Mader v. Lowe's Home Centers, LLC et al
South Dakota District Court | |
Judge: | Lawrence L Piersol |
Case #: | 4:18-cv-04066 |
Nature of Suit | 442 Civil Rights - Employment |
Cause | 28:1331 Fed. Question: Employment Discrimination |
Case Filed: | Jun 14, 2018 |
Terminated: | Oct 15, 2019 |
Last checked: Tuesday Dec 11, 2018 3:42 AM CST |
Defendant
Ronald Heidzig
|
|
Defendant
Lowe's Home Centers, LLC
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Vickie Mader
|
Represented By
|
GPO
Aug 16 2019
MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER granting in part and denying in part 17 Motion for Summary Judgment. Signed by U.S. District Judge Lawrence L. Piersol on 8/16/2019. (DJP) |
Docket last updated: 1 hours ago |
Tuesday, October 15, 2019 | ||
47 | 47
order
Judgment
Wed 10/16 8:18 AM
JUDGMENT of Dismissal. Signed by U.S. District Judge Lawrence L. Piersol on 10/15/19. (JLS) |
|
Monday, October 14, 2019 | ||
46 | 46
motion
Dismiss
Mon 10/14 10:37 AM
Joint MOTION to DISMISS by Lowe's Home Centers, LLC. (Marso, Lisa) |
|
Tuesday, August 20, 2019 | ||
45 | 45
order
Scheduling Order
Tue 08/20 8:52 AM
SCHEDULING ORDER: Jury Trial set for 11/5/2019 at 09:00 AM in Sioux Falls Courtroom 1 - Room 203A before U.S. District Judge Lawrence L. Piersol. Signed by U.S. District Judge Lawrence L. Piersol on 8/19/19. (JLS) |
|
Monday, August 19, 2019 | ||
44 | 44
minutes
Pretrial Conference Motion Hearing
Mon 08/19 11:42 AM
Pretrial Conference held on 8/19/2019, Motion Hearing held on 8/19/2019 re31 MOTION IN LIMINE: Part 1: The parties' financial position; Part 2: Settlement negotiations; Part 3: Other lawsuits in which Lowe's has been involved; Part 4: Insurance; Part 5: The Court's prior rulings on any motions in limine; Part 6: filed by Lowe's Home Centers, LLC before U.S. District Judge Lawrence L. Piersol.. (Court Reporter: Jill Connelly) (DJP) |
|
43 | 43
1
pgs
order
Order on Motion to Extend Deadlines
Mon 08/19 10:31 AM
ORDER granting39 Motion to Extend Deadlines. Signed by U.S. District Judge Lawrence L. Piersol on 8/19/2019. (DJP) |
|
42 | 42
misc
Affidavit
Mon 08/19 9:34 AM
AFFIDAVIT of Lisa Marso re41 Objection . (Marso, Lisa) |
|
41 | 41
misc
Objection
Mon 08/19 9:33 AM
OBJECTION by Defendant Lowe's Home Centers, LLC re33 Witness List (Marso, Lisa) |
|
40 | 40
misc
Affidavit
Mon 08/19 9:32 AM
AFFIDAVIT of Lisa Marso re39 MOTION to Extend Deadlines & File Objections & Marso Affidavit . (Marso, Lisa) |
|
39 | 39
motion
Extend Deadlines
Mon 08/19 9:31 AM
MOTION to Extend Deadlines & File Objections & Marso Affidavit by Lowe's Home Centers, LLC. (Marso, Lisa) |
|
Friday, August 16, 2019 | ||
38 | 38
20
pgs
order
Order on Motion for Summary Judgment
Fri 08/16 2:31 PM
MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER granting in part and denying in part17 Motion for Summary Judgment. Signed by U.S. District Judge Lawrence L. Piersol on 8/16/2019. (DJP) |
|
Thursday, August 08, 2019 | ||
37 | 37
minutes
Motion Hearing
Thu 08/08 3:52 PM
Motion Hearing held on 8/8/2019 re17 MOTION for SUMMARY JUDGMENT filed by Lowe's Home Centers, LLC before U.S. District Judge Lawrence L. Piersol. (Court Reporter: Jill Connelly) (JLS) |
|
36 | 36
misc
Supplement
Thu 08/08 3:12 PM
SUPPLEMENT by Defendant Lowe's Home Centers, LLC re17 MOTION for SUMMARY JUDGMENT . (Marso, Lisa) |
|
Att: 1 Ex A - Rodgers v. North Little Rock School District, | ||
Att: 2 Ex B - Robinson v. North American Central School Bus | ||
Wednesday, August 07, 2019 | ||
35 | 35
order
Scheduling Order
Wed 08/07 10:36 AM
SCHEDULING ORDER: Motion Hearing re17 Motion for Summary Judgment set for 8/8/2019 at 01:30 PM in Sioux Falls Courtroom 1 - Room 203A before U.S. District Judge Lawrence L. Piersol. Signed by U.S. District Judge Lawrence L. Piersol on 8/6/19. (JLS) |
|
Monday, August 05, 2019 | ||
34 | 34
trial
Proposed Jury Instructions
Mon 08/05 11:48 PM
Proposed Jury Instructions by Vickie Mader .(Arends, Joel) |
|
33 | 33
trial
Witness List
Mon 08/05 9:36 PM
Witness List by Vickie Mader.(Arends, Joel) |
|
32 | 32
trial
Proposed Jury Instructions
Mon 08/05 4:10 PM
Proposed Jury Instructions by Lowe's Home Centers, LLC .(Marso, Lisa) |
|
31 | 31
motion
In Limine
Mon 08/05 4:10 PM
MOTION IN LIMINE: Part 1: The parties' financial position; Part 2: Settlement negotiations; Part 3: Other lawsuits in which Lowe's has been involved; Part 4: Insurance; Part 5: The Court's prior rulings on any motions in limine; Part 6: "Me Too" Evidence involving harassment, discrimination and incident reporting by other employees; Part 7: "Golden Rule" Arguments; Part 8: Probable testimony of any witness who is absent, unavailable, not called to testify in this case, or not allowed to testify in this case Part 9: Absence/Non-Appearance of a Defendant by Lowe's Home Centers, LLC. (Marso, Lisa) |
|
30 | 30
trial
Exhibit List
Mon 08/05 4:01 PM
Exhibit List and Witness List by Lowe's Home Centers, LLC.(Marso, Lisa) |
|
Thursday, May 09, 2019 | ||
29 | 29
misc
Declaration
Thu 05/09 4:26 PM
DECLARATION of Kristi Weber re28 Reply to Motion Response - Supplemental . (Marso, Lisa) |
|
28 | 28
respm
Reply to Motion Response
Thu 05/09 4:25 PM
REPLY to Motion Response re17 MOTION for SUMMARY JUDGMENT filed by Lowe's Home Centers, LLC. (Marso, Lisa) |
|
Wednesday, April 24, 2019 | ||
27 | 27
misc
Certificate
Wed 04/24 11:38 PM
CERTIFICATE of Service by Vickie Mader (Arends, Joel) |
|
26 | 26
respoth
Reply
Wed 04/24 11:36 PM
REPLY to18 Memorandum in Support of Motion for Summary Judgment filed by Vickie Mader. (Arends, Joel) |
|
25 | 25
misc
Certificate
Wed 04/24 4:44 PM
CERTIFICATE Certificate of Service by Vickie Mader (Arends, Joel) |
|
24 | 24
respoth
Reply
Wed 04/24 4:35 PM
REPLY to19 Statement of Material Facts filed by Vickie Mader. (Arends, Joel) |
|
Tuesday, April 23, 2019 | ||
23 | 23
2
pgs
order
Order on Motion to Amend/Correct
Tue 04/23 2:02 PM
AMENDED RULE 16 SCHEDULING ORDER granting22 Motion to Amend/Correct. Pretrial Conference set for 8/19/2019 at 11:00 AM in Sioux Falls Courtroom 1 - Room 203A before U.S. District Judge Lawrence L. Piersol. Jury Trial set for 10/1/2019 at 09:00 AM in Sioux Falls Courtroom 1 - Room 203A before U.S. District Judge Lawrence L. Piersol. Signed by U.S. District Judge Lawrence L. Piersol on 04/23/2019. (SAC) |
|
Tuesday, April 09, 2019 | ||
22 | 22
motion
Amend/Correct
Tue 04/09 2:54 PM
Unopposed MOTION to Amend/Correct14 Scheduling Order, by Lowe's Home Centers, LLC. (Marso, Lisa) |
|
Monday, April 01, 2019 | ||
21 | 21
misc
Affidavit
Mon 04/01 3:11 PM
AFFIDAVIT of Lisa Marso re17 MOTION for SUMMARY JUDGMENT ,19 Statement of Material Facts,18 Memorandum in Support of Motion . (Marso, Lisa) |
|
Att: 1 Ex A - relevant Mader depo excerpts & exhibits, | ||
Att: 2 Ex B - Heidzig Statement | ||
20 | 20
misc
Declaration
Mon 04/01 3:09 PM
DECLARATION of Kristi Weber re17 MOTION for SUMMARY JUDGMENT ,19 Statement of Material Facts,18 Memorandum in Support of Motion . (Marso, Lisa) |
|
Att: 1 Ex 1 - No Harassment Policy | ||
19 | 19
misc
Statement of Material Facts
Mon 04/01 3:07 PM
STATEMENT OF UNDISPUTED MATERIAL FACTS re17 Motion for Summary Judgment,18 Memorandum in Support of Motion by Defendant Lowe's Home Centers, LLC (Marso, Lisa) |
|
18 | 18
19
pgs
respm
Memorandum in Support of Motion
Mon 04/01 3:07 PM
MEMORANDUM in Support re17 MOTION for SUMMARY JUDGMENT filed by Lowe's Home Centers, LLC. (Marso, Lisa) |
|
17 | 17
motion
Summary Judgment
Mon 04/01 3:06 PM
MOTION for SUMMARY JUDGMENT by Lowe's Home Centers, LLC. (Marso, Lisa) |
|
Friday, December 21, 2018 | ||
16 | 16
1
pgs
order
Order on Motion for Protective Order
Fri 12/21 2:26 PM
ORDER granting15 Motion for Protective Order. Signed by U.S. District Judge Lawrence L. Piersol on 12/21/18. (SKK) |
|
Tuesday, December 18, 2018 | ||
15 | 15
motion
Protective Order
Tue 12/18 8:56 AM
Joint MOTION for Protective Order by Lowe's Home Centers, LLC. (Marso, Lisa) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit | ||
Wednesday, August 22, 2018 | ||
14 | 14
order
Scheduling Order
Wed 08/22 3:45 PM
Rule 16 SCHEDULING ORDER: Discovery due by 3/18/2019 Motions due by 4/2/2019. Pretrial Conference set for 6/17/2019 at 09:00 AM in Sioux Falls Courtroom 1 - Room 203A before U.S. District Judge Lawrence L. Piersol. Jury Trial set for 7/16/2019 at 09:00 AM in Sioux Falls Courtroom 1 - Room 203A before U.S. District Judge Lawrence L. Piersol. Signed by U.S. District Judge Lawrence L. Piersol on 8/22/18. (SLW) |
|
Wednesday, August 08, 2018 | ||
13 | 13
misc
Form 52 Report
Wed 08/08 9:01 AM
FORM 52 REPORT of Parties Planning Meeting by Vickie Mader.(Arends, Joel) |
|
Tuesday, July 31, 2018 | ||
12 | 12
3
pgs
order
Order for Discovery Report
Tue 07/31 2:53 PM
ORDER for Discovery Report and Scheduling Information. Signed by U.S. District Judge Lawrence L. Piersol on 7/31/18.(JLS) |
|
Att: 1 Letter from Judge Piersol to Counsel re Rule 26(f) | ||
11 | 11
1
pgs
order
Order on Motion to Substitute Party
Tue 07/31 2:48 PM
ORDER granting10 Motion to Substitute Party /Amend Caption. Signed by U.S. District Judge Lawrence L. Piersol on 7/31/18. (JLS) |
|
Saturday, July 21, 2018 | ||
10 | 10
motion
Substitute Party
Sat 07/21 10:43 PM
Joint MOTION to Substitute Party /Amend Caption by Vickie Mader. (Arends, Joel) |
|
Friday, July 06, 2018 | ||
9 | 9
misc
Corporate Disclosure Statement
Fri 07/06 3:14 PM
CORPORATE Disclosure Statement by Lowes Home Centers, LLC identifying Corporate Parent Lowe's Companies, Inc. for Lowes Home Centers, LLC. (Marso, Lisa) |
|
8 | 8
answer
Answer to Complaint
Fri 07/06 3:13 PM
ANSWER to 1 Complaint by Lowes Home Centers, LLC. (Marso, Lisa) |
|
7 | 7
notice
Notice of Appearance
Fri 07/06 3:12 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Lisa Hansen Marso on behalf of Lowes Home Centers, LLC. (Marso, Lisa) |
|
Wednesday, June 27, 2018 | ||
6 | 6
service
Return of Service Executed
Wed 06/27 9:57 AM
RETURN OF SERVICE Executed upon Defendant Ronald Heidzig on 6/16/18 (Arends, Joel) |
|
Monday, June 25, 2018 | ||
5 | 5
service
Return of Service Executed
Mon 06/25 12:39 PM
RETURN OF SERVICE Executed upon Defendant Lowes Home Centers, LLC on 6/15/18 (Arends, Joel) |
|
Thursday, June 14, 2018 | ||
4 | 4
service
Summons Issued
Thu 06/14 1:21 PM
Summons Issued as to Ronald Heidzig, Lowes Home Centers, LLC. 2 original summons, 3 A085s, and one Rule 73 memo delivered to plaintiff's counsel via hand-delivery to law office staff. (SLW) |
|
3 | 3
misc
Filing Fee Received
Thu 06/14 1:20 PM
Filing Fee Received from Vickie Mader. Fee Amount: $400, Receipt No.: #SDX400047177. (SLW) |
|
2 | 2
misc
Civil Cover Sheet
Thu 06/14 1:18 PM
CIVIL COVER SHEET. (SLW) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint (COURT USE ONLY)
Thu 06/14 1:18 PM
COMPLAINT with Jury Demand filed by Vickie Mader. (SLW) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A- EEOC Dismissal and Notice of RIghts |