Portcaan Unipessoal LDA v. Korczak et al
Washington Western District Court | |
Judge: | Robert S Lasnik |
Case #: | 2:18-cv-00881 |
Nature of Suit | 370 Torts - Personal Property - Other Fraud |
Cause | 18:1030 Computer Fraud and Abuse Act |
Case Filed: | Jun 15, 2018 |
Last checked: Wednesday Dec 12, 2018 1:34 AM PST |
Defendant
John Does 6-10
|
|
Defendant
John Doe 2
|
|
Plaintiff
Portcaan Unipessoal LDA
|
Represented By
|
TERMINATED PARTIES | |
Defendant
John Doe 1
Terminated: 11/29/2018
|
|
Defendant
John Doe 3
Terminated: 11/29/2018
|
|
Defendant
John Doe 4
Terminated: 11/29/2018
|
|
Defendant
John Doe 5
Terminated: 11/29/2018
|
Docket last updated: 76 minutes ago |
Thursday, January 10, 2019 | ||
18 | 18
order
Judgment by Court
Thu 01/10 2:37 PM
JUDGMENT BY COURT: Judgment is entered in favor of plaintiff and against defendant Robert H. Johnson in the following amounts: Principal Amount of Judgment in USD: $37,634.78; Pre- judgment Interest at $2.77 per day: $1,736.71; Costs: $709.51 for a total of $40,081.00. (SWT) |
|
17 | 17
2
pgs
order
Order on Motion for Default Judgment
Thu 01/10 11:37 AM
ORDER granting plaintiff's16 Request for Default Judgment; directing Clerk of Court to enter judgment in favor of plaintiff and against defendant Robert H. Johnson. Signed by Judge Robert S. Lasnik. (SWT) |
|
Wednesday, December 19, 2018 | ||
16 | 16
motion
Default Judgment
Wed 12/19 3:56 PM
MOTION for Default Judgment against ROBERT H. JOHNSON , filed by Plaintiff Portcaan Unipessoal LDA. Noting Date 12/19/2018, (Barrera, Paul) |
|
Att: 1 Supplement Motion for Entry of Default Judgment, | ||
Att: 2 Supplement Declaration in Support of Default Judgment | ||
Thursday, December 13, 2018 | ||
15 | 15
order
Clerks Entry of Default
Thu 12/13 10:37 AM
Clerk's ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to Defendant John Doe 2, a.k.a. Robert H. Johnson (KERR) |
|
Tuesday, December 11, 2018 | ||
14 | 14
motion
Default
Tue 12/11 6:43 AM
MOTION for Default against Robert H. Johnson , filed by Plaintiff Portcaan Unipessoal LDA. Noting Date 12/11/2018, (Barrera, Paul) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order | ||
Thursday, November 29, 2018 | ||
13 | 13
order
1 - Order ~Util - Add and Terminate Parties
Thu 11/29 3:08 PM
ORDER dismissing claims against defendants Doe 1/Robert Korczak, Doe 3/Global Private Financial Service LLC, Doe 4/Global Financial Private Capital, and Doe 5/Global Private Investments LLC. Signed by Judge Robert S. Lasnik. (SWT) |
|
Monday, November 19, 2018 | ||
12 | 12
service
Affidavit of Service of Summons & Complaint
Mon 11/19 5:02 PM
AFFIDAVIT of Service of Summons and Complaint on John Doe 2, a.k.a. Robert H. Johnson on 11/19/2018, filed by Plaintiff Portcaan Unipessoal LDA. (Barrera, Paul) |
|
Tuesday, October 09, 2018 | ||
11 | 11
order
1 - Order
Tue 10/09 12:11 PM
ORDER granting in part plaintiff's request for extension of time to effect service; re plaintiff's9 Response to Order to Show Cause. Plaintiff shall have an additional sixty days from the date of this Order to effect service of process upon Doe defendants. Signed by Judge Robert S. Lasnik. (SWT) |
|
Friday, October 05, 2018 | ||
10 | 10
misc
Declaration (non motion)
Fri 10/05 12:26 PM
DECLARATION of Counsel in Support of Plaintiff's Response to Order to Show Cause re9 Response to Order to Show Cause by Plaintiff Portcaan Unipessoal LDA (Barrera, Paul) |
|
9 | 9
misc
Response to Order to Show Cause
Fri 10/05 12:24 PM
RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE by Plaintiff Portcaan Unipessoal LDA(Barrera, Paul) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order | ||
Friday, September 14, 2018 | ||
8 | 8
1
pgs
order
Order to Show Cause
Fri 09/14 11:39 AM
ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE why the complaint should not be dismissed. Show Cause Response due by 10/5/2018. Signed by Judge Robert S. Lasnik. (SWT) |
|
Monday, August 13, 2018 | ||
7 | 7
misc
Affidavit of Service (non-process)
Mon 08/13 8:37 AM
AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE by Plaintiff Portcaan Unipessoal LDA (Barrera, Paul) |
|
Wednesday, July 11, 2018 | ||
6 | 6
service
Summons Issued
Wed 07/11 11:29 AM
Summons(es) Electronically Issued as to defendant(s) John Doe 1, John Doe 2, John Doe 3, John Doe 4, John Doe 5(SWT) |
|
Att: 1 Summons, | ||
Att: 2 Summons, | ||
Att: 3 Summons, | ||
Att: 4 Summons | ||
Tuesday, July 10, 2018 | ||
5 | 5
misc
Praecipe for a Summons
Tue 07/10 1:57 PM
PRAECIPE TO ISSUE SUMMONS TO DEFENDANTS by Plaintiff Portcaan Unipessoal LDA(Barrera, Paul) |
|
Att: 1 Summons, | ||
Att: 2 Summons, | ||
Att: 3 Summons, | ||
Att: 4 Summons | ||
Thursday, June 21, 2018 | ||
4 | 4
discov
Corporate Disclosure Statement
Thu 06/21 10:28 AM
CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT indicating no Corporate Parents and/or Affiliates. Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1. Filed by Portcaan Unipessoal LDA (Barrera, Paul) |
|
3 | 3
misc
Civil Cover Sheet
Thu 06/21 10:23 AM
CIVIL COVER SHEET ; filed by Plaintiff Portcaan Unipessoal LDA. (Barrera, Paul) |
|
Tuesday, June 19, 2018 | ||
2 | 2
utility
Notice to Filer
Tue 06/19 1:25 PM
NOTICE TO FILER: re1 Complaint. Notice of Filing Deficiency ** Action Required ** See Attached Letter for More Information and Instructions. (ST) |
|
utility
Add and Terminate Judges
Tue 06/19 1:18 PM
Judge Robert S. Lasnik added. (ST) |
||
utility
Corporate Disclosure Statement - Notice of Deadlines
Tue 06/19 1:24 PM
NOTICE Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1, Plaintiff(s) must file a Corporate Disclosure Statement by 6/26/2018. (ST) |
||
Friday, June 15, 2018 | ||
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Fri 06/15 3:24 PM
COMPLAINT against All Defendants , filed by PORTCAAN UNIPESSOAL LDA..(Barrera, Paul) |