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
JESSICA GRUBER
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
TERRY GRUBER
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
KELLY HARDING
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
NOELLE MALONEY
298 THORNCLIFF WAY
ACKWORTH, GA 30101 |
|
Defendant
MICHAEL D PRUITT
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
RENAISSANCE SALES SOUTH LLC
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
NORMAN WAID
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
HONEST DISCOUNTS LLC
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
WATER TREE VENTURES LLC
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 05/30/2023 11:59 PM EDT |
Monday, March 30, 2020 | ||
260 | 260
1
pgs
order
Order Dismissing Case
Mon 03/30 9:50 AM
ORDER. This case is dismissed with prejudice under Fed. R. Civ. P.41(a)(1)(A)(ii). All pending motions are denied as moot, and the Clerk is directed to close the file. Signed by JUDGE T KENT WETHERELL II on 03/30/2020. (alb) |
|
Friday, March 27, 2020 | ||
259 | 259
misc
Stipulation of Dismissal
Fri 03/27 3:37 PM
STIPULATION of Dismissal (Joint) by WATER TREE VENTURES LLC. (JAENSCH, TRACEY) |
|
Monday, March 23, 2020 | ||
258 | 258
1
pgs
order
Order ~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings
Mon 03/23 9:41 AM
ORDER CANCELLING HEARING. The hearing scheduled for March 23, 2020, at 10:00 AM CST (Doc. 254 ) is cancelled based on the representations of the parties. The parties shall file a status report 14 days from the date of this Order if a stipulation of dismissal has not been filed by then. ( Status Report due by 4/6/2020 .) Signed by JUDGE T KENT WETHERELL II on 3/23/2020. (alb) Modified on 3/23/2020 copy of order emailed and mailed to Ms. Maloney. (alb) |