Hendrix v. Thrasher et al
Washington Western District Court | |
Judge: | Ronald B Leighton |
Referred: | David W Christel |
Case #: | 3:18-cv-05465 |
Nature of Suit | 550 Prisoner Petitions - Habeas Corpus - Civil Rights |
Cause | 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights |
Case Filed: | Jun 11, 2018 |
Terminated: | Jul 17, 2018 |
Create an account to get the full party report for this case.
Docket last updated: 3 hours ago |
Tuesday, July 17, 2018 | ||
6 | 6
order
Judgment by Court
Tue 07/17 12:13 PM
JUDGMENT BY COURT. **1 PAGE(S), PRINT ALL** (Royce Hendrix, Prisoner ID: 734703) (GMR) |
|
Monday, July 16, 2018 | ||
5 | 5
1
pgs
order
Order on Report and Recommendation
Mon 07/16 1:40 PM
ORDER ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION re4 Granting Plaintiff's Motion to Voluntary Dismiss; Plaintiff's in forma pauperis is DENIED as moot, and Plaintiff's claims are DISMISSED without prejudice; by Judge Ronald B. Leighton. **1 PAGE(S), PRINT ALL** (Royce Hendrix, Prisoner ID: 734703) (DN) |
|
Tuesday, June 26, 2018 | ||
4 | 4
motion
Report and Recommendations
Tue 06/26 11:37 AM
REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION by Magistrate Judge David W. Christel re Plaintiff's3 Request to Voluntarily Dismiss Action and1 Application to Proceed In Forma Pauperis. Noting Date: July 13, 2018. **3 PAGE(S), PRINT ALL** (Royce Hendrix, Prisoner ID: 734703) (GMR) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order | ||
Thursday, June 21, 2018 | ||
3 | 3
motion
Dismiss
Fri 06/22 3:29 PM
MOTION to Dismiss (NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal), filed by Plaintiff Royce Hendrix. Noted by clerk for: 6/21/2018. **6 PAGE(S), PRINT NEF ONLY** (Royce Hendrix, Prisoner ID: 734703) (GMR) |
|
Thursday, June 14, 2018 | ||
2 | 2
utility
IFP Deficiency Letter
Thu 06/14 4:08 PM
LETTER to Filer re IFP deficiency: - The APPLICATION TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS is incomplete. Please answer all the questions on the enclosed application and return it to the Court. Filer has until 7/16/2018 to correct. **5 PAGE(S), PRINT ALL** (Royce Hendrix, Prisoner ID: 734703) (GMR) |
|
Att: 1 IFP Application form | ||
utility
Notice to Filer
Thu 06/14 4:11 PM
NOTICE TO FILER RE: NON-COMPLIANCE WITH PRISONER E-FILING INITIATIVE re1 Application for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis. The Western District of Washington received documents from you for filing through the U.S. Postal Service. Pursuant to General Order 06-16, participation in the Prisoner E-Filing Initiative is mandatory for all prisoner litigants incarcerated at the Washington Corrections Center-Shelton. These documents will be filed by the clerk in this instance, it is not necessary to refile. Please comply by submitting all future documents to be filed with this Court to the Law Librarian/designee for electronic filing. **0 PAGE(S), PRINT NEF ONLY** (Royce Hendrix, Prisoner ID: 734703) (GMR) |
||
Monday, June 11, 2018 | ||
1 | 1
misc
Application
Thu 06/14 4:05 PM
APPLICATION for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis, filed by Plaintiff Royce Hendrix. **32 PAGE(S) RECEIVED VIA USPS, PRINT NEF ONLY** (Royce Hendrix, Prisoner ID: 734703) (GMR) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed 1983 Prisoner Civil Rights Complaint, | ||
Att: 2 envelope |