Romanowski v. Wells Fargo Bank NA et al
Texas Northern District Court | |
Judge: | Sidney A Fitzwater |
Case #: | 3:18-cv-01567 |
Nature of Suit | 220 Real Property - Foreclosure |
Cause | 28:1332 Diversity-Notice of Removal |
Case Filed: | Jun 15, 2018 |
Terminated: | Jun 03, 2019 |
Last checked: Wednesday Dec 12, 2018 3:20 AM CST |
Defendant
Wells Fargo Bank NA
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Daniel Romanowski
2832 Laramie St
Irving, TX 75062 |
Represented By
|
TERMINATED PARTIES | |
Defendant
Blue Star Residential Lending Inc
Terminated: 08/28/2018
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 04/23/2024 11:59 PM CDT |
Thursday, February 24, 2022 | ||
41 | 41
8
pgs
order
Memorandum Opinion and Order
Thu 02/24 5:36 PM
MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER denying38 MOTION to enforce settlement agreement and impose sanctions filed by Daniel Romanowski. (Ordered by Senior Judge Sidney A Fitzwater on 2/24/2022) (Senior Judge Sidney A Fitzwater) |
|
Saturday, January 22, 2022 | ||
40 | 40
respm
Reply
Sat 01/22 12:32 AM
REPLY filed by Daniel Romanowski re:39 Response/Objection (Romanowski, Daniel) |
|
Friday, January 21, 2022 | ||
39 | 39
respm
Response/Objection
Fri 01/21 3:40 PM
RESPONSE filed by Wells Fargo Bank NA re:38 First MOTION to Reopen Case (Davis, Matthew) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order | ||
Friday, December 31, 2021 | ||
38 | 38
motion
Reopen Case
Fri 12/31 12:34 PM
First MOTION to Reopen Case filed by Daniel Romanowski with Brief/Memorandum in Support. (Romanowski, Daniel) |
|
Att: 1 Additional Page(s) Certificate of Service | ||
Tuesday, July 30, 2019 | ||
37 | 37
notice
Notice (Other)
Tue 07/30 3:04 PM
NOTICE of Appeal re:36 Memorandum Opinion and Order filed by Daniel Romanowski (Romanowski, Daniel) |
|
36 | 36
6
pgs
order
Memorandum Opinion and Order
Tue 07/30 12:28 PM
MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER denying34 MOTION TO RECONSIDER AND SET ASIDE JUDGMENT filed by Daniel Romanowski. (Ordered by Senior Judge Sidney A Fitzwater on 7/30/2019) (Senior Judge Sidney A Fitzwater) |
|
Tuesday, June 25, 2019 | ||
35 | 35
respm
Response/Objection
Tue 06/25 9:29 AM
RESPONSE filed by Wells Fargo Bank NA re:34 First MOTION to Quash Order granting summary judgement First MOTION for Reconsideration re33 Judgment,32 Memorandum Opinion and Order,20 Response/Objection MOTION to Reopen Case First MOTION to Set Aside Judgment First MOTION for Order to Show Cause First MOTION to Vacate Order granting default judgement (Khosravighasemabadi, Roshanak) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit(s) April 4, 2019 letter to D. Romanowski, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit(s) declaration of Roshanak Khosravighasemabadi | ||
Tuesday, June 04, 2019 | ||
34 | 34
motion
Quash Reconsideration Reopen Case Set Aside Judgment Show Cause Vacate
Tue 06/04 2:21 PM
First MOTION to Quash Order granting summary judgement , First MOTION for Reconsideration re33 Judgment,32 Memorandum Opinion and Order,20 Response/Objection , MOTION to Reopen Case (), First MOTION to Set Aside Judgment , First MOTION for Order to Show Cause , First MOTION to Vacate Order granting default judgement filed by Daniel Romanowski (Romanowski, Daniel) |
|
Monday, June 03, 2019 | ||
33 | 33
order
Judgment
Mon 06/03 1:51 PM
JUDGMENT in favor of Wells Fargo Bank NA against Daniel Romanowski. (Ordered by Senior Judge Sidney A Fitzwater on 6/3/2019) (Senior Judge Sidney A Fitzwater) |
|
32 | 32
4
pgs
order
Memorandum Opinion and Order
Mon 06/03 1:46 PM
MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER deeming moot18 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Wells Fargo Bank NA; granting25 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Wells Fargo Bank NA. (Ordered by Senior Judge Sidney A Fitzwater on 6/3/2019) (Senior Judge Sidney A Fitzwater) |
|
misc
Order Receipt
Mon 06/03 3:21 PM
***Clerk's Notice of delivery: (see NEF for details) Docket No:32,33. Mon Jun 3 15:21:44 CDT 2019 (crt) |
||
Monday, May 06, 2019 | ||
31 | 31
notice
Notice of Attorney Appearance
Mon 05/06 2:28 PM
NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Jennifer Kinney Parnell on behalf of Wells Fargo Bank NA. (Filer confirms contact info in ECF is current.) (Parnell, Jennifer) |
|
Wednesday, May 01, 2019 | ||
30 | 30
1
pgs
order
Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney
Wed 05/01 10:52 AM
ORDER granting29 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Nicola M Shiels terminated. (Ordered by Senior Judge Sidney A Fitzwater on 5/1/2019) (aaa) |
|
misc
Order Receipt
Wed 05/01 10:53 AM
***Clerk's Notice of delivery: (see NEF for details) Docket No:30. Wed May 1 10:53:24 CDT 2019 (crt) |
||
Tuesday, April 30, 2019 | ||
29 | 29
motion
Withdraw as Attorney
Tue 04/30 3:29 PM
MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney Nicola M. Shiels filed by Wells Fargo Bank NA (Shiels, Nicola) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order Granting Motion to Withdraw | ||
Friday, April 05, 2019 | ||
28 | 28
1
pgs
order
Order on Motion to Extend Time
Fri 04/05 1:36 PM
ORDER granting24 Motion to Extend Time. Motions due by 7/15/2019. (Ordered by Senior Judge Sidney A Fitzwater on 4/5/2019) (epm) |
|
misc
Order Receipt
Fri 04/05 1:39 PM
***Clerk's Notice of delivery: (see NEF for details) Docket No:28. Fri Apr 5 13:39:47 CDT 2019 (crt) |
||
Thursday, April 04, 2019 | ||
27 | 27
respm
Appendix in Support
Thu 04/04 5:54 PM
Appendix in Support filed by Wells Fargo Bank NA re25 MOTION for Summary Judgment ,26 Brief/Memorandum in Support of Motion (Khosravighasemabadi, Roshanak) |
|
26 | 26
respm
Brief/Memorandum In Support
Thu 04/04 5:27 PM
Brief/Memorandum in Support filed by Wells Fargo Bank NA re25 MOTION for Summary Judgment (Khosravighasemabadi, Roshanak) |
|
25 | 25
motion
Summary Judgment
Thu 04/04 5:23 PM
MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Wells Fargo Bank NA (Khosravighasemabadi, Roshanak) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order | ||
Thursday, March 07, 2019 | ||
24 | 24
motion
Extension of Time
Thu 03/07 10:30 AM
MOTION to Extend Time [of Dispositive Motion Deadline] filed by Wells Fargo Bank NA (Khosravighasemabadi, Roshanak) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order | ||
Monday, March 04, 2019 | ||
23 | 23
misc
Status Report
Mon 03/04 3:22 PM
STATUS REPORT [and Estimate of Trial Length] filed by Wells Fargo Bank NA. (Khosravighasemabadi, Roshanak) |
|
Thursday, November 29, 2018 | ||
22 | 22
1
pgs
order
Order Referring Motion
Thu 11/29 12:26 PM
Order Referring Motion for Recommendation pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1)(B). The Magistrate Judge may conduct a hearing if he/she determines that a hearing is necessary. This order of reference also prospectively refers all procedural motions (e.g., to modify briefing limitations, to supplement a motion, or for an expedited hearing) hereafter filed by a party who supports or opposes the referred motion, and that relate to the resolution of the motion. re:18 MOTION to Dismiss Motion(s) referred to Magistrate Judge Renee Harris Toliver. (Ordered by Senior Judge Sidney A Fitzwater on 11/29/2018) (ykp) |
|
misc
Order Receipt
Thu 11/29 12:31 PM
***Clerk's Notice of delivery: (see NEF for details) Docket No:22. Thu Nov 29 12:31:00 CST 2018 (crt) |
||
Tuesday, November 13, 2018 | ||
21 | 21
respm
Reply
Tue 11/13 12:20 PM
REPLY filed by Wells Fargo Bank NA re:18 MOTION to Dismiss (Khosravighasemabadi, Roshanak) |
|
Tuesday, October 30, 2018 | ||
20 | 20
respm
Response/Objection
Wed 10/31 4:23 PM
RESPONSE filed by Daniel Romanowski re:18 MOTION to Dismiss. |
|
Tuesday, October 09, 2018 | ||
19 | 19
respm
Appendix in Support
Tue 10/09 12:51 PM
Appendix in Support filed by Wells Fargo Bank NA re18 MOTION to Dismiss (Khosravighasemabadi, Roshanak) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit(s) certified copy of deed of trust, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit(s) certified copy of assignment of mortgage | ||
18 | 18
motion
Dismiss
Tue 10/09 12:47 PM
MOTION to Dismiss filed by Wells Fargo Bank NA with Brief/Memorandum in Support. (Khosravighasemabadi, Roshanak) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order | ||
Thursday, October 04, 2018 | ||
misc
Order Receipt
Thu 10/04 11:31 AM
***Clerk's Notice of delivery: (see NEF for details) Docket No:16,17. Thu Oct 4 11:31:06 CDT 2018 (crt) |
||
Wednesday, October 03, 2018 | ||
17 | 17
order
Judgment
Wed 10/03 1:22 PM
JUDGMENT: For the reasons set out in an order filed today, it is ordered and adjudged that plaintiff's action against defendant Blue Star Residential Lending, Inc. ("Blue Star") is dismissed with prejudice. Blue Star's taxable costs of court, as calculated by the clerk of court, are assessed against plaintiff. Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 54(b), the court expressly determines that there is no just reason for delay and directs the clerk of court to enter this as a final judgment. (Ordered by Senior Judge Sidney A Fitzwater on 10/3/2018) (ndt) |
|
16 | 16
1
pgs
order
Order
Wed 10/03 1:16 PM
ORDER: On August 28, 2018 the court granted the July 31, 2018 motion to dismiss of defendant Blue Star Residential Len ding, Inc. ("Blue Star") under Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b)(6). The court also granted plaintiff 28 days from the date the order was filed to file an amended complaint. The court's order provided that, if plaintiff failed to replead, this action would be dismissed as to Blue Star based on its July 31, 2018 motion. Because plaintiff has failed to replead, the court, by Rule 54(b) final judgment filed today, dismisses plaintiffs action against Blue Star with prejudice. (Ordered by Senior Judge Sidney A Fitzwater on 10/3/2018) (ndt) |
|
Thursday, August 30, 2018 | ||
15 | 15
1
pgs
order
Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney
Thu 08/30 11:23 AM
ORDER granting13 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney: Plaintiff's counsel of record, John G. Helstowski, and his law firm, The J. Gannon Helstowski Law Firm, is hereby discharged and shall have no further duties or obligations as Plaintiff's counsel of record in the above captioned civil case. (Ordered by Judge Sidney A Fitzwater on 8/30/2018) (sss) |
|
misc
Order Receipt
Thu 08/30 11:28 AM
***Clerk's Notice of delivery: (see NEF for details) Docket No:15. Thu Aug 30 11:28:15 CDT 2018 (crt) |
||
Tuesday, August 28, 2018 | ||
14 | 14
2
pgs
order
Order on Motion to Remand Order on Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim
Tue 08/28 2:38 PM
ORDER denying6 Motion to Remand; granting8 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim and granting plaintiff 28 days to file an amended complaint. (Ordered by Judge Sidney A Fitzwater on 8/28/2018) (Judge Sidney A Fitzwater) |
|
Wednesday, August 08, 2018 | ||
13 | 13
motion
Withdraw as Attorney
Wed 08/08 10:47 AM
MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney of Record for Plaintiff filed by Daniel Romanowski (Helstowski, John) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit(s), | ||
Att: 2 Proposed Order | ||
Monday, August 06, 2018 | ||
12 | 12
respm
Response/Objection
Mon 08/06 11:25 AM
RESPONSE filed by Wells Fargo Bank NA re:6 MOTION to Remand to State Court (Khosravighasemabadi, Roshanak) |
|
Thursday, August 02, 2018 | ||
11 | 11
misc
Certificate Of Interested Persons/Disclosure Statement
Thu 08/02 3:22 PM
CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Blue Star Residential Lending Inc. (Kaplan, Stephen) |
|
Wednesday, August 01, 2018 | ||
10 | 10
order
Scheduling Order
Wed 08/01 11:52 AM
SCHEDULING ORDER: The court will set the case for trial by separate order. Amended Pleadings due by 9/4/2018. Discovery due by 3/4/2019. Joinder of Parties due by 9/4/2018. Motions due by 3/4/2019. Status Report due by 3/4/2019. (Ordered by Judge Sidney A Fitzwater on 8/1/2018) (ykp) |
|
9 | 9
2
pgs
order
Order
Wed 08/01 11:47 AM
ORDER: On 6/15/2018 defendant filed a notice of removal in this case, but plaintiff has not complied with N.D. Tex. Civ. R. 81.2, which requires that [w]ithin 21 days after the notice of removal is filed, the plaintiff shall file a separately signed certificate of interested persons that complies with LR 3.1(c) or 3.2(e). No later than 21 days after this order is filed, plaintiff must comply with Rule 81.2, or must adopt another party's previously-filed certificate, so that the court can ensure that recusal is not required in this case. (Ordered by Judge Sidney A Fitzwater on 8/1/2018) (ykp) |
|
Tuesday, July 31, 2018 | ||
8 | 8
motion
Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim
Tue 07/31 4:22 PM
Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Blue Star Residential Lending Inc Attorney Stephen E Kaplan added to party Blue Star Residential Lending Inc(pty:dft) (Kaplan, Stephen) |
|
Tuesday, July 24, 2018 | ||
7 | 7
misc
Status Report
Tue 07/24 1:34 PM
Joint STATUS REPORT and Scheduling Proposal filed by Wells Fargo Bank NA. (Khosravighasemabadi, Roshanak) |
|
Monday, July 16, 2018 | ||
6 | 6
motion
Remand
Mon 07/16 5:10 PM
MOTION to Remand to State Court filed by Daniel Romanowski with Brief/Memorandum in Support. (Helstowski, John) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit(s), | ||
Att: 2 Proposed Order | ||
Tuesday, July 03, 2018 | ||
5 | 5
4
pgs
order
Order for Scheduling Order Proposal
Tue 07/03 4:35 PM
Order for Scheduling Order Proposal: Proposed Scheduling Order due by 7/31/2018. (Ordered by Judge Sidney A Fitzwater on 7/3/2018) (epm) |
|
Friday, June 15, 2018 | ||
4 | 4
misc
Certificate Of Interested Persons/Disclosure Statement
Fri 06/15 4:15 PM
CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Wells Fargo Bank NA identifying Corporate Parent/Other Affiliate Wells Fargo & Company for Wells Fargo Bank NA. (Khosravighasemabadi, Roshanak) |
|
3 | 3
qcref
Fitzwater
Fri 06/15 4:01 PM
New Case Notes: A filing fee has been paid. Pursuant to Misc. Order 6, Plaintiff is provided the Notice of Right to Consent to Proceed Before A U.S. Magistrate Judge (Judge Toliver). Clerk to provide copy to plaintiff if not received electronically. (sss) |
|
2 | 2
misc
Certificate Of Interested Persons/Disclosure Statement
Fri 06/15 2:18 PM
CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. identifying Corporate Parent/Other Affiliate Wells Fargo & Company for Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.. (Khosravighasemabadi, Roshanak) |
|
1 | 1
notice
Notice of Removal
Fri 06/15 2:10 PM
NOTICE OF REMOVAL WITH JURY DEMAND from 68th Judicial District Dallas County TX, case number DC 18-07207 filed by Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.. (Filing fee $400; receipt number 0539-9256831) In each Notice of Electronic Filing, the judge assignment is indicated, and a link to the[LINK:Judges Copy Requirements] is provided. The court reminds the filer that any required copy of this and future documents must be delivered to the judge, in the manner prescribed, within three business days of filing. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms and Instructions found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here:[LINK:Attorney Information - Bar Membership] . If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (Khosravighasemabadi, Roshanak) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit(s) index of documents filed in state court, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit(s) civil cover & supplemental civil cover sheet, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit(s) state court docket sheet, | ||
Att: 4 Exhibit(s) original verified petition and app for TRO and TI, | ||
Att: 5 Exhibit(s) proposed TRO, | ||
Att: 6 Exhibit(s) TRO, | ||
Att: 7 Exhibit(s) registry deposit information sheet, | ||
Att: 8 Exhibit(s) letter requesting service of citation, | ||
Att: 9 Exhibit(s) citation issued-Blue Star Residential Lending, Inc., | ||
Att: 10 Exhibit(s) citation issued - Wells Fargo Bank, N.A., | ||
Att: 11 Exhibit(s) TRO citation issued to Wells Fargo Bank, N.A., | ||
Att: 12 Exhibit(s) TRO citation issued to Blue Star Residential Lending, Inc., | ||
Att: 13 Exhibit(s) notice to show cause-Wells Fargo Bank, N.A., | ||
Att: 14 Exhibit(s) notice to show cause-Blue Star Residential Lending, Inc., | ||
Att: 15 Exhibit(s) defendant Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.'s original answer & affirmative defenses, | ||
Att: 16 Exhibit(s) certificate of interested parties, | ||
Att: 17 Exhibit(s) Dallas County Appraisal District properpty information |