WILLIAMS v. BRISTOL-MYERS SQUIBB COMPANY et al
Florida Northern District Court | |
Judge: | M Casey Rodgers |
Referred: | Gary R Jones |
Case #: | 3:18-cv-01428 |
Nature of Suit | 367 Torts - Personal Injury - Health Care/Pharmaceutical Personal Injury/Product Liability |
Cause | 28:1332 Diversity-Product Liability |
Case Filed: | Jun 16, 2018 |
Terminated: | Jun 05, 2020 |
Last checked: Thursday Dec 13, 2018 3:39 AM EST |
Defendant
BRISTOL-MYERS SQUIBB COMPANY
|
|
Defendant
OTSUKA AMERICA PHARMACEUTICAL INC
|
|
Defendant
OTSUKA PHARMACEUTICAL CO LTD
|
|
Plaintiff
CHRISTA A WILLIAMS
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 05/30/2023 11:59 PM EDT |
Friday, June 05, 2020 | ||
3 | 3
28
pgs
order
Order Dismissing Case
Tue 06/09 11:01 AM
ORDER - The Court has been advised that the cases identified on Exhibit A were settled under the global settlement program for this litigation. Accordingly: The cases identified on Exhibit A are DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE from the active docket of the Court. Signed by JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS on 6/5/2020. (djb) |
|
Monday, June 18, 2018 | ||
2 | 2
service
Summons Issued
Mon 06/18 8:48 AM
Summons Issued as to BRISTOL-MYERS SQUIBB COMPANY, #1 OTSUKA AMERICA PHARMACEUTICAL INC, #2 OTSUKA PHARMACEUTICAL CO LTD. (djb) |
|
Saturday, June 16, 2018 | ||
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Sat 06/16 8:36 AM
COMPLAINT Christa A Williams against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number AFLNDC-4205837.), filed by CHRISTA A WILLIAMS. (HANSEN, PAMELA) |
|
Att: 1 Summons to Bristol-Myers, | ||
Att: 2 Summons to Otsuka America, | ||
Att: 3 Summons to Otsuka Pharmaceutical, | ||
Att: 4 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet | ||
utility
Add and Terminate Judges
Mon 06/18 8:19 AM
MAGISTRATE JUDGE GARY R JONES added. MAGISTRATE JUDGE ELIZABETH M TIMOTHY no longer assigned to case. (djb) |