Jones v. Everett Transit Center
Washington Western District Court | |
Judge: | Ricardo S Martinez |
Referred: | Brian A Tsuchida |
Case #: | 2:18-cv-00871 |
Nature of Suit | 550 Prisoner Petitions - Habeas Corpus - Civil Rights |
Cause | 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights |
Case Filed: | Jun 14, 2018 |
Terminated: | Aug 28, 2018 |
Create an account to get the full party report for this case.
Docket last updated: 6 hours ago |
Thursday, September 06, 2018 | ||
13 | 13
misc
Mail Returned
Fri 09/07 3:10 PM
Mail Returned as Undeliverable re11 Order on Report and Recommendations,12 Judgment by Court addressed to Melvin Jones (SG) |
|
Tuesday, August 28, 2018 | ||
12 | 12
order
Judgment by Court
Tue 08/28 10:19 AM
JUDGMENT BY COURT in favor of Everett Transit Center against Melvin Lee Kwieestalub Jones. (cc: plaintiff via USPS) (ST) |
|
11 | 11
1
pgs
order
Order on Report and Recommendations
Tue 08/28 10:17 AM
ORDER OF DISMISSAL signed by Judge Ricardo S. Martinez re9 Report and Recommendations;7 Order to Show Cause;6 1983 Prisoner Civil Rights Complaint. (cc: plaintiff via USPS)(ST) |
|
Tuesday, August 14, 2018 | ||
10 | 10
misc
Mail Returned
Wed 08/15 2:13 PM
Mail Returned as Undeliverable re9 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS addressed to Melvin Jones (ST) |
|
Friday, July 27, 2018 | ||
9 | 9
motion
Report and Recommendations
Fri 07/27 3:35 PM
REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS by Hon. Brian A Tsuchida. Objections to R&R due by 8/10/2018, Noting Date 8/10/2018, (cc: plaintiff via USPS)(SG) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order, | ||
Att: 2 Proposed Judgment | ||
Thursday, July 12, 2018 | ||
8 | 8
misc
Prison Trust Account Statement
Mon 07/16 4:04 PM
Prison Trust Account Statement (SG) |
|
Friday, June 29, 2018 | ||
7 | 7
2
pgs
order
Order to Show Cause
Mon 07/02 8:13 AM
ORDER DIRECTING PLAINTIFF TO SHOW CAUSE WHY THE COMPLAINT SHOULD NOT BE DISMISSED by Hon. Brian A Tsuchida re6 1983 Prisoner Civil Rights Complaint. Show Cause Response due by 7/20/2018. (cc: plaintiff via USPS) (ST) |
|
6 | 6
cmp
Complaint
Fri 06/29 2:36 PM
1983 PRISONER CIVIL RIGHTS COMPLAINT, filed by Melvin Lee Kwieestalub Jones against defendant(s) Everett Transit Center. (ST) |
|
5 | 5
2
pgs
order
Order on IFP and Payments re: In Custody Prisoners
Fri 06/29 2:34 PM
ORDER GRANTING APPLICATION TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS AND DIRECTING INSTITUTION TO CALCULATE, COLLECT, AND FORWARD PAYMENTS by Hon. Brian A Tsuchida. (cc: Plaintiff, WAWD Finance, Western State Hospital)(ST) |
|
Thursday, June 28, 2018 | ||
4 | 4
motion
Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis
Fri 06/29 11:01 AM
MOTION for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis, filed by Melvin Lee Kwieestalub Jones.(SG) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed 1983 Prisoner Civil Rights Complaint, | ||
Att: 2 Prison Trust Account Statement | ||
misc
IFP Deficiency Corrected
Fri 06/29 10:58 AM
IFP deficiency corrected (SG) |
||
Friday, June 15, 2018 | ||
2 | 2
utility
IFP Deficiency Letter
Fri 06/15 3:31 PM
LETTER mailed re IFP deficiency; - Please provide a certified copy of your prison trust account statement showing transactions for the last six months. Filer has until 7/16/2018 to correct (SG) |
|
Thursday, June 14, 2018 | ||
1 | 1
misc
Application
Fri 06/15 3:29 PM
APPLICATION to Proceed In Forma Pauperis by Plaintiff Melvin Lee Kwieestalub Jones.(SG) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed 1983 Prisoner Civil Rights Complaint |