Dunn v. Life Insurance Company of North America
Wyoming District Court | |
Judge: | Scott W Skavdahl |
Referred: | Kelly H Rankin |
Case #: | 2:18-cv-00092 |
Nature of Suit | 110 Contract - Insurance |
Cause | 28:1332 Diversity-Insurance Contract |
Case Filed: | Jun 14, 2018 |
Terminated: | Apr 01, 2019 |
Last checked: Tuesday Dec 11, 2018 2:06 AM MST |
Defendant
Life Insurance Company of North America
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Sheila Dunn
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 79 minutes ago |
Monday, April 01, 2019 | ||
27 | 27
1
pgs
order
Order on Stipulation of Dismissal
Mon 04/01 5:51 PM
ORDER GRANTING STIPULATED DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE by the Honorable Scott W Skavdahl re26 Stipulaton of Dismissal. (Court Staff, stbd) |
|
26 | 26
motion
Stipulation of Dismissal
Mon 04/01 2:52 PM
STIPULATION of Dismissal with Prejudice by Life Insurance Company of North Americapursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 41(a)(1)(A)(ii). (Little, John) |
|
Wednesday, March 06, 2019 | ||
25 | 25
notice
Notice Vacating Hearing
Wed 03/06 5:09 PM
Notice Vacating Hearing: Magistrate Status Conference set on 03/07/2019 at 9:30 A.M. has been VACATED. (Court Staff, sjlg) |
|
24 | 24
notice
Notice of Settlement
Wed 03/06 11:33 AM
NOTICE of Settlement by Plaintiff Sheila Dunn. Dismissal pleading due by 4/5/2019. (Gigax, James) |
|
Thursday, February 14, 2019 | ||
23 | 23
notice
Notice of Magistrate Judge Status Conference
Thu 02/14 10:20 AM
NOTICE of Telephonic Magistrate Judge Status Conference: Telephonic Magistrate Judge Status Conference set for 3/7/2019 09:30 AM in Judge Rankin Chambers (Room No. 2204) before Honorable Kelly H. Rankin. All parties should appear by telephone, with Plaintiff's counsel initiating the call, through a conference call operator, and connecting to the Court at 307/433-2180. Parties are advised to have their calendars on hand to assist with scheduling. (Court Staff, szf) |
|
22 | 22
minutes
Magistrate Judge Status Conference
Thu 02/14 10:16 AM
MINUTES for proceedings held before Honorable Kelly H. Rankin: Telephonic Status Conference held on 2/14/2019. The court will continue the stay and formerly vacates all existing deadlines. A further Telephonic Status Conference is set for March 7, 2019 at 9:30 a.m. before Judge Rankin. (Court Staff, szf) |
|
Tuesday, January 29, 2019 | ||
21 | 21
1
pgs
order
Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice
Tue 01/29 11:23 AM
ORDER Granting20 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice admitting Michael Douglas Mulvaney for Life Insurance Company of North America by the Honorable Kelly H. Rankin (Court Staff, szf) |
|
20 | 20
motion
Appear Pro Hac Vice
Tue 01/29 9:57 AM
MOTION REFERRED TO Judge Kelly H Rankin. MOTION for Michael D. Mulvaney to appear pro hac vice; Check not tendered; filed by Defendant Life Insurance Company of North America.(DeWald, JoAnna) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A, | ||
Att: 2 Proposed Order | ||
misc
Financial Entry
Wed 01/30 7:54 AM
FINANCIAL ENTRY: Payment of $100 received for pro hac vice fee for Michael Douglas Mulvaney. Receipt CHY030274. (Court Staff, sjk) |
||
Wednesday, January 09, 2019 | ||
19 | 19
notice
Notice of Magistrate Judge Status Conference
Wed 01/09 8:52 AM
NOTICE of Magistrate Judge Status Conference: Telephonic Magistrate Judge Status Conference set for 2/14/2019 09:30 AM in Judge Rankin Chambers (Room No. 2204) before Honorable Kelly H. Rankin. All parties should appear by telephone, with Plaintiff's counsel initiating the call, through a conference call operator, and connecting to the Court at 307/433-2180. Parties are advised to have their calendars on hand to assist with scheduling. (Court Staff, szf) |
|
18 | 18
1
pgs
order
Order on Motion to Continue (Dispositive)
Wed 01/09 8:45 AM
ORDER by the Honorable Kelly H Rankin granting in part and denying in part17 Motion to Continue (Dispositive). The Court grants the parties' request for a stay. Therefore, discovery shall be stayed for 30 days. The Court denies the parties' request for modification to the dates and deadlines set forth in the Initial Pretrial Order. The Court will address necessary modifications to the Initial Pretrial Order in a status conference at a later date. (Court Staff, sjh) |
|
Tuesday, January 08, 2019 | ||
17 | 17
motion
Continue (Dispositive)
Tue 01/08 11:57 AM
Joint MOTION to Continue (Dispositive). Requesting continuance of Pretrial Deadlines filed by Defendant Life Insurance Company of North America.(Little, John) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order | ||
misc
Motions Referred to Magistrate
Tue 01/08 12:09 PM
REFERRED to Magistrate Judge17 Joint MOTION to Continue. Requesting continuance of Pretrial Deadlines (Court Staff, scat) |
||
Thursday, December 20, 2018 | ||
16 | 16
1
pgs
order
Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice
Thu 12/20 10:37 AM
ORDER Granting15 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice admitting John A. Little, Jr for Life Insurance Company of North America by the Honorable Kelly H. Rankin (Court Staff, szf) |
|
15 | 15
motion
Appear Pro Hac Vice
Thu 12/20 9:34 AM
MOTION REFERRED TO Judge Kelly H Rankin. MOTION for John A. Little, Jr. to appear pro hac vice; Check not tendered; filed by Defendant Life Insurance Company of North America.(DeWald, JoAnna) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A, | ||
Att: 2 Proposed Order | ||
misc
Financial Entry
Fri 12/21 7:33 AM
FINANCIAL ENTRY: Payment of $100 received for pro hac vice fee for John A Little, Jr. Receipt CHY030043. (Court Staff, sjk) |
||
Wednesday, August 22, 2018 | ||
14 | 14
order
Initial Pretrial Order
Wed 08/22 2:24 PM
INITIAL PRETRIAL ORDER by the Honorable Kelly H. Rankin. Motions filing deadline 4/29/2019. Motion response deadline 5/13/2019. Replies due by 5/20/2019. Other Fact Witness Deadline 3/15/2019 Expert Witness Designation-Plaintiff deadline 1/14/2019. Expert Witness Designation-Defendant deadline 2/14/2019. Discovery due by 4/29/2019. Stipulation Deadline 6/4/2019. Motion in Limine deadline 6/4/2019. Motions in Limine Response Deadline 6/11/2019. Final Pretrial Conference set for 6/18/2019 01:00 PM in Casper Courtroom No. 2 (Room No. 204) before Honorable Scott W. Skavdahl. Jury Trial (Stacked #1/10 Days) set for 7/8/2019 09:00 AM in Casper Courtroom No. 2 (Room No. 204) before Honorable Scott W. Skavdahl. (Court Staff, szf) |
|
Monday, July 23, 2018 | ||
misc
Financial Entry
Tue 07/24 9:58 AM
FINANCIAL ENTRY: Payment of $100 received for pro hac vice fee for Shawn E McDermott. Receipt CHY029210. (Court Staff, sjk) |
||
Thursday, July 19, 2018 | ||
13 | 13
1
pgs
order
Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice
Thu 07/19 8:56 AM
ORDER Granting12 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice admitting Shawn E. McDermott for Sheila Dunn by the Honorable Kelly H. Rankin (Court Staff, szf) |
|
Wednesday, July 18, 2018 | ||
12 | 12
motion
Appear Pro Hac Vice
Wed 07/18 1:42 PM
MOTION REFERRED TO Judge Kelly H Rankin. MOTION for Shawn E. McDermott to appear pro hac vice; Check not tendered; filed by Plaintiff Sheila Dunn.(Gigax, James) |
|
Att: 1 Affidavit Affidavit, Shawn E. McDermott, | ||
Att: 2 Proposed Order proposed order for admission | ||
11 | 11
notice
Notice of IPT Conference
Wed 07/18 8:27 AM
NOTICE of Initial Pretrial Conference: Initial Pretrial Conference set for 8/22/2018 10:30 AM in Judge Rankin Chambers (Room No. 2204) before Honorable Kelly H. Rankin. All parties should appear by telephone, with Plaintiff's counsel initiating the call, through a conference call operator, and connecting to the Court at 307/433-2180. Parties are advised to have their calendars on hand to assist with scheduling. (Court Staff, szf) |
|
Monday, July 16, 2018 | ||
10 | 10
misc
Corporate Disclosure
Mon 07/16 10:56 AM
CORPORATE DISCLOSURE filed by Life Insurance Company of North America, identifying Corporate Parent Connecticut General Corporation, Other Affiliate CIGNA Holdings, Inc., Other Affiliate CIGNA Corporation for Life Insurance Company of North America.. (Englert, Jack) |
|
9 | 9
answer
Answer to Complaint
Mon 07/16 10:53 AM
ANSWER to1 Complaint with Affirmative Defenses, by Life Insurance Company of North America. (Englert, Jack) |
|
Wednesday, July 11, 2018 | ||
8 | 8
1
pgs
order
Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice
Wed 07/11 9:18 AM
ORDER by the Honorable Kelly H Rankin granting7 Motion to appear pro hac vice admitting Jack M Englert, Jr for Life Insurance Company of North America (Court Staff, sal) |
|
7 | 7
motion
Appear Pro Hac Vice
Wed 07/11 9:00 AM
MOTION REFERRED TO Judge Kelly H Rankin. MOTION for Jack M. Englert, Jr. to appear pro hac vice; Check not tendered; filed by Defendant Life Insurance Company of North America.(DeWald, JoAnna) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A, | ||
Att: 2 Proposed Order | ||
6 | 6
notice
Notice of Attorney Appearance
Wed 07/11 8:42 AM
NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by JoAnna S DeWald on behalf of Life Insurance Company of North America (DeWald, JoAnna) |
|
misc
Financial Entry
Thu 07/12 8:00 AM
FINANCIAL ENTRY: Payment of $100 received for pro hac vice fee for Jack M Englert, Jr. Receipt CHY029138. (Court Staff, sjk) |
||
Thursday, June 28, 2018 | ||
5 | 5
service
Summons Returned Executed
Thu 06/28 5:34 AM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Sheila Dunn. All Defendants (Gigax, James) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit Proof of Service | ||
Thursday, June 14, 2018 | ||
4 | 4
service
Praecipe
Thu 06/14 11:22 AM
Praecipe for Summons filed by Plaintiff Sheila Dunn, 1 issued. (Court Staff, sal) |
|
3 | 3
notice
Notice of Complexity (Non)
Thu 06/14 11:21 AM
NOTICE of complexity by Plaintiff Sheila Dunn ; this case is non-complex. (Court Staff, sal) |
|
2 | 2
notice
Notice of Attorney Appearance
Thu 06/14 11:21 AM
NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by James E Gigax on behalf of Sheila Dunn (Court Staff, sal) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Thu 06/14 11:20 AM
COMPLAINT (summons(es) issued) with Jury Demand (Filing fee ($400) paid - receipt #CHY028994) filed by Sheila Dunn. (Court Staff, sal) |
|
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet, | ||
Att: 2 Magistrate Consent |