Treglown v. Cambronero et al
Washington Western District Court | |
Judge: | James L Robart |
Case #: | 2:18-cv-00875 |
Nature of Suit | 360 Torts - Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury |
Cause | 28:1332 Diversity |
Case Filed: | Jun 15, 2018 |
Terminated: | Oct 01, 2019 |
Last checked: Wednesday Dec 12, 2018 1:04 AM PST |
Defendant
Jane Doe Cambronero
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Jorge Cambronero
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Rhonda Treglown
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 3 hours ago |
Tuesday, October 01, 2019 | ||
24 | 24
order
3 - Stipulation and Order ~Util - Terminate Case
Tue 10/01 4:04 PM
STIPULATION AND ORDER of Dismissal With Prejudice re parties'23 Stipulation. Signed by Judge James L. Robart. (SWT) |
|
23 | 23
misc
Stipulation
Tue 10/01 2:16 PM
STIPULATION AND PROPOSED ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE by parties |
|
Wednesday, August 21, 2019 | ||
22 | 22
order
JLR Minute Order Setting Trial Date & Related Dates(FORM)
Wed 08/21 10:17 AM
MINUTE ORDER SETTING TRIAL DATE AND RELATED DATES by Judge James L. Robart; Length of Trial: *6-8 days*. Jury Trial is set for 1/4/2021 at 01:30 PM in Courtroom 14106 before Judge James L. Robart. Dispositive motions due by 10/6/2020, Attorney settlement conference to be held by 11/5/2020, Motions in Limine due by 11/23/2020, Pretrial Order due by 12/14/2020, Deposition Designations due by 12/16/2020, Pretrial Conference set for 12/21/2020 at 02:30 PM in Courtroom 14106 before Judge James L. Robart. Trial briefs to be submitted by 12/28/2020, Proposed voir dire/jury instructions due by 12/28/2020. (AD) |
|
21 | 21
order
3 - Stipulation and Order ~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings
Wed 08/21 9:59 AM
STIPULATION AND ORDER re: parties'20 Stipulated Motion to Continue Trial Date. Jury Trial is continued to 1/4/2021 before Judge James L. Robart. The court extends the discovery cut-off until December 31, 2019, for the following g depositions only: (1) plaintiff's treating provider, (2) plaintiff's vocational/life care plan expert, (3) plaintiff's husband, and (4) defendants' expert. The court also DIRECTS the Clerk to issue an amended case schedule consistent with this order. Signed by Judge James L. Robart. (PM) |
|
Tuesday, August 13, 2019 | ||
20 | 20
misc
Stipulation
Tue 08/13 4:35 PM
STIPULATION AND PROPOSED ORDER TO CONTINUE TRIAL DATE by parties |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order | ||
Monday, August 12, 2019 | ||
19 | 19
notice
Notice of Unavailability
Mon 08/12 3:24 PM
NOTICE of Unavailability of counsel Kimberly Reppart for Defendants Jane Doe Cambronero, Jorge Cambronero from 8/15/19 - 8/23/19. |
|
Thursday, May 02, 2019 | ||
18 | 18
order
1 - Order
Thu 05/02 11:32 AM
ORDER denying parties'17 Stipulation to Extend Pretrial Deadlines. Signed by Judge James L. Robart. (MW) |
|
Wednesday, May 01, 2019 | ||
17 | 17
misc
Stipulation
Wed 05/01 2:38 PM
STIPULATION AND PROPOSED ORDER to Continue Pre-Trial Deadlines by parties re15 Minute Order Setting Trial Date and Related Dates,,, |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order | ||
Wednesday, September 26, 2018 | ||
16 | 16
notice
Notice-Other
Wed 09/26 4:17 PM
NOTICE re Admission of Responsibility ; filed by Defendants Jane Doe Cambronero, Jorge Cambronero. |
|
Monday, July 30, 2018 | ||
15 | 15
order
JLR Minute Order Setting Trial Date & Related Dates(FORM)
Mon 07/30 3:00 PM
MINUTE ORDER SETTING TRIAL DATE AND RELATED DATES by Judge James L. Robart; Length of Trial: *6-8 days*. Jury Trial is set for 11/12/2019 at 01:30 PM in Courtroom 14106 before Judge James L. Robart. Joinder of Parties due by 8/27/2018, Amended Pleadings due by 5/16/2019, Expert Witness Disclosure/Reports under FRCP 26(a)(2) due by 5/16/2019, Motions due by 6/17/2019, Discovery completed by 7/15/2019, Dispositive motions due by 8/14/2019, Attorney settlement conference to be held by 9/13/2019, Motions in Limine due by 10/1/2019, Pretrial Order due by 10/22/2019, Deposition Designations due by 10/24/2019, Pretrial Conference set for 10/28/2019 at 02:30 PM before Judge James L. Robart. Trial briefs to be submitted by 11/5/2019, Proposed voir dire/jury instructions due by 11/5/2019. (AD) |
|
Monday, July 23, 2018 | ||
14 | 14
misc
Joint Status Report
Mon 07/23 3:34 PM
JOINT STATUS REPORT signed by all parties estimated Trial Days: 6-8. Filed by Defendants Jane Doe Cambronero, Jorge Cambronero |
|
Thursday, July 19, 2018 | ||
13 | 13
order
1 - Order
Thu 07/19 2:30 PM
ORDER re11 Response to Order to Show Cause. Taking into account Ms. Treglown's admission that her damages claims exceed $75,000.00, the court is satisfied that it has diversity jurisdiction over this case. Signed by Judge James L. Robart. (PM) |
|
Wednesday, July 18, 2018 | ||
12 | 12
misc
Declaration (non motion)
Wed 07/18 3:19 PM
DECLARATION of Kimberly Reppart re11 Response to Order to Show Cause by Defendants Jane Doe Cambronero, Jorge Cambronero |
|
11 | 11
misc
Response to Order to Show Cause
Wed 07/18 3:18 PM
RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE by Defendants Jane Doe Cambronero, Jorge Cambronero |
|
Thursday, July 05, 2018 | ||
10 | 10
4
pgs
order
Order to Show Cause
Thu 07/05 8:38 AM
ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE why the court should not remand for lack of subject matter jurisdiction; Show Cause Response due within fourteen (14) days of the date of this order, by Judge James L. Robart. (SWT) |
|
Friday, June 22, 2018 | ||
9 | 9
1
pgs
order
Order Reassigning Case
Fri 06/22 4:15 PM
MINUTE ORDER REASSIGNING CASE by William M. McCool. Case reassigned to Judge James L. Robart for all further proceedings. Hon. Mary Alice Theiler no longer assigned to case. Cc to JLR. (KMP) |
|
Tuesday, June 19, 2018 | ||
8 | 8
order
Joint Status Report Order Form for Magistrate Judges
Tue 06/19 3:39 PM
ORDER REGARDING INITIAL DISCLOSURES, JOINT STATUS REPORT AND EARLY SETTLEMENT by Hon. Mary Alice Theiler. Joint Status Report due by 7/31/2018, FRCP 26f Conference Deadline is 7/17/2018, Initial Disclosure Deadline is 7/24/2018. (KMP) |
|
7 | 7
misc
Consent Letter & Form
Tue 06/19 3:38 PM
NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT TO A US MAGISTRATE JUDGE AND CONSENT FORM. If declining consent, return the executed form by 7/31/2018. Please Note: Forms must not be electronically filed with the Court. (KMP) |
|
utility
Notice to Filer- Consent
Tue 06/19 3:38 PM
***NOTICE TO PARTIES*** re7 Consent Form. This district has adopted an opt-out consent procedure. Each party will be deemed to have knowingly and voluntarily CONSENTED to proceed before the assigned Magistrate Judge UNLESS the consent form is returned by the due date indicating lack of consent. (KMP) |
||
Monday, June 18, 2018 | ||
6 | 6
utility
Judge Assignment Letter (Removal & Transfer cases only)
Mon 06/18 3:36 PM
LETTER from Clerk to counsel re: receipt of case from King County Superior Court and advising of WAWD case number and judge assignment. (DJ) |
|
utility
Add and Terminate Judges
Mon 06/18 3:34 PM
Hon. Mary Alice Theiler added. (DJ) |
||
Friday, June 15, 2018 | ||
5 | 5
misc
Jury Demand
Fri 06/15 1:11 PM
DEMAND for JURY TRIAL by Defendants Jane Doe Cabronero, Jorge Cabronero |
|
4 | 4
misc
Verification of State Court Records
Fri 06/15 1:07 PM
VERIFICATION OF STATE COURT RECORDS re1 Notice of Removal by Defendants Jane Doe Cabronero, Jorge Cabronero |
|
3 | 3
notice
Notice-Other
Fri 06/15 12:59 PM
NOTICE re1 Notice of Removal ; filed by Defendants Jane Doe Cabronero, Jorge Cabronero. |
|
2 | 2
misc
Declaration (non motion)
Fri 06/15 12:42 PM
DECLARATION of Kimberly A. Reppart re1 Notice of Removal by Defendants Jane Doe Cabronero, Jorge Cabronero |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Notice of Removal
Fri 06/15 12:27 PM
NOTICE OF REMOVAL from King County Superior Court, case number 18 2-07294 8; , filed by Jane Doe Cabronero, Jorge Cabronero. |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit Complaint, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit Civil Cover Sheet |