Northwest Administrators, Inc v. National Express Transit Service Corporation
Washington Western District Court | |
Judge: | Ricardo S Martinez |
Case #: | 2:18-cv-00880 |
Nature of Suit | 791 Labor - Employee Retirement Income Security Act |
Cause | 29:1132 E.R.I.S.A.-Employee Benefits |
Case Filed: | Jun 15, 2018 |
Terminated: | Jan 29, 2019 |
Last checked: Wednesday Dec 12, 2018 1:07 AM PST |
Defendant
National Express Transit Service Corporation
|
|
Plaintiff
Northwest Administrators Inc
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 04/23/2024 11:59 PM PDT |
Tuesday, January 29, 2019 | ||
utility
Terminate Civil Case
Tue 01/29 9:55 AM
***Civil Case Terminated per13 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal Without Prejudice. (PM) |
||
Monday, January 28, 2019 | ||
13 | 13
notice
Notice of Voluntary Dismissal (case)
Mon 01/28 10:51 AM
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal of case by Plaintiff Northwest Administrators Inc |
|
Monday, October 01, 2018 | ||
12 | 12
misc
Declaration (non motion)
Mon 10/01 2:24 PM
DECLARATION of Robert Rusch re11 Order on Motion for Order by Plaintiff Northwest Administrators, Inc |
|
Friday, August 24, 2018 | ||
11 | 11
2
pgs
order
Order on Motion for Order
Fri 08/24 2:48 PM
ORDER granting Plaintiff's8 Motion for Order to Compel Audit. Signed by Judge Ricardo S. Martinez. (PM) |
|
Thursday, August 23, 2018 | ||
10 | 10
respm
Declaration
Thu 08/23 11:24 AM
DECLARATION of Russell J. Reid filed by Plaintiff Northwest Administrators, Inc re8 MOTION for Order to Compel Audit |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A-B, pp 3-7 to Russell J. Reid's Affidavit | ||
9 | 9
respm
Declaration
Thu 08/23 11:23 AM
DECLARATION of Kyle Bailey filed by Plaintiff Northwest Administrators, Inc re8 MOTION for Order to Compel Audit |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A-C, 4-64 to Kyle Bailey's Declaration | ||
8 | 8
8
pgs
motion
Order
Thu 08/23 11:21 AM
MOTION for Order to Compel Audit , filed by Plaintiff Northwest Administrators, Inc. Noting Date 8/23/2018, |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order | ||
Thursday, July 26, 2018 | ||
7 | 7
1
pgs
order
Order on Motion for Default
Thu 07/26 9:55 AM
ORDER granting6 Motion for Default Against National Express Transit Service Corporation signed by Clerk William M. McCool.(LW) |
|
Wednesday, July 25, 2018 | ||
6 | 6
motion
Default
Wed 07/25 2:53 PM
MOTION for Default Against National Express Transit Service Corporation , filed by Plaintiff Northwest Administrators, Inc. Noting Date 7/25/2018, |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A, pp 4-5 to Russell J. Reid's Affidavit, | ||
Att: 2 Proposed Order | ||
Friday, July 06, 2018 | ||
5 | 5
order
Joint Status Report Order Form for District Judges
Fri 07/06 4:08 PM
ORDER REGARDING INITIAL DISCLOSURES AND JOINT STATUS REPORT Joint Status Report due by 8/17/2018, FRCP 26f Conference Deadline is 8/3/2018, Initial Disclosure Deadline is 8/10/2018, by Judge Ricardo S. Martinez. (LW) |
|
4 | 4
service
Summons Returned Executed
Fri 07/06 11:54 AM
SERVICE OF SUMMONS and Complaint returned executed upon defendant National Express Transit Service Corporation on 6/26/2018 |
|
Tuesday, June 19, 2018 | ||
3 | 3
service
Summons Issued
Tue 06/19 12:14 PM
Summons(es) Electronically Issued as to defendant(s) National Express Transit Service Corporation (ST) |
|
utility
Add and Terminate Judges
Tue 06/19 12:12 PM
Judge Ricardo S Martinez added. (ST) |
||
Friday, June 15, 2018 | ||
2 | 2
discov
Corporate Disclosure Statement
Fri 06/15 2:13 PM
CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT indicating no Corporate Parents and/or Affiliates. Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1. Filed by Northwest Administrators, Inc |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Fri 06/15 1:48 PM
COMPLAINT to Compel Audit against defendant(s) National Express Transit Service Corporation , filed by Northwest Administrators, Inc. |
|
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet, | ||
Att: 2 Summons |