Camper v. State Farm Fire and Casualty Company et al
Washington Western District Court | |
Judge: | Benjamin H Settle |
Case #: | 3:18-cv-05486 |
Nature of Suit | 110 Contract - Insurance |
Cause | 28:1332 Diversity-Insurance Contract |
Case Filed: | Jun 14, 2018 |
Terminated: | Dec 05, 2019 |
Last checked: Tuesday Dec 11, 2018 1:05 AM PST |
Defendant
Allstate Insurance Company
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
State Farm Fire and Casualty Company
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Vanessa Camper
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 04/23/2024 11:59 PM PDT |
Thursday, December 05, 2019 | ||
62 | 62
order
Judgment by Court
Thu 12/05 12:19 PM
JUDGMENT BY COURT in favor of State Farm Fire and Casualty Company against Vanessa Camper. (MGC) |
|
61 | 61
2
pgs
order
Order on Motion to Dismiss
Thu 12/05 11:13 AM
ORDER granting59 Motion to Dismiss without prejudice. Signed by Judge Benjamin H. Settle. (MGC) |
|
60 | 60
respm
Response to Motion
Thu 12/05 8:16 AM
RESPONSE, by Defendant State Farm Fire and Casualty Company, to59 MOTION to Dismiss Claims Against Defendants . (Rogers, Michael) |
|
Wednesday, December 04, 2019 | ||
59 | 59
motion
Dismiss
Wed 12/04 10:17 AM
MOTION to Dismiss Claims Against Defendants , filed by Plaintiff Vanessa Camper. Noting Date 12/6/2019, (Thornton, George) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order Granting Plaintiff's Motion |