Tomingas et al v. Crestbrook Insurance Company
Washington Western District Court | |
Judge: | James L Robart |
Case #: | 2:18-cv-00864 |
Nature of Suit | 110 Contract - Insurance |
Cause | 28:1332 Diversity |
Case Filed: | Jun 14, 2018 |
Terminated: | Jan 17, 2019 |
Last checked: Tuesday Dec 11, 2018 1:30 AM PST |
Defendant
Crestbrook Insurance Company
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Barbara Tomingas
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Mark Tomingas
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 11 hours ago |
Thursday, January 17, 2019 | ||
18 | 18
2
pgs
order
Order Dismissing Case
Thu 01/17 4:05 PM
ORDER OF DISMISSAL: Counsel having notified the Court of settlement of this case, and it appearing that no issue remains for the Court's determination, IT IS ORDERED that this action and all claims asserted herein are DISMISSED with prejudice and without costs to any party. In the event that settlement is not perfected, any party may move to reopen the case within 60 days of the date of this order. Any trial date and pretrial dates previously set are hereby VACATED. Signed by Judge James L. Robart. (AD) |
|
Monday, November 26, 2018 | ||
17 | 17
3
pgs
order
Order on Motion to Stay ~Util - Terminate Deadlines/Hearings ~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines
Mon 11/26 10:24 AM
ORDER granting defendant's15 Second Motion to Stay. Deadlines on11 Order Regarding Initial Disclosures, Joint Status Report and Early Settlement are STAYED until 1/8/2019. Signed by Judge James L. Robart. (SWT) |
|
Thursday, November 08, 2018 | ||
16 | 16
misc
Praecipe to Attach Document
Thu 11/08 4:29 PM
PRAECIPE to attach document (Proposed Order) re15 Second MOTION to Stay re14 Order on Stipulated Motion, Case Stayed, Set Deadlines by Defendant Crestbrook Insurance Company (Stewart, Miles) |
|
15 | 15
motion
Stay
Thu 11/08 4:17 PM
Second MOTION to Stay re14 Order on Stipulated Motion, Case Stayed, Set Deadlines , filed by Defendant Crestbrook Insurance Company. |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order | ||
utility
Notice of Docket Text Modification
Thu 11/08 4:28 PM
NOTICE of Docket Text Modification re15 Second MOTION to Stay re14 Order on Stipulated Motion, Case Stayed, Set Deadlines : Incorrect version of proposed order filed, corrected version will be filed. (JF) |
||
Friday, August 10, 2018 | ||
14 | 14
3
pgs
order
Order on Stipulated Motion ~Util - Case Stayed ~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines
Mon 08/13 8:06 AM
STIPULATION AND ORDER for Entry of Stay re parties'13 Stipulated Motion; Case stayed until 11/8/2018, signed by Judge James L. Robart. (SWT) |
|
13 | 13
motion
Stipulated Motion
Fri 08/10 11:50 AM
Stipulated MOTION for Entry of Stay , filed by Plaintiffs Barbara Tomingas, Mark Tomingas. Noting Date 8/10/2018, (Whiteley, Jocelyn) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order | ||
Thursday, July 26, 2018 | ||
12 | 12
answer
Answer to Complaint
Thu 07/26 11:21 AM
ANSWER to Complaint; with JURY DEMAND by Crestbrook Insurance Company.(Forsberg, Carl) |
|
Monday, July 16, 2018 | ||
11 | 11
order
Joint Status Report Order Form for District Judges
Mon 07/16 4:21 PM
ORDER REGARDING INITIAL DISCLOSURES AND JOINT STATUS REPORT by Judge James L. Robart. Joint Status Report due by 8/20/2018, FRCP 26f Conference Deadline is 7/30/2018, Initial Disclosure Deadline is 8/13/2018. (AD) |
|
Tuesday, July 03, 2018 | ||
10 | 10
order
3 - Stipulation and Order
Tue 07/03 9:29 AM
STIPULATION AND ORDER extending the deadline for Defendant to answer Plaintiff's Complaint to 7/26/2018. No further extensions shall be granted. Signed by Judge James L. Robart. (PM) |
|
Monday, July 02, 2018 | ||
9 | 9
misc
Stipulation
Mon 07/02 2:59 PM
STIPULATION AND PROPOSED ORDER to Extend Time to Answer Complaint (Second) by parties (Forsberg, Carl) |
|
Wednesday, June 20, 2018 | ||
8 | 8
order
3 - Stipulation and Order
Wed 06/20 2:12 PM
STIPULATION AND ORDER extending the deadline until July 5, 2018, for Defendant to answer Plaintiffs' complaint. Signed by Judge James L. Robart. (PM) |
|
Tuesday, June 19, 2018 | ||
7 | 7
misc
Stipulation
Tue 06/19 4:13 PM
STIPULATION AND PROPOSED ORDER to Extend Time to Answer Complaint by parties (Forsberg, Carl) |
|
Friday, June 15, 2018 | ||
6 | 6
utility
Judge Assignment Letter (Removal & Transfer cases only)
Fri 06/15 5:14 PM
LETTER from Clerk to counsel re: receipt of case from King County Superior Court and advising of WAWD case number and judge assignment. (DJ) |
|
notice
Notice-Other
Fri 06/15 5:08 PM
NOTICE to Filer: ATTACHMENT FILED SEPARATELY: In the future, please remember the Civil Cover Sheet, the Summons(es) (if applicable) and the Report Regarding Trademarks and Patents (if applicable) MUST be attachments to your initiating document. Thank you.(DJ) |
||
utility
Add and Terminate Judges
Fri 06/15 5:13 PM
Judge James L. Robart added. (DJ) |
||
Thursday, June 14, 2018 | ||
5 | 5
discov
Corporate Disclosure Statement
Thu 06/14 3:12 PM
CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT identifying Corporate Parent Nationwide Mutual Insurance Company for Crestbrook Insurance Company. Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1. Filed by Crestbrook Insurance Company (Andersen, Stephanie) |
|
4 | 4
misc
Verification of State Court Records
Thu 06/14 3:04 PM
VERIFICATION OF STATE COURT RECORDS re1 Notice of Removal by Defendant Crestbrook Insurance Company (Andersen, Stephanie) |
|
3 | 3
notice
Notice-Other
Thu 06/14 2:41 PM
NOTICE to Plaintiffs re1 Notice of Removal ; filed by Defendant Crestbrook Insurance Company.(Andersen, Stephanie) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit Notice of Removal, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit Defendant's Notice to Superior Court for Filing of Notice of Removal | ||
2 | 2
misc
Praecipe to Attach Document
Thu 06/14 2:07 PM
PRAECIPE to attach document (Civil Cover Sheet) re1 Notice of Removal by Defendant Crestbrook Insurance Company (Andersen, Stephanie) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Notice of Removal
Thu 06/14 2:03 PM
NOTICE OF REMOVAL from King County Superior Court, case number 18 2-12873 1; , filed by Crestbrook Insurance Company.(Andersen, Stephanie) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit Complaint, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit Acceptance of Service |