DiscoverOrg, LLC v. Netsmartz, LLC
Washington Western District Court | |
Judge: | Benjamin H Settle |
Case #: | 3:18-cv-05487 |
Nature of Suit | 890 Other Statutes - Other Statutory Actions |
Cause | 17:101 Copyright Infringement |
Case Filed: | Jun 15, 2018 |
Terminated: | Aug 07, 2018 |
Last checked: Wednesday Dec 12, 2018 1:10 AM PST |
Defendant
Netsmartz, LLC
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
DiscoverOrg, LLC
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 04/18/2024 11:59 PM PDT |
Thursday, November 01, 2018 | ||
12 | 12
1
pgs
utility
Report Regarding Patent/Trademark/Copyright
Thu 11/01 10:51 AM
REPORT on the filing or determination of an action regarding a Copyright. Report mailed to the US Copyright Office. (GMR) |
|
Tuesday, August 07, 2018 | ||
11 | 11
3
pgs
notice
Notice of Voluntary Dismissal (case)
Tue 08/07 11:03 AM
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal of case by Plaintiff DiscoverOrg, LLC (Du Wors, John) |
|
utility
Terminate Civil Case
Tue 08/07 11:52 AM
***Civil Case Terminated. (TG) |
||
Wednesday, July 18, 2018 | ||
10 | 10
2
pgs
order
3 - Stipulation and Order ~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines
Wed 07/18 10:29 AM
STIPULATION AND ORDER signed by Judge Benjamin H. Settle re9 Stipulation filed by Netsmartz, LLC. Netsmartz, LLC answer due 8/6/2018. (TG) |
|
Tuesday, July 17, 2018 | ||
9 | 9
misc
Stipulation
Tue 07/17 10:05 AM
STIPULATION AND PROPOSED ORDER TO EXTEND DEADLINE by parties (Hodges, Benjamin) |
|
Friday, July 13, 2018 | ||
8 | 8
notice
Notice of Appearance
Fri 07/13 3:40 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Benjamin J Hodges on behalf of Defendant Netsmartz, LLC. (Hodges, Benjamin) |
|
7 | 7
notice
Notice of Appearance
Fri 07/13 3:38 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Tim J Filer on behalf of Defendant Netsmartz, LLC. (Filer, Tim) |
|
Tuesday, June 19, 2018 | ||
6 | 6
order
Joint Status Report Order Form for District Judges
Tue 06/19 1:31 PM
ORDER REGARDING INITIAL DISCLOSURES AND JOINT STATUS REPORT Joint Status Report due by 9/17/2018, FRCP 26f Conference Deadline is 9/4/2018, Initial Disclosure Deadline is 9/10/2018, by Judge Benjamin H. Settle. (TG) |
|
5 | 5
order
Discovery and Depositions Order (FORM)
Tue 06/19 1:30 PM
MINUTE ORDER REGARDING DISCOVERY AND DEPOSITIONS by Judge Benjamin H. Settle. (TG) |
|
Monday, June 18, 2018 | ||
4 | 4
utility
Report Regarding Patent/Trademark/Copyright
Mon 06/18 9:07 AM
REPORT on the filing of an action. Mailed to the US Copyright Office on 6/18/18.(CMG) |
|
Att: 1 complaint | ||
3 | 3
service
Summons Issued
Mon 06/18 9:03 AM
Summons Electronically Issued as to defendant Netsmartz LLC (CMG) |
|
utility
Add and Terminate Judges
Mon 06/18 9:01 AM
Judge Benjamin H. Settle added. (CMG) |
||
Friday, June 15, 2018 | ||
2 | 2
discov
Corporate Disclosure Statement
Fri 06/15 11:34 AM
CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT identifying Corporate Parent DiscoverOrg Holdings, LLC for DiscoverOrg, LLC. Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1. Filed by DiscoverOrg, LLC (Du Wors, John) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Fri 06/15 11:32 AM
COMPLAINT against defendant(s) Netsmartz LLC with JURY DEMAND Attorney John David Du Wors added to party DiscoverOrg, LLC(pty:pla), filed by DiscoverOrg, LLC.(Du Wors, John) |
|
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet, | ||
Att: 2 Summons, | ||
Att: 3 Report on Copyrights (AO Form 121) |