NYBERG v. DAVIDSON et al
Florida Northern District Court | |
Judge: | William Stafford |
Referred: | Gary R Jones |
Case #: | 4:18-cv-00290 |
Nature of Suit | 555 Prisoner Petitions - Habeas Corpus - Prison Condition |
Cause | 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights |
Case Filed: | Jun 18, 2018 |
Terminated: | Aug 14, 2018 |
Defendant
MELINDA COONROD
|
|
Defendant
RICHARD D DAVIDSON
|
|
Plaintiff
DAVID ANSGAR NYBERG
|
Docket last updated: 05/30/2023 11:59 PM EDT |
Friday, September 13, 2019 | ||
23 | 23
misc
Mail Returned
Fri 09/13 1:01 PM
Mail Returned as Undeliverable. Mail sent to DAVID ANSGAR NYBERG Re:22 ORDER re21 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal. (** Return To Sender -- Released -- Paroled.**) (kdm) |
|
Thursday, September 05, 2019 | ||
22 | 22
2
pgs
order
Order
Thu 09/05 3:02 PM
ORDER re 21 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal. Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE GARY R JONES on 9/5/2019. This case is DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE. The Clerk is directed to close the file and terminate all pending motions. (kdm) |
|
Wednesday, September 04, 2019 | ||
utility
Action Required by District Judge - No NEFs in SEALED Cases
Wed 09/04 8:45 AM
ACTION REQUIRED BY DISTRICT JUDGE: Chambers of SENIOR JUDGE WILLIAM STAFFORD notified that action is needed Re:21 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal (toy) |
||
Tuesday, September 03, 2019 | ||
21 | 21
notice
Notice of Voluntary Dismissal
Wed 09/04 8:44 AM
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal Pursuant to F.R.C.P. 41(a)(1)(A)(i) by DAVID ANSGAR NYBERG (toy) |
|
Tuesday, August 06, 2019 | ||
20 | 20
3
pgs
order
Order ~Util - Set Deadlines
Tue 08/06 2:04 PM
ORDER directing Plaintiff to file a second amended complaint. ( Amended Pleadings due by 9/5/2019 .) Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE GARY R JONES on 8/6/19. (bkp) |
|
Wednesday, July 24, 2019 | ||
19 | 19
appeal
USCA Mandate
Thu 07/25 8:29 AM
MANDATE of USCA as to12 Notice of Appeal filed by DAVID ANSGAR NYBERG (USCA Number 18-13930 DD) It is hereby ordered, adjudged, and decreed that the18 opinion issued in this appeal is entered as the judgment of this Court. (File Destruction deadline set for 8/23/2019 .) (toy) |
|
Friday, June 21, 2019 | ||
appeal
~Util - Set Appeal Deadlines ~Util Terminate Appeal Deadlines
Fri 06/21 8:16 AM
Re-Set Appeal Status Deadline re12 Notice of Appeal :(Clerk to check status of Appeal on 9/21/2019 .) (toy) |
||
Wednesday, June 12, 2019 | ||
utility
Action Required by Magistrate Judge - No NEFs in SEALED Cases
Wed 06/12 9:14 AM
ACTION REQUIRED BY MAGISTRATE JUDGE: Chambers of MAGISTRATE JUDGE GARY R JONES notified that action is needed Re:18 USCA Judgment. (toy) |
||
Wednesday, June 05, 2019 | ||
utility
Action Required by District Judge - No NEFs in SEALED Cases
Wed 06/05 8:35 AM
ACTION REQUIRED BY DISTRICT JUDGE: Chambers of SENIOR JUDGE WILLIAM STAFFORD notified that action is needed Re:18 USCA Judgment. (toy) |
||
Tuesday, June 04, 2019 | ||
18 | 18
appeal
USCA Judgment
Wed 06/05 8:17 AM
OPINION of USCA (Case Number 18-13930 as to12 Notice of Appeal filed by DAVID ANSGAR NYBERG. We AFFIRM in part, REVERSE in part, and REMAND to the district court for proceedings on Nybergs First Amendment retaliation claim against Davidson. (toy) |
|
Tuesday, March 19, 2019 | ||
appeal
~Util - Set Appeal Deadlines ~Util Terminate Appeal Deadlines
Tue 03/19 11:11 AM
Set Appeal Status Deadline- re:12 Notice of Appeal. Clerk to check status of Appeal on 6/19/2019 . (cle) |
||
Monday, December 17, 2018 | ||
appeal
~Util - Set Appeal Deadlines ~Util Terminate Appeal Deadlines
Mon 12/17 10:34 AM
Set Appeal Status Deadline - re:12 Notice of Appeal. Clerk to check status of Appeal on 3/18/2019 . (cle) |
||
Tuesday, November 27, 2018 | ||
17 | 17
appeal
Electronic Availability of ROA
Tue 11/27 6:45 AM
Pursuant to F.R.A.P. 11(c), the Clerk of the District Court for the Northern District of Florida certifies that the record is complete for purposes of this appeal - re:12 Notice of Appeal. USCA Appeal Number: 18-13930 B. The entire record on appeal is available electronically. (cle) |
|
Friday, October 05, 2018 | ||
15 | 15
misc
Filing Fee Received
Fri 10/05 2:45 PM
Appeal Filing Fee: $505.00, receipt number FLN400035123. Fee status updated to paid. (cle) |
|
Friday, September 21, 2018 | ||
16 | 16
appeal
USCA Case Number
Tue 10/23 9:13 AM
USCA Case Number 18-13930 B is assigned to12 NOTICE OF APPEAL. (cle) |
|
Friday, September 14, 2018 | ||
14 | 14
appeal
Appeal Instructions
Fri 09/14 12:19 PM
Appeal Instructions re:12 Notice of Appeal: The Transcript Request Form is available on the Internet at http://www.flnd.uscourts.gov/forms/Attorney/ECCA_transcript_form_fillable.pdf **PLEASE NOTE** Separate forms must be filed for each court reporter. Transcript Order Form due by 9/28/2018 . (vkm) |
|
13 | 13
appeal
Transmission of Notice of Appeal and Docket Sheet to USCA
Fri 09/14 12:18 PM
Transmission of Notice of Appeal and Docket Sheet to US Court of Appeals re12 Notice of Appeal (vkm) |
|
appeal
~Util - Set Appeal Deadlines
Fri 09/14 12:20 PM
Set Deadlines re12 Notice of Appeal: Clerk to check status of Appeal on 12/14/2018 . (vkm) |
||
Monday, September 10, 2018 | ||
12 | 12
appeal
Notice of Appeal
Wed 09/12 4:48 PM
NOTICE OF APPEAL as to10 Order Adopting Report and Recommendation,11 Clerk's Judgment by DAVID ANSGAR NYBERG. (vkm) |
|
Tuesday, August 14, 2018 | ||
11 | 11
order
Judgment (Signed by Clerk: Not an Opinion)
Tue 08/14 10:15 AM
CLERK'S JUDGMENT entered pursuant to 10 Order Adopting the Magistrate Judge's Report and Recommendation. 90 Day Exhibit Return Deadline set for 11/13/2018 . (ckm) |
|
10 | 10
2
pgs
order
Order Adopting Report and Recommendation Order on Report and Recommendation
Tue 08/14 10:11 AM
ORDER ADOPTING THE MAGISTRATE JUDGE'S REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION - The magistrate judge's report and recommendation (doc. 7 ) is hereby ADOPTED and incorporated by reference in this order. The plaintiff's complaint and this action are DISMISSED for failure to state a claim upon which relief may be granted. The clerk shall enter judgment stating: "All claims are dismissed." Signed by SENIOR JUDGE WILLIAM STAFFORD on 8/14/2018. (ckm) |
|
Monday, August 06, 2018 | ||
9 | 9
respoth
Objection to Report and Recommendations
Mon 08/06 2:24 PM
OBJECTION to7 Report and Recommendations by DAVID ANSGAR NYBERG. (kdm) |
|
Wednesday, July 25, 2018 | ||
utility
Action Required by Magistrate Judge - No NEFs in SEALED Cases
Wed 07/25 3:30 PM
ACTION REQUIRED BY MAGISTRATE JUDGE: Chambers of MAGISTRATE JUDGE GARY R JONES notified that action is needed Re: 8 Filing Fee Paid. (vkm) |
||
Wednesday, July 18, 2018 | ||
7 | 7
motion
Report and Recommendation
Wed 07/18 5:08 PM
REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION that this case should be dismissed for failure to state a claim signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE GARY R JONES on 7/18/18. - R&R flag set Internal deadline for referral to district judge if objections are not filed earlier: 8/15/2018 . (tss) |
|
Thursday, July 12, 2018 | ||
6 | 6
notice
Notice - Other - See Separate Menu for Ntc of Appeal Options
Thu 07/12 12:54 PM
NOTICE Of Compliance by DAVID ANSGAR NYBERG. (kdm) |
|
5 | 5
30+
pgs
respoth
Memorandum in Support - Not Used for Motion Responses
Thu 07/12 12:53 PM
BRIEF in Support Of4 FIRST Amended Complaint by DAVID ANSGAR NYBERG. (kdm) |
|
4 | 4
cmp
Amended Complaint
Thu 07/12 12:47 PM
FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT against MELINDA COONROD, RICHARD D DAVIDSON, filed by DAVID ANSGAR NYBERG. (Two (2) service copies received.) (kdm) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Summons MELINDA COONROD, | ||
Att: 2 Proposed Summons RICHARD D DAVIDSON | ||
utility
Action Required by Magistrate Judge - No NEFs in SEALED Cases
Thu 07/12 12:56 PM
ACTION REQUIRED BY MAGISTRATE JUDGE: Chambers of MAGISTRATE JUDGE GARY R JONES notified that action is needed Re:4 FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT, (Two (2) service copies received),5 BRIEF in Support Of,6 NOTICE Of Compliance. (kdm) |
||
Friday, July 06, 2018 | ||
8 | 8
misc
Filing Fee Received
Wed 07/25 3:29 PM
Filing fee: $ 400.00, receipt number FLN400034516. Fee status updated to paid. (vkm) |
|
Tuesday, June 19, 2018 | ||
3 | 3
4
pgs
order
Order ~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings
Wed 06/20 6:35 AM
ORDER re 1 Complaint. (FIRST Amended Pleadings and identical service copies due by 7/19/2018 ., Motion for IFP or Fee due by 7/19/2018 ). Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE GARY R JONES on 6/19/2018. The Clerk is directed to send Plaintiff: (1) a blank Civil Rights Complaint Form to Be Used By Prisoners in Actions Under 42 U.S.C. § 1983 and instructions; and (2) a blank IFP motion and Prisoner Consent and Financial Certificate form. (Mailed as directed above.) (kdm) |
|
Monday, June 18, 2018 | ||
2 | 2
notice
Notice to Pro Se
Mon 06/18 2:29 PM
Notice to Pro Se. Mailed to: DAVID ANSGAR NYBERG, 48770, LOVELOCK CORRECTIONAL CENTER, 1200 PRISON ROAD, LOVELOCK, NV 89419. (kdm) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Mon 06/18 2:23 PM
COMPLAINT against MELINDA COONROD, RICHARD D DAVIDSON, filed by DAVID ANSGAR NYBERG. (No service copies received, no fee paid, no motion for IFP received.) (kdm) |
|
utility
Action Required by Magistrate Judge - No NEFs in SEALED Cases
Mon 06/18 2:31 PM
ACTION REQUIRED BY MAGISTRATE JUDGE: Chambers of MAGISTRATE JUDGE GARY R JONES notified that action is needed Re:1 Complaint (No service copies received, no fee paid, no motion for IFP received). (kdm) |