WPLJ Radio, LLC
Member Case
Lead case is: 1:09-bk-17442
Lead case is: 1:09-bk-17442
New York Southern Bankruptcy Court | |
Chapter 11 | |
Judge: | Burton R Lifland |
Case #: | 1:09-bk-17490 |
Case Filed: | Dec 20, 2009 |
Terminated: | Sep 01, 2010 |
Debtor
WPLJ Radio, LLC
2 Penn Plz Fl 17
New York, NY 10121-0101 |
Represented By
|
Last checked: never |
Claims and Noticing Agent
Kurtzman Carson Consultants LLC
2335 Alaska Avenue
El Segundo, CA 90245 |
|
U.S. Trustee
United States Trustee
Office of the United States Trustee U.S. Federal Office Building 201 Varick Street, Room 1006
New York, NY 10014 |
Docket last updated: 8 minutes ago |
Wednesday, September 01, 2010 | ||
Case Closed. (Gadson, Carol) | ||
Tuesday, August 31, 2010 | ||
7 | 7 Order of Final Decree signed on 8/31/2010. (Gadson, Carol) | |
Tuesday, April 27, 2010 | ||
Receipt of Amended Schedules 09-17490 brl) [misc,schaja] ( 26.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number 6773303. Fee amount 26.00. (U.S. Treasury) | ||
Monday, April 26, 2010 | ||
6 | 6 Amended Schedules filed:, Schedule F, Schedule G filed by Jonathan S. Henes on behalf of WPLJ Radio, LLC. (Henes, Jonathan) | |
Tuesday, February 02, 2010 | ||
5 | 5 Statement of Financial Affairs filed by Jonathan S. Henes on behalf of WPLJ Radio, LLC. (Henes, Jonathan) | |
4 | 4 Schedules filed: /Debtor's Schedules of Assets and Liabilities filed by Jonathan S. Henes on behalf of WPLJ Radio, LLC. (Henes, Jonathan) | |
Tuesday, December 22, 2009 | ||
3 | 3 Order signed on 12/21/2009 Granting Motion for Joint Administration . All further pleadings and other papers shall be filed in, and all further docket entries shall be made in LEAD CASE NO. 09-17442 (BRL). (Gadson, Carol) | |
Case Joint Administration under LEAD CASE NO. 09-17442 (Gadson, Carol) | ||
Monday, December 21, 2009 | ||
Judge Burton R. Lifland added to the case. (Porter, Minnie). | ||
Sunday, December 20, 2009 | ||
2 | 2 Motion for Joint Administration /Debtors' Motion for an Order Directing Joint Administration of Related Chapter 11 Cases filed by Jonathan S. Henes on behalf of WPLJ Radio, LLC. (Henes, Jonathan) | |
1 | 1 23 pgs Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11). Order for Relief Entered. Incomplete Filings due by 1/4/2010, Chapter 11 Plan due by 4/19/2010, Disclosure Statement due by 4/19/2010, Initial Case Conference due by 1/19/2010, Filed by Jonathan S. Henes of Kirkland & Ellis LLP on behalf of WPLJ Radio, LLC. (Henes, Jonathan) | |
Receipt of Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11) 09-17490 [misc,824] (1039.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number 6485308. Fee amount 1039.00. (U.S. Treasury) |