Harris v. Anderson et al
Washington Western District Court | |
Judge: | Ricardo S Martinez |
Referred: | Mary Alice Theiler |
Case #: | 2:18-cv-00861 |
Nature of Suit | 550 Prisoner Petitions - Habeas Corpus - Civil Rights |
Cause | 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights |
Case Filed: | Jun 13, 2018 |
Terminated: | Oct 30, 2018 |
Create an account to get the full party report for this case.
Docket last updated: 1 hours ago |
Wednesday, November 14, 2018 | ||
27 | 27
misc
Mail Returned
Thu 11/15 1:20 PM
Mail addressed to Mario Lamont Harris returned as Undeliverable re26 Judgment by Court,25 Order on Report and Recommendation (TH) |
|
Tuesday, October 30, 2018 | ||
26 | 26
order
Judgment by Court
Tue 10/30 1:42 PM
JUDGMENT BY COURT: This case is dismissed without prejudice for plaintiff's failure to provide a current mailing address pursuant to Local Civil Rule (LCR) 41(b)(2). (SWT) (cc: Plaintiff via USPS) |
|
25 | 25
1
pgs
order
Order on Report and Recommendation
Tue 10/30 1:40 PM
ORDER ADOPTING23 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION; dismissing this action without prejudice, for failure to provide a current mailing address. Signed by Judge Ricardo S. Martinez. (SWT) (cc: Plaintiff via USPS) |
|
Friday, October 12, 2018 | ||
24 | 24
misc
Mail Returned
Mon 10/15 3:56 PM
Mail addressed to Mario Harris returned as Undeliverable re23 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS. (SWT) |
|
Tuesday, October 02, 2018 | ||
23 | 23
motion
Report and Recommendations
Tue 10/02 1:13 PM
REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re9 Amended Complaint filed by Mario Lamont Harris. Objections to R&R due by 10/23/2018, Noting Date 10/26/2018. A copy of this R&R has been mailed to plaintiff's last-known address on 10/02/18. Signed by Hon. Mary Alice Theiler.(GB) |
|
Att: 1 R&R Proposed Order, | ||
Att: 2 R&R Judgment | ||
Monday, August 20, 2018 | ||
22 | 22
answer
Answer to Amended Complaint
Mon 08/20 9:44 AM
ANSWER to9 Amended Complaint with JURY DEMAND by Allen, Ryan Anderson, Clark, King County, Schneider.(Van Olst, Kathleen) |
|
Thursday, August 16, 2018 | ||
21 | 21
service
Return of Service by US Marshals Office
Fri 08/17 1:30 PM
RETURN OF SERVICE by US Marshal's Office re: Personal Service on 7/30/2018 (SWT) |
|
Friday, August 03, 2018 | ||
20 | 20
misc
Waiver
Fri 08/03 10:42 AM
WAIVER Sgt. Allen by Defendants Allen, Ryan Anderson, Clark, King County, Schneider (Van Olst, Kathleen) |
|
19 | 19
misc
Waiver
Fri 08/03 10:41 AM
WAIVER Major Clark by Defendants Allen, Ryan Anderson, Clark, King County, Schneider (Van Olst, Kathleen) |
|
18 | 18
misc
Waiver
Fri 08/03 10:40 AM
WAIVER of Rhyan Anderson by Defendants Allen, Ryan Anderson, Clark, King County, Schneider (Van Olst, Kathleen) |
|
17 | 17
notice
Notice of Appearance
Fri 08/03 10:38 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Kathleen C Van Olst on behalf of Defendants Allen, Ryan Anderson, Clark, King County, Schneider. (Van Olst, Kathleen) |
|
Wednesday, July 25, 2018 | ||
16 | 16
service
Waiver of Service
Wed 07/25 2:53 PM
WAIVER OF SERVICE of summons upon defendant Jennifer Schneider mailed on 7/11/2018. (PM) |
|
15 | 15
misc
Mail Returned
Wed 07/25 2:51 PM
Mail Returned as Undeliverable re11 Order Directing Service, addressed to Ryan Anderson. (PM) |
|
Tuesday, July 24, 2018 | ||
14 | 14
misc
Mail Returned
Wed 07/25 2:22 PM
Mail Returned as Undeliverable re12 Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief addressed to Mario Lamont Harris (TH) |
|
Monday, July 23, 2018 | ||
13 | 13
misc
Mail Returned
Tue 07/24 3:34 PM
Mail Returned as Undeliverable re11 Order Directing Service,10 Order Directing Service, addressed to Mario Lamont Harris (TH) |
|
Wednesday, July 11, 2018 | ||
12 | 12
2
pgs
order
Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
Wed 07/11 3:10 PM
ORDER denying plaintiff's8 Motion to Direct Issuance of Subpoena for a Copy of the Judge's Order Placing Me on Phone Deadlock, signed by Hon. Mary Alice Theiler. (SWT) (cc: Plaintiff via USPS) |
|
11 | 11
4
pgs
order
Order Directing Service
Wed 07/11 1:31 PM
ORDER DIRECTING PERSONAL SERVICE BY UNITED STATES MARSHAL by Hon. Mary Alice Theiler. Packet with documents to be served on Chief Executive of King County forwarded to US Marshals on 7/11/2018 re9 Amended 1983 Prisoner Civil Rights Complaint. (cc: plaintiff; King County Prosecutor's Office)(ST) |
|
10 | 10
5
pgs
order
Order Directing Service
Wed 07/11 1:07 PM
ORDER DIRECTING SERVICE OF CIVIL RIGHTS COMPLAINT by Hon. Mary Alice Theiler. Served by 1st Class Mail to Ryan Anderson; Sgt. Schneider; Sgt. Allen; Major Clark on 7/11/2018 re9 Amended 1983 Prisoner Civil Rights Complaint. (cc: plaintiff; King County Prosecuting Attorney's Office)(ST) |
|
Thursday, July 05, 2018 | ||
9 | 9
cmp
Amended Complaint
Fri 07/06 12:03 PM
AMENDED 1983 PRISONER CIVIL RIGHTS COMPLAINT, filed by Mario Lamont Harris against defendant(s) Allen, Ryan Anderson, Clark, Schneider, King County.(ST) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit | ||
utility
Terminate Deadlines/Hearings
Fri 07/06 12:04 PM
***Deadlines/Hearings terminated. (ST) |
||
Monday, July 02, 2018 | ||
8 | 8
motion
Miscellaneous Relief
Mon 07/02 12:36 PM
MOTION to Direct Issuance of Subpoena for a Copy of the Judge's Order Placing Me on Phone Deadlock, filed by Plaintiff Mario Lamont Harris.(ST) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit, | ||
Att: 2 Letter from Filer | ||
Monday, June 25, 2018 | ||
7 | 7
misc
Letter
Tue 06/26 11:56 AM
LETTER from Mario Harris re King County Jail policy.(ST) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit | ||
Friday, June 22, 2018 | ||
6 | 6
order
1 - Order
Mon 06/25 11:10 AM
ORDER DECLINING TO SERVE AND GRANTING LEAVE TO AMEND by Hon. Mary Alice Theiler re5 1983 Prisoner Civil Rights Complaint filed by Mario Lamont Harris. (cc: plaintiff with blank 1983 Prisoner Civil Rights Complaint form) (ST) |
|
5 | 5
cmp
Complaint
Mon 06/25 11:07 AM
1983 PRISONER CIVIL RIGHTS COMPLAINT, filed by Mario Lamont Harris against defendant(s) Allen, Ryan Anderson, Clark, DAJD Policy, King County Policy, Schneider.(ST) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit | ||
4 | 4
2
pgs
order
Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis
Mon 06/25 11:02 AM
ORDER granting1 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis signed by Hon. Mary Alice Theiler. (cc: plaintiff; King County Jail)(ST) |
|
3 | 3
misc
Letter
Fri 06/22 3:26 PM
LETTER from Mario Harris regarding correct spelling of defendant (clerk has already corrected the party name) and attached exhibits. (SG) |
|
utility
Set/Reset Deadlines
Mon 06/25 11:11 AM
Set/Reset Deadlines: Amended Pleadings due by 7/23/2018. (ST) |
||
Thursday, June 14, 2018 | ||
2 | 2
misc
Letter
Thu 06/14 1:10 PM
LETTER to Filer re case number and Judge assignment. (SG) |
|
Wednesday, June 13, 2018 | ||
1 | 1
motion
Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis
Thu 06/14 1:09 PM
MOTION for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis, filed by Marid Lamont Harris.(SG) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed 1983 Prisoner Civil Rights Complaint, | ||
Att: 2 Prison Trust Account Statement |