NUNNALLY v. TIMOTHY et al
Florida Northern District Court | |
Judge: | M Casey Rodgers |
Referred: | Charles J Kahn, Jr |
Case #: | 3:18-cv-01424 |
Nature of Suit | 555 Prisoner Petitions - Habeas Corpus - Prison Condition |
Cause | 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights |
Case Filed: | Jun 15, 2018 |
Terminated: | Jul 18, 2018 |
Defendant
CHIEF JUSTICE OF THE SUPREME COURT
|
|
Defendant
ELIZABETH TIMOTHY
|
|
Defendant
JUDICIAL CONFERENCE OF THE UNITED STATES
|
|
Plaintiff
TREVIN NUNNALLY SR
|
Docket last updated: 05/30/2023 11:59 PM EDT |
Friday, January 10, 2020 | ||
26 | 26
misc
Filing Fee Received
Fri 01/10 2:01 PM
Partial Filing fee: $ 2.21, receipt number FLN3-13523. (MB) |
|
Tuesday, December 10, 2019 | ||
25 | 25
misc
Filing Fee Received
Tue 12/10 1:57 PM
Partial Filing fee: $ 14.50, receipt number FLN3-13457. (MB) |
|
Wednesday, November 13, 2019 | ||
24 | 24
misc
Filing Fee Received
Thu 11/14 2:16 PM
Partial Filing fee: $ 18.00, receipt number FLN3-13394. (MB) |
|
Monday, October 07, 2019 | ||
23 | 23
misc
Filing Fee Received
Mon 10/07 3:30 PM
Partial Filing fee: $ 2.00, receipt number FLN3-13307. (MB) |
|
Friday, August 09, 2019 | ||
22 | 22
misc
Filing Fee Received
Fri 08/09 2:11 PM
Partial Filing fee: $ 13.05, receipt number FLN3-13139. (MB) |
|
Monday, July 08, 2019 | ||
21 | 21
misc
Filing Fee Received
Tue 07/09 9:16 AM
Partial Filing fee: $ 68.00, receipt number FLN3-13042. (MB) |
|
Tuesday, May 07, 2019 | ||
20 | 20
misc
Filing Fee Received
Tue 05/07 12:36 PM
Partial Filing fee: $ 28.00, receipt number FLN3-12884. (MB) |
|
Monday, February 11, 2019 | ||
19 | 19
misc
Filing Fee Received
Tue 02/12 9:44 AM
Partial Filing fee: $ 62.00, receipt number FLN3-12641. (MB) |
|
Tuesday, January 15, 2019 | ||
18 | 18
appeal
USCA Mandate
Wed 01/23 12:25 PM
MANDATE of USCA as to9 Notice of Appeal filed by TREVIN NUNNALLY. This appeal is DISMISSED. Any appeal of this issue would be frivolous, Nunnally's motion is Denied. USCA Appeal 18-13139 J. (30 Day Deadline After Appeal Mandate set for 2/14/2019 to dispose working file). (MB) |
|
Thursday, November 08, 2018 | ||
17 | 17
misc
Filing Fee Received
Thu 11/08 2:27 PM
Initial Partial Filing fee: $ 4.65, receipt number FLN300012373 per4 Order. (alb) |
|
Friday, September 14, 2018 | ||
16 | 16
misc
Filing Fee Received
Fri 09/14 1:23 PM
Initial Partial Filing fee: $ 137.59, receipt number FLN3-12233, per4 ORDER. (MB) |
|
Friday, August 17, 2018 | ||
15 | 15
3
pgs
order
Order on Motion for Leave to Appeal In Forma Pauperis
Fri 08/17 2:00 PM
ORDER denying 14 Motion for Leave to Appeal in forma pauperis. Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE CHARLES J KAHN, JR on 8/17/2018. (USCA 18-13139 J, copy emailed to USCA) (sdw) |
|
Thursday, August 16, 2018 | ||
utility
Action Required by Magistrate Judge - No NEFs in SEALED Cases
Thu 08/16 3:36 PM
ACTION REQUIRED BY MAGISTRATE JUDGE: Chambers of MAGISTRATE JUDGE CHARLES J KAHN, JR notified that action is needed Re:14 MOTION for Leave to Appeal in forma pauperis. Referred to CHARLES J KAHN, JR. (sdw) |
||
Monday, August 13, 2018 | ||
14 | 14
motion
Appeal In Forma Pauperis
Thu 08/16 3:35 PM
MOTION for Leave to Appeal in forma pauperis by TREVIN NUNNALLY, SR. (sdw) |
|
Monday, August 06, 2018 | ||
12 | 12
appeal
Transcript Request Appeal Part I
Tue 08/07 9:35 AM
TRANSCRIPT REQUEST by TREVIN NUNNALLY, SR. (MB) |
|
Monday, July 30, 2018 | ||
13 | 13
appeal
USCA Case Number USCA Procedural Letter
Tue 08/07 1:45 PM
USCA Case Number as to TREVIN NUNNALLY 18-13139 J for9 NOTICE OF APPEAL by TREVIN NUNNALLY, USCA PROCEDURAL LETTER re USCA Appeal # 18-13139 J. (MB) |
|
Friday, July 27, 2018 | ||
11 | 11
appeal
Transmission of Notice of Appeal and Docket Sheet to USCA
Fri 07/27 1:35 PM
Transmission of Notice of Appeal and Docket Sheet to US Court of Appeals re9 Notice of Appeal by TREVIN NUNNALLY, SR. (sdw) |
|
10 | 10
appeal
Appeal Instructions
Fri 07/27 1:29 PM
Appeal Instructions re:9 Notice of Appeal : The Transcript Request Form is available on the Internet at http://www.flnd.uscourts.gov/forms/Attorney/ECCA_transcript_form_fillable.pdf **PLEASE NOTE** Separate forms must be filed for each court reporter. Transcript Order Form due by 8/10/2018 . (sdw) |
|
9 | 9
appeal
Notice of Appeal
Fri 07/27 1:27 PM
NOTICE OF APPEAL as to8 Clerk's Judgment,7 Order Adopting Report and Recommendation. (no filing fee/IFP motion) (sdw) |
|
Wednesday, July 18, 2018 | ||
8 | 8
order
Judgment (Signed by Clerk: Not an Opinion)
Wed 07/18 1:36 PM
CLERK'S JUDGMENT re 7 Order Adopting Report and Recommendation. (90 Day Deadline set for 10/16/2018 to dispose working file pursuant to retention policy). (MB) |
|
7 | 7
2
pgs
order
Order Adopting Report and Recommendation
Wed 07/18 1:23 PM
ORDER adopting Magistrate Judge's 4 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION. This action is DISMISSED without prejudice pursuant to 28 U.S.C. § 1915(e)(2)(B)(i) as malicious. Plaintiff's Motion for leave to amend his complaint, ECF No. 6 , is DENIED. Clerk is directed to close the file. Signed by JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS on 07/18/20018. (MB) |
|
Monday, July 16, 2018 | ||
6 | 6
motion
Amend/Correct - for Requesting Leave of Court to Amend
Mon 07/16 4:12 PM
MOTION For Leave Of Court to Amend1 Complaint by TREVIN NUNNALLY, SR. (MB) |
|
utility
Action Required by District Judge - No NEFs in SEALED Cases
Mon 07/16 4:17 PM
ACTION REQUIRED BY DISTRICT JUDGE: Chambers of MAGISTRATE JUDGE CHARLES J KAHN, JR notified that action is needed Re:6 MOTION For Leave Of Court to Amend1 Complaint,5 OBJECTION to4 Report and Recommendations (titled, "MOTION To Object & Rebut the U.S. Magistrate Judge's Report And Recommendation (Doc.4 )"), by TREVIN NUNNALLY, SR. (MB) |
||
Friday, June 29, 2018 | ||
5 | 5
respoth
Objection to Report and Recommendations
Fri 06/29 12:59 PM
OBJECTION to4 Report and Recommendations (titled, "MOTION To Object & Rebut the U.S. Magistrate Judge's Report And Recommendation (Doc. 4)"), by TREVIN NUNNALLY, SR. (MB) |
|
Wednesday, June 20, 2018 | ||
4 | 4
motion
Report and Recommendation Order ~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings
Wed 06/20 7:45 AM
ORDER and REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION. ORDERED - Plaintiff's motion to proceed in forma pauperis (doc. 2 ) is GRANTED for the limited purpose of dismissing this action. Clerk of court shall assess plaintiff $137.59 as an initial partial filing fee as provided in 28 U.S.C. § 1915(b)(1)(A). Clerk of court shall MAIL a copy of this order with the appropriate cover letter to: FCI Texarkana. RECOMMENDED - That this action be DISMISSED without prejudice pursuant to 28 U.S.C. § 1915(e)(2)(B)(i) as malicious. That the clerk be directed to close the file. R&R flag set. Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE CHARLES J KAHN, JR on 06/20/2018. (Internal deadline for referral to district judge if objections are not filed earlier: 7/18/2018 . Fee due by 7/20/2018 ). (Letter w/Order mailed to FCI Texarkana). (MB) |
|
Friday, June 15, 2018 | ||
3 | 3
notice
Notice to Pro Se
Fri 06/15 1:30 PM
Notice to Pro Se Litigant, TREVIN NUNNALLY, SR. (MB) |
|
2 | 2
motion
Proceed In Forma Pauperis
Fri 06/15 1:20 PM
MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by TREVIN NUNNALLY, SR. (MB) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Fri 06/15 1:02 PM
COMPLAINT against CHIEF JUSTICE OF THE SUPREME COURT, JUDICIAL CONFERENCE OF THE UNITED STATES, ELIZABETH TIMOTHY, filed by TREVIN NUNNALLY, SR. (No service copies). (MB) |
|
utility
Action Required by Magistrate Judge - No NEFs in SEALED Cases
Fri 06/15 1:33 PM
ACTION REQUIRED BY MAGISTRATE JUDGE: Chambers of MAGISTRATE JUDGE CHARLES J KAHN, JR notified that action is needed Re:2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis,1 Complaint. (No service copies). (MB) |