JOHNSON v. LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY OF NORTH AMERICA et al
New Jersey District Court | |
Judge: | Brian R Martinotti |
Referred: | Lois H Goodman |
Case #: | 3:18-cv-10727 |
Nature of Suit | 791 Labor - Employee Retirement Income Security Act |
Cause | 29:1132 E.R.I.S.A.-Employee Benefits |
Case Filed: | Jun 18, 2018 |
Terminated: | Nov 28, 2018 |
Last checked: Saturday Dec 15, 2018 4:47 AM EST |
Defendant
LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY OF NORTH AMERICA
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
NATIONAL MEDICAL CARE INC. SHORT AND LONG TERM DISABILITY PLAN
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
JUDITH D. JOHNSON
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 04/18/2024 11:59 PM EDT |
Tuesday, December 04, 2018 | ||
13 | 13
order
Stipulation and Order
Thu 12/06 10:35 AM
STIPULATION AND ORDER Dismissing Case with prejudice. Signed by Judge Brian R. Martinotti on 12/4/2018. (km) |
|
12 | 12
misc
Letter
Tue 12/04 12:35 PM
Letter from Bonny Rafel Submitting Stipulation of Dismissal with Prejudice.(RAFEL, BONNY) |
|
Att: 1 Stipulation of Dismissal with Prejudice | ||
Wednesday, November 28, 2018 | ||
11 | 11
1
pgs
order
Order 60-Day Administrative Termination
Wed 11/28 10:32 AM
Order Administratively Terminating Action - 60 Day, Pending Consummation of Settlement. Administrative Termination deadline set for 1/28/2019. Signed by Judge Brian R. Martinotti on 11/28/2018. (DS) |
|
Monday, November 26, 2018 | ||
10 | 10
misc
Letter
Mon 11/26 5:55 PM
Letter from Bonny Rafel Advising of the Parties' Verbal Agreement to Settle the Litigation. (RAFEL, BONNY) |
|
Friday, November 09, 2018 | ||
9 | 9
order
Scheduling Order
Fri 11/09 10:58 AM
PRETRIAL SCHEDULING ORDER: The parties are to submit a joint letter memorandum by 12/14/2018. Signed by Magistrate Judge Lois H. Goodman on 11/9/2018. (mps) |
|
Thursday, November 01, 2018 | ||
minutes
Pretrial Conference - Initial
Fri 11/02 2:04 PM
Text Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Lois H. Goodman: Initial Pretrial Conference held on 11/1/2018 via Conference Call. (if, ) |
||
Friday, August 03, 2018 | ||
8 | 8
5
pgs
order
Order ~Util - Set Hearings ~Util - Set/Clear Flags
Fri 08/03 11:21 AM
ORDER SCHEDULING CONFERENCE: Scheduling Conference set for 11/1/2018 at 10:00 AM in Trenton - Courtroom 7E before Magistrate Judge Lois H. Goodman. Signed by Magistrate Judge Lois H. Goodman on 8/03/2018. (jem) |
|
Thursday, August 02, 2018 | ||
7 | 7
misc
Corporate Disclosure Statement
Thu 08/02 5:55 PM
Corporate Disclosure Statement by LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY OF NORTH AMERICA identifying Connecticut General Corporation as Corporate Parent.. (ROWAN, C.) |
|
6 | 6
answer
Answer to Complaint
Thu 08/02 1:02 PM
ANSWER to Complaint by LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY OF NORTH AMERICA, NATIONAL MEDICAL CARE INC. SHORT AND LONG TERM DISABILITY PLAN.(ROWAN, C.) |
|
Wednesday, July 18, 2018 | ||
5 | 5
misc
Application for Clerk Order to Ext Answer/Proposed Order
Wed 07/18 3:19 PM
Application and Proposed Order for Clerk's Order to extend time to answer as to Plaintiff's Complaint. Attorney C. MICHAEL ROWAN, JR for LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY OF NORTH AMERICA,C. MICHAEL ROWAN, JR for NATIONAL MEDICAL CARE INC. SHORT AND LONG TERM DISABILITY PLAN added. (ROWAN, C.) |
|
utility
Update Answer Due Deadline
Wed 07/18 4:53 PM
Clerk`s Text Order - The document5 Application for Clerk's Order to Ext Answer/Proposed Order, submitted by NATIONAL MEDICAL CARE INC. SHORT AND LONG TERM DISABILITY PLAN, LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY OF NORTH AMERICA has been GRANTED. The answer due date has been set for 8/2/2018. (mps) |
||
Tuesday, July 10, 2018 | ||
4 | 4
service
Summons Returned Executed
Tue 07/10 10:50 AM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by JUDITH D. JOHNSON. NATIONAL MEDICAL CARE INC. SHORT AND LONG TERM DISABILITY PLAN served on 6/28/2018, answer due 7/19/2018. (RAFEL, BONNY) |
|
Monday, July 02, 2018 | ||
3 | 3
misc
Letter
Mon 07/02 4:52 PM
Letter from Debra A. Mullen from the N.J. Department of Banking and Insurance; Re: Accepting Service on Behalf of LINA. (RAFEL, BONNY) |
|
Tuesday, June 19, 2018 | ||
2 | 2
service
Summons Issued
Tue 06/19 9:21 AM
SUMMONS ISSUED as to LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY OF NORTH AMERICA, NATIONAL MEDICAL CARE INC. SHORT AND LONG TERM DISABILITY PLAN Attached is the official court Summons, please fill out Defendant and Plaintiffs attorney information and serve. Issued By *John Moller* (jem) |
|
utility
Add and Terminate Judges
Tue 06/19 9:17 AM
Judge Brian R. Martinotti and Magistrate Judge Lois H. Goodman added. (jem) |
||
Monday, June 18, 2018 | ||
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Mon 06/18 5:31 PM
COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing and Admin fee $ 400 receipt number 0312-8821132), filed by JUDITH JOHNSON.(RAFEL, BONNY) |
|
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet, | ||
Att: 2 Summons as to LINA, | ||
Att: 3 Summons as to National Medical Care Inc. Short and Long Term Disability Plan |