KELLEY v. BERRYHILL
Florida Northern District Court | |
Judge: | Elizabeth M Timothy |
Referred: | Elizabeth M Timothy |
Case #: | 3:18-cv-01423 |
Nature of Suit | 863 Social Security - DIWC/DIWW (405(g)) |
Cause | 42:405 Review of HHS Decision (DIWC) |
Case Filed: | Jun 15, 2018 |
Terminated: | Dec 16, 2019 |
Defendant
Party Name in Social Security Case - Unavailable
|
|
Notice Only Party
Party Name in Social Security Case - Unavailable
|
|
Plaintiff
Party Name in Social Security Case - Unavailable
|
Docket last updated: 05/30/2023 11:59 PM EDT |
Monday, December 16, 2019 | ||
19 | 19
order
Judgment (Signed by Clerk: Not an Opinion)
Tue 12/17 7:40 AM
CLERK'S JUDGMENT re 18 Memorandum & Opinion. (alb) |
|
18 | 18
30+
pgs
order
Memorandum & Opinion
Tue 12/17 7:30 AM
MEMORANDUM DECISION AND ORDER. The clerk of court is directed to substitute Andrew Saul for Nancy A. Berryhill as Defendant. The decision of the Commissioner is AFFIRMED, and this action is DISMISSED. JUDGMENT is to be entered, pursuant to sentence four of 42 U.S.C. § 405(g), AFFIRMING the decision of the Commissioner. Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE ELIZABETH M TIMOTHY on 12/16/2019. (alb) |
|
Tuesday, February 26, 2019 | ||
utility
Action Required by Magistrate Judge - No NEFs in SEALED Cases
Tue 02/26 9:12 AM
ACTION REQUIRED BY MAGISTRATE JUDGE: Chambers of MAGISTRATE JUDGE ELIZABETH M TIMOTHY notified that action is needed Re:17 MEMORANDUM in Support of the Commissioner's decision by NANCY A BERRYHILL. (JOHNS, MARCUS),15 MEMORANDUM in Support re1 Complaint by PAMELA J KELLEY. (THOMAS, ASHLEY) (MB) |
||
Monday, February 25, 2019 | ||
17 | 17
respoth
Memorandum in Support - Not Used for Motion Responses
Mon 02/25 4:14 PM
MEMORANDUM in Support of the Commissioner's decision by NANCY A BERRYHILL. (JOHNS, MARCUS) |
|
Monday, February 11, 2019 | ||
16 | 16
notice
Notice of Appearance
Mon 02/11 4:02 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by MARCUS M JOHNS on behalf of NANCY A BERRYHILL (JOHNS, MARCUS) |
|
Friday, January 25, 2019 | ||
15 | 15
respoth
Memorandum in Support - Not Used for Motion Responses
Fri 01/25 9:05 AM
MEMORANDUM in Support re1 Complaint by PAMELA J KELLEY. (THOMAS, ASHLEY) |
|
Wednesday, January 02, 2019 | ||
14 | 14
order
Scheduling Order Social Security
Thu 01/03 10:48 AM
SCHEDULING ORDER: Plaintiff shall have SIXTY (60) days to file a memorandum in support of her complaint. Defendant shall within THIRTY (30) days of service of Plaintiff's memorandum file a response. The clerk of court is directed to return this file to the undersigned no later than the due date of Defendant's response. Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE ELIZABETH M TIMOTHY on 1/2/2019. (Memorandum in Support due by 3/4/2019 . Memorandum in Opposition due by 4/3/2019 ). (MB) |
|
Thursday, December 27, 2018 | ||
13 | 13
misc
SS Transcript/Admin Record
Thu 12/27 7:47 AM
SS TRANSCRIPT/ADMIN RECORD by NANCY A BERRYHILL by NANCY A BERRYHILL. (FISHER, PETER) |
|
Att: 1 Part 2, | ||
Att: 2 Part 3, | ||
Att: 3 Part 4, | ||
Att: 4 Part 5, | ||
Att: 5 Part 6, | ||
Att: 6 Part 7, | ||
Att: 7 Part 8, | ||
Att: 8 Part 9, | ||
Att: 9 Part 10, | ||
Att: 10 Part 11, | ||
Att: 11 Part 12, | ||
Att: 12 Part 13, | ||
Att: 13 Part 14 | ||
12 | 12
answer
Answer to Complaint
Thu 12/27 7:43 AM
ANSWER to1 Complaint by NANCY A BERRYHILL. (FISHER, PETER) |
|
utility
Action Required by Magistrate Judge - No NEFs in SEALED Cases
Thu 12/27 8:04 AM
ACTION REQUIRED BY MAGISTRATE JUDGE: Chambers of MAGISTRATE JUDGE ELIZABETH M TIMOTHY notified that action is needed Re:11 Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge. (alb) |
||
utility
Action Required by Magistrate Judge - No NEFs in SEALED Cases
Thu 12/27 9:21 AM
ACTION REQUIRED BY MAGISTRATE JUDGE: Chambers of MAGISTRATE JUDGE ELIZABETH M TIMOTHY notified that action is needed Re:12 Answer to Complaint,13 SS Transcript/Admin Record,. (MB) |
||
Monday, December 17, 2018 | ||
11 | 11
1
pgs
order
Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge - Sets CONSENT Flag
Tue 12/18 10:40 AM
ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge MAGISTRATE JUDGE ELIZABETH M TIMOTHY. Signed by SENIOR JUDGE ROGER VINSON on 12/17/2018. (alb) |
|
Friday, December 14, 2018 | ||
10 | 10
notice
Notice - Other - See Separate Menu for Ntc of Appeal Options
Fri 12/14 2:43 PM
NOTICE , Consent and Reference of a Civil Action to a Magistrate Judge by NANCY A BERRYHILL (FISHER, PETER) |
|
utility
Action Required by District Judge - No NEFs in SEALED Cases
Fri 12/14 2:52 PM
ACTION REQUIRED BY DISTRICT JUDGE: Chambers of SENIOR JUDGE ROGER VINSON notified that action is needed Re:10 NOTICE, Consent and Reference of a Civil Action to a Magistrate Judge. (sdw) |
||
Tuesday, November 20, 2018 | ||
9 | 9
service
Summons Returned Executed as to USA
Tue 11/20 8:50 AM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by PAMELA J KELLEY. (THOMAS, ASHLEY) |
|
Friday, November 16, 2018 | ||
8 | 8
service
Summons Returned Executed as to USA
Fri 11/16 8:58 AM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by PAMELA J KELLEY. NANCY A BERRYHILL served on 11/15/2018, answer due 1/14/2019. (THOMAS, ASHLEY) |
|
Thursday, November 08, 2018 | ||
7 | 7
service
Summons Returned Executed as to USA
Thu 11/08 9:23 AM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by PAMELA J KELLEY. (THOMAS, ASHLEY) |
|
6 | 6
service
Summons Returned Executed as to USA
Thu 11/08 9:21 AM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by PAMELA J KELLEY. NANCY A BERRYHILL served on 11/6/2018, answer due 1/7/2019. (THOMAS, ASHLEY) |
|
Friday, June 15, 2018 | ||
5 | 5
service
Summons Issued as to USA
Fri 06/15 10:33 AM
Summons Issued as to NANCY A BERRYHILL, #1 US Attorney, #2 US Attorney General. (djb) |
|
4 | 4
misc
Filing Fee Received
Fri 06/15 10:24 AM
Civil Filing fee Received: $ 400.00, receipt number FLN3-11993. Fee status updated to paid. (djb) |
|
3 | 3
misc
Docket Annotation
Fri 06/15 10:20 AM
DOCKET ANNOTATION BY COURT: Notice to Filer - The parties were added to the docket incorrectly and will be corrected by the clerk. For future reference: Party names are to be entered in ALL CAPS and without punctuation. Please review the procedure for adding/creating new parties in the "Style Guide for Electronic Case Filing" and/or Chapter IV of the "CM/ECF Attorney User's Guide" (both available on the clerk's website). (djb) |
|
2 | 2
misc
Civil Cover Sheet
Fri 06/15 9:40 AM
CIVIL COVER SHEET. (THOMAS, ASHLEY) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Fri 06/15 9:34 AM
COMPLAINT against NANCY A BERRYHILL, filed by Pamela J Kelley. (THOMAS, ASHLEY) |
|
Att: 1 Summons, | ||
Att: 2 Summons, | ||
Att: 3 Summons |