Northwest Administrators, Inc v. Valley Pump, Inc
Washington Western District Court | |
Judge: | John C Coughenour |
Case #: | 2:18-cv-00865 |
Nature of Suit | 791 Labor - Employee Retirement Income Security Act |
Cause | 29:1132 E.R.I.S.A.-Employee Benefits |
Case Filed: | Jun 14, 2018 |
Terminated: | Mar 25, 2020 |
Last checked: Tuesday Dec 11, 2018 1:04 AM PST |
Defendant
Valley Pump, Inc
|
|
Plaintiff
Northwest Administrators Inc
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 12 hours ago |
Wednesday, March 25, 2020 | ||
27 | 27
order
2 - Minute Order ~Util - Terminate Case
Wed 03/25 8:59 AM
MINUTE ORDER re parties'26 Stipulation and Order of Dismissal. Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 41(a)(1)(A), this stipulation is self-executing, and this action is DISMISSED with prejudice and without an award of costs or attorney fees to either party. Authorized by U.S. District Judge John C Coughenour. (TH) |
|
Tuesday, March 24, 2020 | ||
26 | 26
misc
Stipulation
Tue 03/24 7:57 AM
STIPULATION AND PROPOSED ORDER FOR DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE by parties |
|
Tuesday, December 17, 2019 | ||
25 | 25
misc
Joint Status Report
Tue 12/17 10:02 AM
JOINT STATUS REPORT signed by all parties. Estimated Trial Days: 1. |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A-D, pp 3-16 to Joint Status Report | ||
Wednesday, May 15, 2019 | ||
24 | 24
misc
Redacted Document
Wed 05/15 12:16 PM
REDACTION to23 Declaration (non motion), by Defendant Valley Pump, Inc(West, Robert) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit | ||
utility
Notice to Filer
Wed 05/15 10:14 AM
NOTICE TO FILER: re23 Declaration (non motion). Document(s) contain personal identifiers that must be redacted pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 5.2 and Local Civil Rule 5.2. You are required to re-file a redacted version of your document using the event " Redacted Document " located in the Other Documents category. This event will allow you to link back to your original filing and will not affect your original filing date. Pursuant to FRCP 5.2 and LCR 5.2, the document(s) have been administratively sealed by the Court. (TH) |
||
Tuesday, May 14, 2019 | ||
23 | 23
misc
Declaration (non motion)
Tue 05/14 9:56 AM
DECLARATION of Joseph Alcorn of Valley Pump, Inc. by Defendant Valley Pump, Inc(West, Robert) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit | ||
22 | 22
notice
Notice of Appearance
Tue 05/14 9:54 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Robert Emmett West, Jr on behalf of Defendant Valley Pump, Inc. (West, Robert) |
|
Tuesday, April 02, 2019 | ||
21 | 21
misc
Declaration (non motion)
Tue 04/02 1:39 PM
DECLARATION of Charles E. Smith, Process Server re20 Order, by Plaintiff Northwest Administrators Inc |
|
Tuesday, March 05, 2019 | ||
20 | 20
order
1 - Order
Tue 03/05 4:03 PM
ORDER finding Defendant in civil contempt. Defendant is ORDERED to pay the Court $200 per day. This sanction shall continue to accrue until Defendant files a declaration confirming that it has complied with the Court's order compelling audit (Dkt. No.13 ). Signed by U.S. District Judge John C Coughenour. (TH) |
|
19 | 19
notice
Notice of Appearance
Tue 03/05 2:43 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Thomas A Leahy on behalf of Plaintiff Northwest Administrators Inc. (Leahy, Thomas) |
|
18 | 18
minutes
Show Cause Hearing
Tue 03/05 1:59 PM
MINUTE ENTRY for proceedings held before U.S. District Judge John C. Coughenour; CRD: Paul Pierson ; Plaintiff's Counsel: Tom Leahy ; Defense Counsel: NOT PRESENT ; Court Reporter: Vernon ; Time of Hearing: 9:00 a.m. ; Courtroom: 16206 ; Show Cause Hearing was held on 3/5/2019. The Court directs a Contempt Order be issued and a fine of $200/per day for defendant's failure to comply with the Court's order to compel an audit [#13]. (PP) |
|
Friday, February 15, 2019 | ||
17 | 17
misc
Declaration (non motion)
Fri 02/15 9:52 AM
DECLARATION of Service of Charles E. Smith, Process Server re16 Order on Motion for Order to Show Cause, by Plaintiff Northwest Administrators Inc |
|
Tuesday, January 22, 2019 | ||
16 | 16
3
pgs
order
Order on Motion to Show Cause
Tue 01/22 8:54 AM
ORDER granting Plaintiff's15 Motion for Order to Show Cause. Defendant is hereby ordered to appear before the Honorable John C. Coughenour for a Show Cause Hearing set for 3/5/2019 at 9:00 AM to SHOW CAUSE why it should not be held in contempt of this Court's order. Signed by U.S. District Judge John C Coughenour. (TH) |
|
Thursday, December 20, 2018 | ||
15 | 15
motion
Show Cause
Thu 12/20 9:51 AM
MOTION for Order to Show Cause and Supporting Affidavit , filed by Plaintiff Northwest Administrators Inc. Noting Date 1/4/2019, |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A-B, pp 3-7 to Russell J. Reid's Affidavit, | ||
Att: 2 Proposed Order | ||
Friday, November 09, 2018 | ||
14 | 14
misc
Declaration (non motion)
Fri 11/09 3:17 PM
DECLARATION of Charles E. Smith, Process Server re13 Order on Motion for Order by Plaintiff Northwest Administrators, Inc |
|
Tuesday, October 16, 2018 | ||
13 | 13
2
pgs
order
Order on Motion for Order
Tue 10/16 12:42 PM
ORDER granting Plaintiff's10 Motion to Compel Audit, signed by U.S. District Judge John C Coughenour. (SWT) |
|
Thursday, September 06, 2018 | ||
utility
Set/Reset Motion Noting Date (Public, notice to parties)
Thu 09/06 9:38 AM
Noting Date Set/Reset re10 MOTION for Order to Compel Audit : Noting Date 9/21/2018, (TH) |
||
Tuesday, September 04, 2018 | ||
12 | 12
respm
Declaration
Tue 09/04 3:15 PM
DECLARATION of Russell J. Reid filed by Plaintiff Northwest Administrators, Inc re10 MOTION for Order to Compel Audit |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A-C, pp 3-9 to Russell J. Reid's Declaration | ||
11 | 11
respm
Declaration
Tue 09/04 3:11 PM
DECLARATION of Jesse Swain filed by Plaintiff Northwest Administrators, Inc re10 MOTION for Order to Compel Audit |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A-D, pp 4-77 to Jesse Swain's Declaration | ||
10 | 10
8
pgs
motion
Order
Tue 09/04 3:09 PM
MOTION for Order to Compel Audit , filed by Plaintiff Northwest Administrators, Inc. Noting Date 9/4/2018, |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order | ||
Thursday, July 26, 2018 | ||
9 | 9
notice
Notice of Stricken Hearing
Thu 07/26 9:58 AM
NOTICE of Stricken Status Conference on 10/23/2018. (PP) |
|
8 | 8
1
pgs
order
Order on Motion for Default
Thu 07/26 9:57 AM
ORDER granting Plaintiff's Motion for Default of Defendant Valley Pump, Inc., by Paul Pierson, Courtroom Deputy Clerk on behalf of William McCool, Clerk of Court. (PP) |
|
Wednesday, July 25, 2018 | ||
7 | 7
motion
Default
Wed 07/25 2:40 PM
MOTION for Default Against Valley Pump, Inc. , filed by Plaintiff Northwest Administrators, Inc. Noting Date 7/25/2018, |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A, pp 4-5 to Russell J. Reid's Affidavit, | ||
Att: 2 Proposed Order | ||
Tuesday, July 03, 2018 | ||
6 | 6
service
Summons Returned Executed
Tue 07/03 11:10 AM
SERVICE OF SUMMONS and Complaint returned executed upon defendant Valley Pump, Inc on 6/30/2018 |
|
Monday, June 18, 2018 | ||
5 | 5
misc
JCC-Set Status Conference
Mon 06/18 11:17 AM
MINUTE ENTRY re: STATUS CONFERENCE. The attorney who will be responsible for trying the case, or that attorney's representative, should attend the conference and be prepared to discuss the following matters at the conference: 1. An estimate of the number of days needed for trial; 2. The date by which the case will be ready for trial; 3. Whether the parties intend to mediate per LCR 39.1 and, if so, when the parties expect to complete mediation; If counsel's office is outside of the Greater Metropolitan Seattle area, local counsel should attend on behalf of non-local counsel. If local counsel is unavailable, non-local counsel may make arrangements to participate telephonically in the conference by contacting the Courtroom Deputy Clerk at Paul_Pierson@wawd.uscourts.gov at least TEN (10) DAYS in advance of the proceeding. Counsel do NOT need to file a Joint Status Report or Rule 26(f) Report in advance of the Status Conference. Counsel should plan on arriving 10-15 minutes early to check in with the Courtroom Deputy Clerk as the Court's calendar begins promptly at 9:00 a.m. COUNSEL OR THE PRO SE PARTY WHO FILED THIS MATTER SHALL IMMEDIATELY NOTIFY ALL PARTIES OF THE DATE AND TIME OF THE SCHEDULED STATUS CONFERENCE. A Status Conference is hereby ordered set for 10/23/2018 at 9:00 AM in Courtroom 16206 before U.S. District Judge John C. Coughenour. (PP) |
|
4 | 4
order
Discovery and Depositions Order (FORM)
Mon 06/18 11:06 AM
ORDER REGARDING DISCOVERY AND DEPOSITIONS by U.S. District Judge John C. Coughenour. (PP) |
|
Friday, June 15, 2018 | ||
3 | 3
service
Summons Issued
Fri 06/15 3:57 PM
Summons(es) electronically issued as to defendant(s) Valley Pump, Inc. (DJ) |
|
utility
Add and Terminate Judges
Fri 06/15 3:42 PM
U.S. District Judge John C. Coughenour added. (DJ) |
||
Thursday, June 14, 2018 | ||
2 | 2
discov
Corporate Disclosure Statement
Thu 06/14 3:15 PM
CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT indicating no Corporate Parents and/or Affiliates. Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1. Filed by Northwest Administrators, Inc |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Thu 06/14 3:11 PM
COMPLAINT to Compel Audit against defendant(s) Valley Pump, Inc. , filed by Northwest Administrators, Inc. |
|
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet, | ||
Att: 2 Summons |