Lee v. United States Citizenship and Immigration Services et al
Washington Western District Court | |
Judge: | Ricardo S Martinez |
Case #: | 2:18-cv-00876 |
Nature of Suit | 899 Other Statutes - Administrative Procedure Act/Review or Appeal of Agency Decision |
Cause | 08:1447 Petition for Hearing on Naturalization Application |
Case Filed: | Jun 15, 2018 |
Terminated: | Sep 20, 2018 |
Last checked: Wednesday Dec 12, 2018 1:23 AM PST |
Defendant
James Mattis
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Cynthia Munita
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
United States Citizenship and Immigration Services
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
United States Department of Defense
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
United States Department of Homeland Security
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
L Francis Cissna
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Kirstjen M Nielsen
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Private First Class Han Sol Lee
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 04/17/2024 11:59 PM PDT |
Thursday, September 20, 2018 | ||
32 | 32
3
pgs
order
Order on Stipulated Motion ~Util - Terminate Case
Thu 09/20 3:41 PM
ORDER re: parties'31 Stipulated Motion to Dismiss. It is ORDERED that this matter is dismissed with prejudice and without fees or costs to either party. Signed by Judge Ricardo S. Martinez. (PM) |
|
Wednesday, September 19, 2018 | ||
31 | 31
motion
Stipulated Motion
Wed 09/19 4:03 PM
Stipulated MOTION and Proposed Order to Dismiss , filed by Defendants L. Francis Cissna, James Mattis, Cynthia Munita, Kirstjen Nielsen, United States Citizenship and Immigration Services, United States Department of Defense, United States Department of Homeland Security. Noting Date 9/19/2018, (Morehead, Sarah) |
|
Friday, September 14, 2018 | ||
30 | 30
notice
Notice of Motion Re-Noted
Fri 09/14 2:59 PM
NOTICE that the following is RE-NOTED:26 MOTION for Protective Order ,25 MOTION to Dismiss or in the Alternative, to Stay . Filed by Defendants L. Francis Cissna, James Mattis, Cynthia Munita, Kirstjen Nielsen, United States Citizenship and Immigration Services, United States Department of Defense, United States Department of Homeland Security. Noting Date 10/5/2018, (Morehead, Sarah) |
|
Monday, September 10, 2018 | ||
29 | 29
2
pgs
order
Order on Stipulated Motion ~Util - Set/Reset Motion Noting Date
Mon 09/10 3:18 PM
ORDER granting parties'28 Stipulated Motion Amending the Briefing Schedule on Defendants' 26 Motion for a Protective Order . Plaintiff's response to Defendants' Motion for a Protective Order is due September 17, 2018, and the noting date for the Motion is set for September 21,2018. Signed by Judge Ricardo S. Martinez. (TH) |
|
Friday, September 07, 2018 | ||
28 | 28
motion
Stipulated Motion
Fri 09/07 5:54 PM
Stipulated MOTION Amending the Briefing Schedule on Defendants Motion for a Protective Order , filed by Plaintiff Han Sol Lee. Noting Date 9/7/2018, (Friedman, Robert) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order | ||
Thursday, September 06, 2018 | ||
27 | 27
respm
Declaration
Thu 09/06 3:45 PM
DECLARATION of Sarah Morehead filed by Defendants L. Francis Cissna, James Mattis, Cynthia Munita, Kirstjen Nielsen, United States Citizenship and Immigration Services, United States Department of Defense, United States Department of Homeland Security re26 MOTION for Protective Order(Morehead, Sarah) |
|
Att: 1 12 pgs Exhibit A, | ||
Att: 2 10 pgs Exhibit B, | ||
Att: 3 6 pgs Exhibit C, | ||
Att: 4 Exhibit D | ||
26 | 26
motion
Protective Order
Thu 09/06 3:42 PM
MOTION for Protective Order , filed by Defendants L. Francis Cissna, James Mattis, Cynthia Munita, Kirstjen Nielsen, United States Citizenship and Immigration Services, United States Department of Defense, United States Department of Homeland Security. Noting Date 9/14/2018, (Morehead, Sarah) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order | ||
Tuesday, August 28, 2018 | ||
25 | 25
12
pgs
motion
Dismiss
Tue 08/28 3:41 PM
MOTION to Dismiss or in the Alternative, to Stay , filed by Defendants L. Francis Cissna, James Mattis, Cynthia Munita, Kirstjen Nielsen, United States Citizenship and Immigration Services, United States Department of Defense, United States Department of Homeland Security. Noting Date 9/21/2018, (Morehead, Sarah) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order Granting Defendants Motion to Dismiss | ||
Tuesday, August 21, 2018 | ||
24 | 24
order
RSM Order Setting Trial Date and Related Dates(FORM)
Tue 08/21 2:34 PM
ORDER SETTING TRIAL DATE AND RELATED DATES by Judge Ricardo S. Martinez. Length of Trial: *2 days*. Bench Trial is set for 6/17/2019 at 09:00 AM before Judge Ricardo S. Martinez. Joinder of Parties due by 9/18/2018, Amended Pleadings due by 9/18/2018, Expert Witness Disclosure/Reports under FRCP 26(a)(2) due by 12/19/2018, Motions due by 1/18/2019, Discovery completed by 2/19/2019, Dispositive motions due by 3/19/2019, 39.1 mediation to be completed by 5/3/2019, Motions in Limine due by 5/20/2019, Pretrial Order due by 6/5/2019, Trial briefs to be submitted by 6/12/2019, Proposed Findings of Fact and Conclusions of Law to be submitted by 6/12/2019. (LC) |
|
Friday, August 17, 2018 | ||
23 | 23
misc
Joint Status Report
Fri 08/17 1:56 PM
JOINT STATUS REPORT signed by all parties estimated Trial Days: 2. Filed by Plaintiff Han Sol Lee.(Friedman, Robert) |
|
Thursday, August 09, 2018 | ||
22 | 22
order
2 - Minute Order
Thu 08/09 8:23 PM
MINUTE ORDER by Chief Judge Ricardo S. Martinez re:21 Initial Disclosures filed by Han Sol Lee. The following MINUTE ORDER is made by direction of the Court, the Honorable Ricardo S. Martinez, Chief United States District Judge: Plaintiff has filed his Initial Disclosures with the Court in violation of the Court's Local Rules. Local Civil Rule 5 explicitly states that "Rule 26 initial disclosures and discovery requests and responses must not be filed until they are used in the proceedings or the court orders filing." LCR 5(b)(emphasis added). Accordingly, the Court will DISREGARD the filing. Counsel are reminded that the Court expects all counsel to be familiar with and follow the Court's Local Rules. The Court further reminds local counsel of its obligation to ensure that pro hac vice counsel follow the Court's Rules. (SSM) |
|
21 | 21
4
pgs
discov
Initial Disclosures
Thu 08/09 2:37 PM
INITIAL DISCLOSURES Filed by Plaintiff Han Sol Lee.(Riley, Nicolas) |
|
Wednesday, August 08, 2018 | ||
20 | 20
notice
Notice of Appearance
Wed 08/08 3:03 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Sarah K Morehead on behalf of Defendants L. Francis Cissna, James Mattis, Cynthia Munita, Kirstjen Nielsen, United States Citizenship and Immigration Services, United States Department of Defense, United States Department of Homeland Security. (Morehead, Sarah) |
|
Thursday, July 19, 2018 | ||
19 | 19
service
Affidavit of Service of Summons & Complaint
Thu 07/19 10:03 AM
AFFIDAVIT of Mailing of Summons and Complaint to United States Attorney for the Western District of Washington Annette L. Hayes on 6/26/2018, filed by Plaintiff Han Sol Lee.(Friedman, Robert) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A - Proof of Service | ||
18 | 18
service
Affidavit of Service of Summons & Complaint
Thu 07/19 10:02 AM
AFFIDAVIT of Mailing of Summons and Complaint to United States Attorney General Jeff Sessions on 7/3/2018, filed by Plaintiff Han Sol Lee.(Friedman, Robert) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A - Proof of Service | ||
17 | 17
service
Affidavit of Service of Summons & Complaint
Thu 07/19 9:59 AM
AFFIDAVIT of Mailing of Summons and Complaint to United States Citizenship and Immigration Services on 6/19/2018, filed by Plaintiff Han Sol Lee.(Friedman, Robert) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A - Proof of Service | ||
16 | 16
service
Affidavit of Service of Summons & Complaint
Thu 07/19 9:58 AM
AFFIDAVIT of Mailing of Summons and Complaint to Secretary of Homeland Security Kirstjen Nielsen on 6/19/2018, filed by Plaintiff Han Sol Lee.(Friedman, Robert) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A - Proof of Service | ||
15 | 15
service
Affidavit of Service of Summons & Complaint
Thu 07/19 9:57 AM
AFFIDAVIT of Mailing of Summons and Complaint to Cynthia Munita on 6/19/2018, filed by Plaintiff Han Sol Lee.(Friedman, Robert) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A - Proof of Service | ||
14 | 14
service
Affidavit of Service of Summons & Complaint
Thu 07/19 9:56 AM
AFFIDAVIT of Mailing of Summons and Complaint to Secretary of Defense James Mattis on 6/19/2018, filed by Plaintiff Han Sol Lee.(Friedman, Robert) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A - Proof of Service | ||
13 | 13
service
Affidavit of Service of Summons & Complaint
Thu 07/19 9:54 AM
AFFIDAVIT of Mailing of Summons and Complaint to L. Francis Cissna on 6/19/2018, filed by Plaintiff Han Sol Lee.(Friedman, Robert) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A - Proof of Service | ||
12 | 12
service
Affidavit of Service of Summons & Complaint
Thu 07/19 9:53 AM
AFFIDAVIT of Mailing of Summons and Complaint to United States Department of Homeland Security on 6/19/2018, filed by Plaintiff Han Sol Lee.(Friedman, Robert) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A - Proof of Service | ||
11 | 11
service
Affidavit of Service of Summons & Complaint
Thu 07/19 9:52 AM
AFFIDAVIT of Mailing of Summons and Complaint to Department of Defense on 6/19/2018, filed by Plaintiff Han Sol Lee.(Friedman, Robert) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A - Proof of Service | ||
Friday, July 06, 2018 | ||
10 | 10
order
Joint Status Report Order Form for District Judges
Fri 07/06 4:08 PM
ORDER REGARDING INITIAL DISCLOSURES AND JOINT STATUS REPORT Joint Status Report due by 8/17/2018, FRCP 26f Conference Deadline is 8/3/2018, Initial Disclosure Deadline is 8/10/2018, by Judge Ricardo S. Martinez. (LW) |
|
Tuesday, June 26, 2018 | ||
9 | 9
service
Summons Issued
Tue 06/26 11:02 AM
Summons(es) Electronically Issued as to defendants - Jefferson B. Sessions(PM) |
|
Att: 1 Summons - Annette Hayes, U.S. Attorney Seattle | ||
Friday, June 22, 2018 | ||
8 | 8
notice
Notice of Pendency of Other Action
Fri 06/22 7:06 AM
NOTICE of Pendency of Other Action in United States District Court for the District of Columbia, case number in other court 17-cv-998 ; filed by Plaintiff Han Sol Lee. (Friedman, Robert) |
|
Tuesday, June 19, 2018 | ||
7 | 7
service
Summons Issued
Tue 06/19 11:25 AM
Summons(es) Electronically Issued as to defendant(s) L. Francis Cissna, James Mattis, Cynthia Munita, Kirstjen Nielsen, United States Citizenship and Immigration Services, United States Department of Defense, United States Department of Homeland Security(ST) |
|
Att: 1 Summons, | ||
Att: 2 Summons, | ||
Att: 3 Summons, | ||
Att: 4 Summons, | ||
Att: 5 Summons, | ||
Att: 6 Summons | ||
utility
Add and Terminate Judges
Tue 06/19 11:16 AM
Judge Ricardo S Martinez added. (ST) |
||
Friday, June 15, 2018 | ||
6 | 6
order
Order on Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice
Fri 06/15 3:23 PM
ORDER re4 Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Court ADMITS Attorney Plaintiff Robert Friedman for Han Sol Lee, by Clerk William M McCool. No document associated with this docket entry, text only. NOTE TO COUNSEL: Local counsel agrees to sign all filings and to be prepared to handle the matter, including the trial thereof, in the event the applicant is unable to be present on any date scheduled by the court, pursuant to LCR 83.1(d). (DS) |
|
5 | 5
order
Order on Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice
Fri 06/15 3:17 PM
ORDER re3 Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Court ADMITS Attorney Nicolas Y. Riley for Plaintiff Han Sol Lee, by Clerk William M McCool. No document associated with this docket entry, text only. NOTE TO COUNSEL: Local counsel agrees to sign all filings and to be prepared to handle the matter, including the trial thereof, in the event the applicant is unable to be present on any date scheduled by the court, pursuant to LCR 83.1(d). (DS) |
|
4 | 4
misc
Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice
Fri 06/15 2:12 PM
APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY Robert Friedman FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for Plaintiff Han Sol Lee (Fee Paid) Receipt No. 0981-5359172 (Adams, Matt) |
|
3 | 3
misc
Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice
Fri 06/15 2:07 PM
APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY Nicolas Y. Riley FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for Plaintiff Han Sol Lee (Fee Paid) Receipt No. 0981-5359136 (Adams, Matt) |
|
2 | 2
misc
Praecipe for a Summons
Fri 06/15 1:50 PM
PRAECIPE TO ISSUE SUMMONS by Plaintiff Han Sol Lee(Adams, Matt) |
|
Att: 1 Summons Sessions, | ||
Att: 2 Summons USAO | ||
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Fri 06/15 12:44 PM
COMPLAINT against All Defendants Attorney Matt Adams added to party Han Sol Lee(pty:pla), filed by Han Sol Lee.(Adams, Matt) |
|
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet, | ||
Att: 2 Civil Cover Sheet Attachment A, | ||
Att: 3 Summons USCIS, | ||
Att: 4 Summons Cissna, | ||
Att: 5 Summons Munita, | ||
Att: 6 Summons Department of Homeland Security, | ||
Att: 7 Summons Nielsen, | ||
Att: 8 Summons Department of Defense, | ||
Att: 9 Summons Mattis |